Hernandez v. Martin & Sheehan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Ileanex Hernandez
Defendant: Martin & Sheehan doing business as Colortyme and Martin & Sheehan, Inc. doing business as Colortyme
Case Number: 1:2021cv00143
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ileanex Hernandez.Follow up on Objection on 4/26/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(McDaniel, Robert)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ileanex Hernandez. (McDaniel, Robert)
April 5, 2021 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - ACTION REQUIRED - re: #11 Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ileanex Hernandez. Pursuant to LR 7.1(a)(1) Objections to pending motions and affirmative motions for relief shall not be combined in one filing. The filed "Response" appears to contain a motion to remand. Wrong event used. If the filing party is moving to remand a motion shall be filed using the Motion/Remand event in CM/ECF. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 4/12/2021.(kad)
April 2, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ileanex Hernandez. (McDaniel, Robert)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to April 2, 2021. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.Follow up on Objection on 4/2/2021. (kad)
March 23, 2021 Filing 10 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim to April 2, 2021 filed by Ileanex Hernandez.(McDaniel, Robert)
March 23, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference and Deadline to File Discovery Plan filed by Martin & Sheehan, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 4/6/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Scott, K.)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference and Deadline to File Discovery Plan. Text of Order: Granted. Given the issues raised in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) to after the rescheduled pretrial conference. The March 26, 2021 pretrial conference is cancelled and will be rescheduled after resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
March 22, 2021 Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. Pretrial Conference via Video set for 3/26/2021 03:00 PM. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/23/2021.(kad)
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Scott, K.)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Martin & Sheehan, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Scott, K.)
February 22, 2021 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, = filed by Martin & Sheehan, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Martin & Sheehan, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by March 1, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 3/1/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
February 19, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF/MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definitive Statement by Martin & Sheehan(Scott, K.) Modified on 2/19/2021 to create a docket entry relationship to doc. no. 5. (kad).
February 19, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Martin & Sheehan. If no consent form has yet been filed, the plaintiff is required to file a consent on or before the date of filing an objection to this Motion.Follow up on Objection on 3/5/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Scott, K.)
February 19, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel H. Martin on behalf of Martin & Sheehan Attorney Samuel H. Martin added to party Martin & Sheehan(pty:dft).(Martin, Samuel)
February 19, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (ed)
February 19, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via Video set for 3/26/2021 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 3/19/2021. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
February 19, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
February 19, 2021 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error - NO ACTION REQUIRED - re: #6 RIEF/MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint and, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definitive Statement filed by Martin & Sheehan. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (doc. no. 5) (AP 2.5(a). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(kad)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 216-2020-cv-00821, Hillsborough-Northern County Superior Court(Scott, K.)
February 12, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-143-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Hillsborough County Northern District, case number 216-2020-cv-821 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2081131) filed by Martin & Sheehan. Answer Follow Up on 3/5/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 2/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Summons, #3 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to Plaintiff's Counsel, #4 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal to State Court, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scott, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Martin & Sheehan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin & Sheehan doing business as Colortyme
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin & Sheehan, Inc. doing business as Colortyme
Represented By: K. Joshua Scott
Represented By: Samuel H. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ileanex Hernandez
Represented By: Robert E. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?