Luckenson v. USA
Petitioner: DORCEANT LUCKENSON
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2020cv00744
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number: 2:20-cv-02570. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (bw, ) [Transferred from paed on 7/7/2020.]
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDERED THAT THE CASE IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF NEW HAMPSHIRE. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS CASE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE C. DARNELL JONES, II ON 6/3/20. 6/3/20 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE PETITIONER.(jpd, ) [Transferred from paed on 7/7/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by DORCEANT LUCKENSON. (NO FEED PAID; NO IFP FILED) (Attachments: #1 Case Management Track Form, #2 Designation Form)(bw, ) [Transferred from paed on 7/7/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luckenson v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DORCEANT LUCKENSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?