The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Kimberly MacDonald, Kathleen MacDonald, Jennifer MacDonald, Cheryl D. Mitchell and Elizabeth MacDonald
Case Number: 1:2020cv00881
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via Video Conference set for 11/12/2020 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 11/5/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(kad)
September 25, 2020 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Cheryl D. Mitchell by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Served/Mailed on 9/14/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/5/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martinen, Abbygale)
September 11, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Francis X. Quinn, Jr on behalf of Elizabeth MacDonald, Jennifer MacDonald, Kathleen MacDonald, Kimberly MacDonald (Quinn, Francis)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case,,, filed by Elizabeth MacDonald, Jennifer MacDonald, Kathleen MacDonald, Kimberly MacDonald.(Quinn, Francis)
September 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case filed by Cheryl D. Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(de)
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Change of Address by Cheryl D. Mitchell(de)
September 10, 2020 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Kimberly MacDonald by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Served/Mailed on 8/21/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martinen, Abbygale)
September 10, 2020 Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Elizabeth MacDonald by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Served/Mailed on 8/21/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martinen, Abbygale)
September 10, 2020 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Kathleen MacDonald by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Served/Mailed on 8/21/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martinen, Abbygale)
September 10, 2020 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Jennifer MacDonald by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Served/Mailed on 8/21/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/11/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Martinen, Abbygale)
September 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons issued electronically as to Cheryl D. Mitchell. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by The Prudential Insurance Company of America(Martinen, Abbygale)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to Elizabeth MacDonald, Jennifer MacDonald, Kathleen MacDonald, Kimberly MacDonald, Cheryl D. Mitchell. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 20, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney H. G. Herz on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America Attorney Courtney H. G. Herz added to party The Prudential Insurance Company of America(pty:pla).(Herz, Courtney)
August 19, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-881-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Martinen, Abbygale)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2016173 filed by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Group Policy, #2 Exhibit B - 9/20/11 beneficiary designation, #3 Exhibit C - Insured's Death Certificate, #4 Exhibit D - Emails between Cheryl and Prudential, #5 Exhibit E - Docs received by Prudential, #6 Exhibit F - Claim for Death Benefits, #7 Exhibit G - 6/15/20 letter, #8 Exhibit H - Claim for Death Benefits, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - Waiver for Jennifer MacDonald, #11 Summons - Waiver for Kimberly MacDonald, #12 Summons - Waiver for Kathleen MacDonald, #13 Summons - Waiver for Elizabeth MacDonald)(Martinen, Abbygale) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/20/2020: #14 Cheryl Mitchell Summons) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Prudential Insurance Company of America v. Mitchell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly MacDonald
Represented By: Francis X. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen MacDonald
Represented By: Francis X. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer MacDonald
Represented By: Francis X. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl D. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth MacDonald
Represented By: Francis X. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Abbygale Sarah Martinen
Represented By: Courtney H. G. Herz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?