Dominic v. Goldman et al
Plaintiff: Steven Dominic
Defendant: Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Shane R. Stewart, Sharon A. Richardson, Margaret-Ann Moran, Stephen R. Goldman and James J. Bianco, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00148
Filed: February 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (First Amended Complaint) filed by James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Stephen R. Goldman.Follow up on Objection on 4/20/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Smith, Linda)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin on behalf of Margaret-Ann Moran, Sharon A. Richardson Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party Margaret-Ann Moran(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party Sharon A. Richardson(pty:dft).(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(js)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Stephen R. Goldman re: #10 Notice of Attorney Appearance, CORRECTED (Landers, Edwin)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edwin F. Landers, Jr on behalf of James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Stephen R. Goldman Attorney Edwin F. Landers, Jr added to party James J. Bianco, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin F. Landers, Jr added to party Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law(pty:dft), Attorney Edwin F. Landers, Jr added to party Stephen R. Goldman(pty:dft).(Landers, Edwin)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Return of Service Executed as to Sharon A. Richardson by Sharon A. Richardson. Served/Mailed on 3/10/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/31/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law by Steven Dominic. Served/Mailed on 3/15/2021. Answer Follow Up on 4/5/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Stephen R. Goldman by Steven Dominic. Served/Mailed on 3/10/2021. Answer Follow Up on 3/31/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Margaret-Ann Moran by Steven Dominic. Served/Mailed on 3/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 4/6/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Shane R. Stewart by Steven Dominic. Served/Mailed on 3/16/2021. Answer Follow Up on 4/6/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(js)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Stephen R. Goldman. Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party James J. Bianco, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law(pty:dft), Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party Stephen R. Goldman(pty:dft).Follow up on Objection on 4/12/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Smith, Linda)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Stephen R. Goldman, Margaret-Ann Moran, Sharon A. Richardson, Shane R. Stewart filed by Steven Dominic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-11, #2 Exhibit 12-28, #3 Exhibit 29-50)(js)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Stephen R. Goldman, Margaret-Ann Moran, Sharon A. Richardson, Shane R. Stewart. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James J. Bianco, Jr, Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law, Stephen R. Goldman, Margaret-Ann Moran, Sharon A. Richardson, Shane R. Stewart with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 2/11/2021) filed by Steven Dominic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table of Contents, #2 Exhibit 1 - 28 U.S. Code 13910- Venue Generally, #3 Exhibit 2- Bianco PA Website Advertisement, #4 Exhibit 3- Dominic Partial Objection to Goldman's Inventory, #5 Exhibit 4- Judge Moran Order 10/30/2017, #6 Exhibit 5- Attorney Stewart Website Advertisement, #7 Exhibit 6- Attorney Stewart Status Report 2/7/2018, #8 Exhibit 7- CH Records 4/2/2011, #9 Exhibit 8- CH Phone Records 5/9/2011, #10 Exhibit 9- CH Medical Records 5/27/2011, #11 Exhibit 10- Warranty Deed Rye 7/13/2012, #12 Exhibit 11- Limited Power of Attorney 7/13/2012, #13 Exhibit 12- Goldman Letter 12/23/2016, #14 Exhibit 13- RSA 553:3 Preference, #15 Exhibit 14- Judge Moran's Order 4/28/2017 and Elaine's Will, #16 Exhibit 15- Clerk Richardson Notice of Decision 5/11/2014, #17 Exhibit 16- Goldman Letter to Stewart 11/10/17, #18 Goldman Letter to Stewart 9/27/18, #19 Exhibit 18- Dominic Motion for Appointment 8/3/2018, #20 Exhibit 19- Dominic Motion to Too Statute of Limitation, #21 Exhibit 20- Notice of Decision 10/2 and 10/10/2019, #22 Exhibit 21- Motion for Judge Moran Recusal 10/24/19, #23 Exhibit 22- Notice of Decision 10/30/2019, #24 Exhibit 23- RSA 547:15, #25 Exhibit 24- RSA 293-A:2.04, #26 Exhibit 25- Stewart Letter 10/17/19, #27 Cover Letter, #28 Civil Cover Sheet, #29 Envelope, #30 Summonses)(ed)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-148-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominic v. Goldman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bianco Professional Association Attorneys at Law
Represented By: Linda M. Smith
Represented By: Edwin F. Landers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane R. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon A. Richardson
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret-Ann Moran
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen R. Goldman
Represented By: Linda M. Smith
Represented By: Edwin F. Landers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J. Bianco, Jr.
Represented By: Linda M. Smith
Represented By: Edwin F. Landers, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dominic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?