McCauley et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Mary McCauley, David McCauley and Casey McCauley
Defendant: Robert Smith, Jamie Smith and Barbara Smith
Case Number: 1:2020cv00973
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2020 TRIAL NOTICE: Pretrial Statements due 9/17/2021. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 10/1/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/6/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 10/19/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. (lw)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving #5 Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 5-7 days. Case Track: Standard. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. Text of Order: Approved and adopted as a pretrial scheduling order. Trial: 10/19/2021. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 1/29/2021. Summary Judgment Motions due by 6/18/2021. Joint Statement re Mediation Follow Up on 6/30/2021. Discovery deadline 8/13/2021. (lw)
October 28, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Discovery Plan Assented to filed by Barbara Smith, Jamie Smith, Robert Smith. (Chadwick, Tierney)
October 9, 2020 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 11/3/2020 02:00 PM before Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. Follow up on Discovery Plan 10/28/2020. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lw)
October 9, 2020 Filing 4 Defendant Jamie Smith's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Jamie Smith.(Chadwick, Tierney)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 Robert and Barbara Smith's ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand filed by Barbara Smith, Robert Smith.(Chadwick, Tierney)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 220-2020-CV-00126, Sullivan County Superior Court Attorney Tierney M. Chadwick added to party Jamie Smith(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Certified Affidavit of Service for Robert Smith, #3 Exhibit Certified Affidavit of Service for Barbara Smith, #4 Exhibit Certified summons, #5 Exhibit Certified Return of service for Jamie Smith, #6 Exhibit Certified Answer of Barbara and Robert Smith, #7 Exhibit Certified Answer of Jamie Smith to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Certified Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit Certified Notice of Removal)(Chadwick, Tierney)
September 25, 2020 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Robert Smith, Barbara Smith. Although the clerk's office has no obligation to review pleadings for personal identifiers, please note that the above-referenced document contains personal identifiers in violation of Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 49.1. The filing party may remedy this violation by contacting the case manager at 603-225-1423. If no action is taken, the unredacted document will remain publicly available. (mc)
September 25, 2020 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
September 24, 2020 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:20-cv-973-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Sullivan County Superior Court, case number 220-2020-CV-00126 (filing fee $400, receipt number ANHDC-2029623) filed by Robert Smith, Barbara Smith. Answer Follow Up on 10/15/2020. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 10/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chadwick, Tierney)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCauley et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary McCauley
Represented By: Timothy C. Ayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David McCauley
Represented By: Timothy C. Ayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Smith
Represented By: Tierney M. Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Smith
Represented By: Tierney M. Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Smith
Represented By: Tierney M. Chadwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?