Boire v. The Gorman Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Daryl Boire
Defendant: The Gorman Group, LLC and Gorman Bros., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00910
Filed: August 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 Filing 12 Gorman Bros., Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand and Affirmative Defenses filed by Gorman Bros., Inc..(Poulin, Christopher)
October 23, 2020 Filing 11 The Gorman Group, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case with jury demand and Affirmative Defenses filed by The Gorman Group, LLC.(Poulin, Christopher)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to Answer.. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Answer Follow Up on 10/23/2020. (vln)
September 24, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Poulin on behalf of Gorman Bros., Inc., The Gorman Group, LLC Attorney Christopher J. Poulin added to party Gorman Bros., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher J. Poulin added to party The Gorman Group, LLC(pty:dft).(Poulin, Christopher)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 10/23/2020 filed by Gorman Bros., Inc., The Gorman Group, LLC.(Coppolo, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by The Gorman Group, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Coppolo, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Gorman Bros., Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Coppolo, Stephen)
September 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen David Coppolo on behalf of Gorman Bros., Inc., The Gorman Group, LLC Attorney Stephen David Coppolo added to party Gorman Bros., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen David Coppolo added to party The Gorman Group, LLC(pty:dft).(Coppolo, Stephen)
September 22, 2020 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to The Gorman Group, LLC by Daryl Boire. Served/Mailed on 9/17/2020. Answer Follow Up on 10/8/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Noonan, D.)
September 10, 2020 Filing 4 Return of Service Executed as to Gorman Bros., Inc. by Daryl Boire. Served/Mailed on 9/3/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Kline, Nicholas)
September 9, 2020 Filing 3 Return of Service Executed as to The Gorman Group, LLC by Daryl Boire. Served/Mailed on 9/3/2020. Answer Follow Up on 9/24/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Noonan, D.)
August 27, 2020 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Gorman Bros., Inc., The Gorman Group, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
August 27, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 27, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-910-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 27, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2019135 filed by Daryl Boire. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver)(Noonan, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boire v. The Gorman Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gorman Group, LLC
Represented By: Stephen David Coppolo
Represented By: Christopher J. Poulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gorman Bros., Inc.
Represented By: Stephen David Coppolo
Represented By: Christopher J. Poulin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl Boire
Represented By: D. Michael Noonan
Represented By: Nicholas G. Kline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?