Souther et al v. Mr. Stax, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amber Souther, Rebecca Cook and Jessica Johnson
Defendant: Harold Ceron, Maria Wren, Carlos Monisinos, Oliver Perez, Mr. Stax, Inc., Seabrook Pancakes, Inc. and Charles Monisinos
Case Number: 1:2021cv00180
Filed: February 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Extend Time to Enlarge Service Period for Oliver Perez by Forty-Five (45) Days - Unopposed filed by Rebecca Cook, Jessica Johnson, Amber Souther.Follow up on Objection on 4/19/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Whitney, Mark)
March 30, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 5/12/2021 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 5/5/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE Regarding Service as to Oliver Perez. Affidavit of Service due on 4/7/2021.(js)
March 5, 2021 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Seabrook Pancakes, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lynch, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Mr. Stax, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Lynch, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint with jury demand and affirmative defenses filed by Harold Ceron, Charles Monisinos, Mr. Stax, Inc., Seabrook Pancakes, Inc., Maria Wren.(Lynch, Matthew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Ross Ferguson on behalf of Harold Ceron Attorney Andrew Ross Ferguson added to party Harold Ceron(pty:dft).(Ferguson, Andrew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Ross Ferguson on behalf of Charles Monisinos, Mr. Stax, Inc. Attorney Andrew Ross Ferguson added to party Charles Monisinos(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Ross Ferguson added to party Mr. Stax, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ferguson, Andrew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Ross Ferguson on behalf of Seabrook Pancakes, Inc. Attorney Andrew Ross Ferguson added to party Seabrook Pancakes, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ferguson, Andrew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Ross Ferguson on behalf of Maria Wren Attorney Andrew Ross Ferguson added to party Maria Wren(pty:dft).(Ferguson, Andrew)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 1:21-cv-00180-LM, Rockingham County Superior Court(Lynch, Matthew)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 Addendumto Document #1 -5, Affidavit of Matthew J. Lynch by Mr. Stax, Inc.. (Lynch, Matthew) Modified on 3/2/2021 to link to doc. no. 1.(js)
March 1, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (ed)
March 1, 2021 NOTICE re: #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Mr. Stax, Inc.. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Mr. Stax, Inc. and Seabrook Pancakes, Inc. shall file a disclosure statement by March 8, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 3/8/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
February 26, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-180-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Rockingham Superior, case number 218-2021-CV-00106 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2085978) filed by Mr. Stax, Inc.. Answer Follow Up on 3/19/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of removal to counsel, #3 Notice of removal to state court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Affidavit of counsel with Exhibit A)(Lynch, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Souther et al v. Mr. Stax, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Souther
Represented By: Mark M. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Cook
Represented By: Mark M. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Johnson
Represented By: Mark M. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Ceron
Represented By: Matthew J. Lynch
Represented By: Andrew Ross Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria Wren
Represented By: Matthew J. Lynch
Represented By: Andrew Ross Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Monisinos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliver Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Stax, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Lynch
Represented By: Andrew Ross Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seabrook Pancakes, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J. Lynch
Represented By: Andrew Ross Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Monisinos
Represented By: Matthew J. Lynch
Represented By: Andrew Ross Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?