Johnson v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Petitioner: Avaun Johnson
Respondent: Warden R. Hazlewood and FCI Berlin, Warden
Case Number: 1:2020cv00920
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph A DiClerico
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 11/4/2020. (ed)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
August 31, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-920-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
August 31, 2020 Filing 4 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 9/30/2020. (ed)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number: 8:19-cv-03520. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/29/2020. (c/m 8/31/2020 ybs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/31/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Avaun Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Envelope)(ybs, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 8/31/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden R. Hazlewood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Avaun Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?