Taal v. St. Mary's Bank
Plaintiff: Baboucar B. Taal and USA, ex rel
Defendant: St Mary's Bank
Case Number: 1:2020cv00898
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Civil Case Terminated. (js)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #10 RELATOR/PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO CHIEF J MCCAFERTY ORDER OF DENIAL OF A WITHDRAWAL MOTION. Text of Order: The Court construes doc. no. 10 as a notice of dismissal, and deems this case voluntarily dismissed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
September 21, 2020 Filing 10 ///RELATOR/PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO CHIEF J MCCAFERTY ORDER OF DENIAL OF A WITHDRAWAL MOTION re Endorsed Order on Motion to Withdraw filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (js) Modified on 9/22/2020 to add: ///(js).
September 17, 2020 NOTICE to Parties/Attorneys of Record: The case has been unsealed. All future pleadings shall be filed in accordance with this district's Supplemental Rules for Electronic Case Filing.(js)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #7 Motion to Withdraw #1 Transferred F.C.A. Complaint. Text of Order: To the extent the Motion to Withdraw Transferred F.C.A. Complaint (doc. no. 7) seeks a transfer of this action back to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, that request is denied for the reasons stated by that court in its order transferring the case to the District of New Hampshire. See doc. no. 2. To the extent the motion seeks leave to withdraw the complaint in its entirety, that request is denied without prejudice. It is not clear to the court whether plaintiff truly intends to withdraw his complaint. The court is hesitant to dismiss this action without a clear request from the plaintiff to do so. If the plaintiff wishes to withdraw his complaint, he may do so without a court order by filing a notice of dismissal before the opposing party serves either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1). In addition, the court unseals this matter for the same reason that the Southern District of New York originally declined to seal it in its transfer order. See doc. no. 2 n.1; Nasuti v. Savage Farms Inc., 2015 WL 9598315, at *1 (1st Cir. Mar. 12, 2015); 42 U.S.C. 3730(b)(2)-(4). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
September 15, 2020 Filing 9 RELATOR/PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO J LAPLANTE RECUSAL AFTER THE FACT AND WANTON VIOLATION OF FEDERAL LAW re #8 Order of Recusal filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (js)
September 10, 2020 Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Laplante recused. The new case designation is: 20-cv-898-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (jb)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused. Reassign to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 RELATOR/PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW #4 Case Transferred In - District Transfer re #1 Qui Tam Complaint filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jb)
September 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Compliance Deadline set for 11/3/2020. (ed)
September 2, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 25, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-898-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 9/24/2020. (ed)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number: 1:20-cv-06403. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 19, 2020 Filing 3 PETITIONER'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW FILED MISCELLANEOUS MOTION THAT SDNY COURT CHOSE SEND BACK TO THE DISTRICT THAT IS VIOLATING LAW OBSTRUCTING JUSTICE. Document filed by Baboucar B. Taal.(sc) [Transferred from nysd on 8/25/2020.]
August 19, 2020 Mailed a copy of #2 Order, to Baboucar B. Taal at 59 Essex Rd, Bedford, NH 03110. (dsh) [Transferred from nysd on 8/25/2020.]
August 17, 2020 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of District of New Hampshire. (sac) [Transferred from nysd on 8/25/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. The Clerk of Court is further directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/17/2020) (nb) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from nysd on 8/25/2020.]
August 13, 2020 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(bcu) [Transferred from nysd on 8/25/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Case Designated ECF. (rdz) [Transferred from nysd on 8/25/2020.]
August 12, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION (Filing Fee $ 47.00, Receipt Number 465401259474).Document filed by Baboucar B. Taal. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(rdz) Modified on 8/13/2020 (rdz). [Transferred from nysd on 8/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taal v. St. Mary's Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Mary's Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baboucar B. Taal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA, ex rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?