Cohen v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Carl Alexander Cohen
Defendant: Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc., Boston Scientific Corporation d/b/a American Medical Systems, John Does 1-10, Alex Muchati, John Does Entities 11-20 and Boston Scientific Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00943
Filed: September 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #11 Amended Complaint with jury demand filed by Alex Muchati.(Flanagan, William)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer re #11 Amended Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Answer Follow Up on 11/23/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 23, 2020 filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Sackman, Edward)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED ERISA COMPLAINT against All Defendants with jury demand filed by Carl Alexander Cohen.(Notovny, Benjamin)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc..(Flanagan, William)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 REFILED. SEE DOC. NO. 10 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc..(Flanagan, William) Modified on 10/20/2020 to add: Refiled text(js).
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #9 Answer to Complaint filed by Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc. Document incomplete. Filer shall refile complete Answer and add into the docket text This document replaces document no. 9 Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1475.Compliance Deadline set for 10/20/2020.(js)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Fourteen Days to November 2, 2020. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to File a Responsive Pleading to the Complaint Fourteen Days to November 2, 2020 filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Sackman, Edward)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Flanagan, William)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Assented to Motion to Extend Time Answer to October 19, 2020; granting #5 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to October 19, 2020. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 219-2020-CV-00221, Strafford County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -- Complaint, #2 Exhibit -- Summons, #3 Exhibit -- Consumer Letter, #4 Exhibit -- Republic Appearance - Flanagan, #5 Exhibit -- Return of Service on Republic, #6 Exhibit -- Return of Service on American, #7 Exhibit -- Return of Service on Endo, #8 Exhibit -- Return of Service on Boston, #9 Exhibit -- Notice of Removal)(Sackman, Edward)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 19, 2020 filed by Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc..(Flanagan, William)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Pritchard on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation Attorney Lauren Pritchard added to party Boston Scientific Corporation(pty:dft).(Pritchard, Lauren)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 19, 2020 filed by Boston Scientific Corporation.(Sackman, Edward)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-943-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Boston Scientific Corporation. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by September 23, 2020. Disclosure Statement due 9/23/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (mc)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Boston Scientific Corporation d/b/a American Medical Systems disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sackman, Edward)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Strafford Superior Court, case number 219-2020-CV-00221 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-2024543) filed by Boston Scientific Corporation d/b/a American Medical Systems. Answer Follow Up on 10/1/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Part 1 -- State Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit A-Part 2 -- State Court Pleadings continued, #3 Notice of Removal to all Adverse Parties, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) Complaint includes a claim under the NH Consumer Protection Act. A copy of the Complaint has been sent to the NH Attorney General via an automatic Notice of Electronic filing.(Sackman, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Boston Scientific Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic Surgical Medworx, Inc.
Represented By: William Joseph Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation d/b/a American Medical Systems
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Muchati
Represented By: William Joseph Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does Entities 11-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boston Scientific Corporation
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Represented By: Lauren Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Alexander Cohen
Represented By: Benjamin R. Novotny
Represented By: Benjamin R. Notovny
Represented By: Alfred T. Catalfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?