Price et al v. NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Price, Emily Fitzmorris, Kathleen Bates and Paul Scott
Defendant: NH Department of Health and Human Services and NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Case Number: 1:2021cv00025
Filed: January 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER RE #20 Suggestion of Death. Text of Order: The death of plaintiff, Paul Scott, shall be noted on the record and the case shall proceed with the other named plaintiffs as representatives of the proposed class. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(js)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUGGESTION OF DEATH as to Paul Scott by Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott(Schultz, Kierstan)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Susan Ann Silverstein on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Susan Ann Silverstein added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Susan Ann Silverstein added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Susan Ann Silverstein added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Susan Ann Silverstein added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Silverstein, Susan)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelly Riseden Bagby on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Kelly Riseden Bagby added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Riseden Bagby added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Riseden Bagby added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Kelly Riseden Bagby added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Bagby, Kelly)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martha Geron Gadd on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Martha Geron Gadd added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Martha Geron Gadd added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Martha Geron Gadd added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Martha Geron Gadd added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Gadd, Martha)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Assented to MOTION for Kelly Bagby to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Assented to MOTION for M. Geron Gadd to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Assented to MOTION for Susan Ann Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(js)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Assented to MOTION for Susan Ann Silverstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2084135.) filed by Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Silverstein Declaration in Support of PHV Admission)(Schultz, Kierstan)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for M. Geron Gadd to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2084132.) filed by Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Gadd Declaration in Support of PHV Admission)(Schultz, Kierstan)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Kelly Bagby to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2084124.) filed by Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Bagby Declaration in Support of Motion for PHV Admission)(Schultz, Kierstan)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Department of Health and Human Services by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/11/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/15/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Schultz, Kierstan)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner Lori Shibinette by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 1/11/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/15/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Schultz, Kierstan)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Seth Michael Zoracki on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner Attorney Seth Michael Zoracki added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Seth Michael Zoracki added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner(pty:dft).(Zoracki, Seth)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) on behalf of NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft), Attorney Anthony Galdieri (NHAG) added to party NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner(pty:dft).(Galdieri (NHAG), Anthony)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to NH Department of Health and Human Services, NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-25-PB. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cheryl S. Steinberg on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Cheryl S. Steinberg added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Cheryl S. Steinberg added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Cheryl S. Steinberg added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Cheryl S. Steinberg added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Steinberg, Cheryl)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kay E. Drought on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Kay E. Drought added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Drought, Kay)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Tyler Knights on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Mark Tyler Knights added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Tyler Knights added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Tyler Knights added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Tyler Knights added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Knights, Mark)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by W. Daniel Deane on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney W. Daniel Deane added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Deane, W.)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Russell on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Todd Russell added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Todd Russell added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Todd Russell added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Russell, Todd)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Russell on behalf of Kathleen Bates Attorney Todd Russell added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla).(Russell, Todd)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pamela E. Phelan on behalf of Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris, Stephanie Price, Paul Scott Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Kathleen Bates(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Emily Fitzmorris(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Stephanie Price(pty:pla), Attorney Pamela E. Phelan added to party Paul Scott(pty:pla).(Phelan, Pamela)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2068738 filed by Paul Scott, Stephanie Price, Kathleen Bates, Emily Fitzmorris. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver to Lori Shibinette, current Commissioner of NH DHHS, #3 Summons - Waiver to NH Department of Health and Human Services)(Schultz, Kierstan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price et al v. NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Price
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Represented By: Kierstan Ellicott Schultz
Represented By: Todd Russell
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark Tyler Knights
Represented By: Cheryl S. Steinberg
Represented By: Susan Ann Silverstein
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Kelly Riseden Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Fitzmorris
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Represented By: Kierstan Ellicott Schultz
Represented By: Todd Russell
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark Tyler Knights
Represented By: Cheryl S. Steinberg
Represented By: Susan Ann Silverstein
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Kelly Riseden Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Bates
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Represented By: Kierstan Ellicott Schultz
Represented By: Todd Russell
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark Tyler Knights
Represented By: Cheryl S. Steinberg
Represented By: Susan Ann Silverstein
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Kelly Riseden Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Scott
Represented By: Pamela E. Phelan
Represented By: Kay E. Drought
Represented By: Kierstan Ellicott Schultz
Represented By: Todd Russell
Represented By: W. Daniel Deane
Represented By: Mark Tyler Knights
Represented By: Cheryl S. Steinberg
Represented By: Susan Ann Silverstein
Represented By: Martha Geron Gadd
Represented By: Kelly Riseden Bagby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Seth Michael Zoracki
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NH Department of Health and Human Services, Commissioner
Represented By: Seth Michael Zoracki
Represented By: Anthony Galdieri (NHAG)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?