G. K. et al v. Governor, NH, State of, et al
Plaintiff: C. I., Christine C. Wellington, G. K., T. L., R. K. and Katherine Cooper
Defendant: Christopher Keating, Henry Lipman, Joseph Ribsam, State of New Hampshire, Governor, New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Governor, NH, State of and NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2021cv00004
Filed: January 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2021 Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Konrad Cailteux on behalf of Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington Attorney Konrad Cailteux added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Konrad Cailteux added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Konrad Cailteux added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Konrad Cailteux added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Konrad Cailteux added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Konrad Cailteux added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Cailteux, Konrad)
March 5, 2021 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sudip Kundu on behalf of Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington Attorney Sudip Kundu added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Sudip Kundu added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Sudip Kundu added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Sudip Kundu added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Sudip Kundu added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Sudip Kundu added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Kundu, Sudip)
March 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ira Lustbader on behalf of Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington Attorney Ira Lustbader added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Ira Lustbader added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Ira Lustbader added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Ira Lustbader added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Ira Lustbader added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Ira Lustbader added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Lustbader, Ira)
February 3, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shereen White on behalf of Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington Attorney Shereen White added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Shereen White added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Shereen White added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Shereen White added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Shereen White added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Shereen White added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(White, Shereen)
February 3, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Taykhman on behalf of Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington Attorney Nicole Taykhman added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole Taykhman added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole Taykhman added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole Taykhman added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole Taykhman added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Nicole Taykhman added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Taykhman, Nicole)
January 15, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE of No Objection to Pro Hac Vice Motions (ECF Nos 14-17) by Governor, NH, State of, Christopher Keating, Henry Lipman, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Joseph Ribsam.(Galdieri (NHAG), Anthony)
January 13, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) on behalf of Governor, NH, State of, Christopher Keating, Henry Lipman, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Joseph Ribsam Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party Governor, NH, State of(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party Christopher Keating(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party Henry Lipman(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party Joseph Ribsam(pty:dft).(Galdieri (NHAG), Anthony)
January 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer Ramsey on behalf of Governor, NH, State of, Christopher Keating, Henry Lipman, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Joseph Ribsam Attorney Jennifer Ramsey added to party Governor, NH, State of(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ramsey added to party Christopher Keating(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ramsey added to party Henry Lipman(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ramsey added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner(pty:dft), Attorney Jennifer Ramsey added to party Joseph Ribsam(pty:dft).(Ramsey, Jennifer)
January 11, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kay E. Drought on behalf of Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Drought, Kay)
January 11, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Shereen A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2068842.) filed by Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington.Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of SAW)(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 11, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Nicole Taykhman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2068833.) filed by Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington.Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of NT)(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 11, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Ira Lustbader to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2068826.) filed by Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington.Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of IL)(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 11, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Sudip Kundu to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2068819.) filed by Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington.Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of SKK, #2 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit A)(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 11, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Konrad L. Cailteux to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2068806.) filed by Katherine Cooper, C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington.Follow up on Objection on 1/25/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of KLC)(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Konrad L. Cailteux to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Sudip Kundu to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for Ira Lustbader to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #17 Motion for Nicole Taykhman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Motion for Shereen A. White to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
January 6, 2021 Filing 13 Summonses and Waivers issued electronically as to Governor, NH, State of, Christopher Keating, Henry Lipman, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner, Joseph Ribsam. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Assented to Motion Proceed Under Pseudonymous Initials. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
January 6, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 5, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-4-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 5, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner filed by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/5/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/9/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Joseph Ribsam by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/5/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/9/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Henry Lipman filed by by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/5/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/9/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to State of New Hampshire, Governor filed by by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/5/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/9/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Christopher Keating filed by by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/5/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/9/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Karen L. Rosenberg on behalf of Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, G.K.), Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, R.K.), C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, T.L.), Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, C.I.) Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla), Attorney Karen L. Rosenberg added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Rosenberg, Karen)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gilles R. Bissonnette on behalf of Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, G.K.), Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, R.K.), C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, T.L.), Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, C.I.) Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla), Attorney Gilles R. Bissonnette added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Bissonnette, Gilles)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela E. Phelan on behalf of Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, G.K.), Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, R.K.), C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, T.L.), Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, C.I.) Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Phelan, Pamela)
January 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sarah J. Jancarik on behalf of Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, G.K.), Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, R.K.), C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, T.L.), Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, C.I.) Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla), Attorney Sarah J. Jancarik added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Jancarik, Sarah)
January 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Klementowicz on behalf of Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, G.K.), Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, R.K.), C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, T.L.), Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, C.I.) Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Katherine Cooper(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party C. I.(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party G. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party R. K.(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party T. L.(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla), Attorney Henry Klementowicz added to party Christine C. Wellington(pty:pla).(Klementowicz, Henry)
January 5, 2021 Filing 2 Assented to MOTION Proceed Under Pseudonymous Initials filed by Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, G.K.), Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, R.K.), C. I., G. K., R. K., T. L., Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, T.L.), Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, C.I.). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memo in support of Motion to Use Pseudonymous Initials)(Wangerin, Michelle)
January 5, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2066333 filed by Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, T.L.), C. I., R. K., Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, G.K.), Katherine Cooper(as next friend of minor child, R.K.), G. K., Christine C. Wellington(as next friend of minor child, C.I.), T. L.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Notice - Sununu, #3 Summons - Waiver - Sununu, #4 Summons - Waiver - Sununu, #5 Summons - Waiver Notice - Shibinette, #6 Summons - Waiver - Shibinette, #7 Summons - Waiver - Shibinette, #8 Summons - Waiver Notice - Ribsam, #9 Summons - Waiver - Ribsam, #10 Summons - Waiver - Ribsam, #11 Summons - Waiver Notice - Lipman, #12 Summons - Waiver - Lipman, #13 Summons - Waiver - Lipman, #14 Summons - Waiver Notice - Keating, #15 Summons - Waiver - Keating, #16 Summons - Waiver - Keating)(Wangerin, Michelle) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G. K. et al v. Governor, NH, State of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Keating
Represented By: Jennifer Ramsey
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Lipman
Represented By: Jennifer Ramsey
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Ribsam
Represented By: Jennifer Ramsey
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of New Hampshire, Governor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor, NH, State of
Represented By: Jennifer Ramsey
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Represented By: Jennifer Ramsey
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. I.
Represented By: Karen L. Rosenberg
Represented By: Sarah J. Jancarik
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Wangerin
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Shereen White
Represented By: Nicole Taykhman
Represented By: Michelle Wangerin
Represented By: Konrad Cailteux
Represented By: Ira Lustbader
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine C. Wellington
Represented By: Karen L. Rosenberg
Represented By: Sarah J. Jancarik
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Wangerin
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Shereen White
Represented By: Nicole Taykhman
Represented By: Michelle Wangerin
Represented By: Konrad Cailteux
Represented By: Ira Lustbader
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. K.
Represented By: Karen L. Rosenberg
Represented By: Sarah J. Jancarik
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Wangerin
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Shereen White
Represented By: Nicole Taykhman
Represented By: Michelle Wangerin
Represented By: Konrad Cailteux
Represented By: Ira Lustbader
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T. L.
Represented By: Karen L. Rosenberg
Represented By: Sarah J. Jancarik
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Wangerin
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Shereen White
Represented By: Nicole Taykhman
Represented By: Michelle Wangerin
Represented By: Konrad Cailteux
Represented By: Ira Lustbader
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R. K.
Represented By: Karen L. Rosenberg
Represented By: Sarah J. Jancarik
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Wangerin
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Shereen White
Represented By: Nicole Taykhman
Represented By: Michelle Wangerin
Represented By: Konrad Cailteux
Represented By: Ira Lustbader
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Cooper
Represented By: Karen L. Rosenberg
Represented By: Sarah J. Jancarik
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Gilles R. Bissonnette
Represented By: Michelle Elizabeth Wangerin
Represented By: Henry Klementowicz
Represented By: Sudip Kundu
Represented By: Shereen White
Represented By: Nicole Taykhman
Represented By: Michelle Wangerin
Represented By: Konrad Cailteux
Represented By: Ira Lustbader
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?