Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Allain et al
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Ruby L. Schaefer, James M. Henderson, Leslie M. Zobel, Judy Allain, Stephen J. Burke and Shane L. Windstorm
Case Number: 1:2020cv00927
Filed: September 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2020 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Shane L. Windstorm by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 9/4/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Stephen J. Burke by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 9/4/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
September 29, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Leslie M. Zobel by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 9/4/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Judy Allain by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 9/4/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Ruby L. Schaefer by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 9/4/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
September 14, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to James M. Henderson by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 9/4/2020. Answer Follow Up on 11/6/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Pandolph, William)
September 4, 2020 Filing 5 Summonses issued electronically as to Judy Allain, Stephen J. Burke, James M. Henderson, Ruby L. Schaefer, Shane L. Windstorm, Leslie M. Zobel. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 ERISA Notice, #3 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
September 4, 2020 Filing 4 ERISA Notice sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (mc)
September 4, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties.(mc)
September 3, 2020 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-927-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Pandolph, William)
September 3, 2020 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ERISA COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANHDC-2022269 filed by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Death Certificate, #2 Exhibit B - April 2007 Beneficiary Designation, #3 Exhibit C - October 2006 Beneficiary Designation, #4 Exhibit D - October 2004 Beneficiary Designation, #5 Exhibit E - October 2003 Beneficiary Designation, #6 Exhibit F - Undated Letter to MetLife from Windstorm, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons - Waiver for Judy Allain, #9 Summons - Waiver for Stephen J. Burke, #10 Summons - Waiver for James M. Henderson, #11 Summons - Waiver for Ruby L. Schaefer, #12 Summons - Waiver for Shane L. Windstorm, #13 Summons - Waiver for Leslie M. Zobel)(Pandolph, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company v. Allain et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: William D. Pandolph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruby L. Schaefer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie M. Zobel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Allain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen J. Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane L. Windstorm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?