Kastanas v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Plaintiff: Naomi Kastanas
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00857
Filed: August 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 10/5/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/19/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/26/2021 at 02:30 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 11/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (jb)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER approving (with changes) #7 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 3 days. Case Track: Standard. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 11/2/2020. Discovery Status Conference set for 4/5/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 4/2/2021. Discovery deadline 4/21/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 7/6/2021. Mediation Follow Up on 8/2/2021.(jb)
September 15, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/15/2020. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Neil B. Nicholson) (Defts Atty: Matthew J. Lynch)(Total Hearing Time: 15 minutes) (jb)
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #7 Proposed Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Naomi Kastanas. (Nicholson, Neil)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 226-2020-CV-00336, Hillsborough County Superior Court(Lynch, Matthew)
August 21, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL VIDEO-CONFERENCE. Pretrial Video-Conference set for 9/15/2020 at 03:00 PM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Discovery Plan 9/8/2020. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand and affirmative defenses filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation.(Lynch, Matthew)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Neil B. Nicholson on behalf of Naomi Kastanas (Nicholson, Neil)
August 19, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
August 14, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Costco Wholesale Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lynch, Matthew)
August 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Gerard Betke on behalf of Costco Wholesale Corporation Attorney Christopher Gerard Betke added to party Costco Wholesale Corporation(pty:dft).(Betke, Christopher)
August 13, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-857-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough Superior Court- Southern District, case number 226-2020-CV-00336 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-2014070) filed by Costco Wholesale Corporation. Answer Follow Up on 9/3/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1., Redacted medical report, #3 Exhibit 2., Itemization, #4 Exhibit 3., Collected cases, #5 Exhibit 4., Email, #6 Exhibit 5., Collected Cases, #7 Notice of Removal to counsel, #8 Notice of Removal sent to clerk of state court, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lynch, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kastanas v. Costco Wholesale Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Gerard Betke
Represented By: Matthew J. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Kastanas
Represented By: Neil B. Nicholson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?