Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital et al v. Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary et al
Plaintiff: Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Valley Regional Hospital, Inc. and Cheshire Medical Center
Defendant: State of Vermont Agency of Human Services, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Acting Administrator and Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary
Case Number: 1:2020cv00919
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 12 OBJECTION to #10 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Cheshire Medical Center, Valley Regional Hospital, Inc.. Follow up on Reply on 11/3/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (O'Connell, W.)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to 14 Days Following a Ruling on the Pending Motion to Transfer or November 9, 2020, Whichever is Later. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
October 16, 2020 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 14 Days Following a Ruling on the Pending Motion to Transfer or November 9, 2020, Whichever is Later filed by Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Acting Administrator, US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary. Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Acting Administrator(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary(pty:dft).(Rabuck, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue filed by State of Vermont Agency of Human Services, Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary.Follow up on Objection on 10/27/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Alice Peck Day Contract, #2 Exhibit B - Cheshire Med Ctr Contract, #3 Exhibit C - Valley Reg Hosp Contract)(Spottswood, Eleanor)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
October 8, 2020 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer filed by State of Vermont Agency of Human Services, Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary.(Spottswood, Eleanor)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood on behalf of State of Vermont Agency of Human Services, Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary Attorney Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood added to party State of Vermont Agency of Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood added to party Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary(pty:dft).(Spottswood, Eleanor)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Summonses issued electronically as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Acting Administrator, State of Vermont Agency of Human Services, US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary, Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan C. Nighan on behalf of Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Cheshire Medical Center, Valley Regional Hospital, Inc. Attorney Morgan C. Nighan added to party Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Morgan C. Nighan added to party Cheshire Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Morgan C. Nighan added to party Valley Regional Hospital, Inc.(pty:pla).(Nighan, Morgan)
August 31, 2020 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-919-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 31, 2020 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Valley Regional Hospital, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (O'Connell, W.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Cheshire Medical Center disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (O'Connell, W.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (O'Connell, W.)
August 31, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kierstan Ellicott Schultz on behalf of Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Cheshire Medical Center, Valley Regional Hospital, Inc. Attorney Kierstan Ellicott Schultz added to party Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Kierstan Ellicott Schultz added to party Cheshire Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Kierstan Ellicott Schultz added to party Valley Regional Hospital, Inc.(pty:pla).(Schultz, Kierstan)
August 31, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2020285 filed by Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital, Valley Regional Hospital, Inc., Cheshire Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Attachment 4.19-A to the Vermont SPA, #2 Exhibit B - Attachment 4.19-B to the Vermont SPA, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver Michael Smith, #5 Summons - Waiver State of VT AHS, #6 Summons - Waiver Alex Azar, #7 Summons - Waiver Seema Verma, #8 Summons - Waiver Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services)(O'Connell, W.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital et al v. Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Vermont Agency of Human Services
Represented By: Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Health and Human Services, Secretary
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Acting Administrator
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vermont Agency of Human Services, Secretary
Represented By: Eleanor Laurel Pullin Spottswood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Peck Day Memorial Hospital
Represented By: W. Scott O'Connell
Represented By: Kierstan Ellicott Schultz
Represented By: Morgan C. Nighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Regional Hospital, Inc.
Represented By: W. Scott O'Connell
Represented By: Kierstan Ellicott Schultz
Represented By: Morgan C. Nighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheshire Medical Center
Represented By: W. Scott O'Connell
Represented By: Kierstan Ellicott Schultz
Represented By: Morgan C. Nighan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?