US Securities and Exchange Commission v. LBRY, Inc.
Plaintiff: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: LBRY, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00260
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Schuman on behalf of LBRY, Inc. Attorney Adam Schuman added to party LBRY, Inc.(pty:dft).(Schuman, Adam)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Keith Miller on behalf of LBRY, Inc. Attorney Keith Miller added to party LBRY, Inc.(pty:dft).(Miller, Keith)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Thomas Dixon on behalf of LBRY, Inc. Attorney John Thomas Dixon added to party LBRY, Inc.(pty:dft).(Dixon, John)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Motion for Adam H. Schuman to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #8 Motion for John T. Dixon to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #9 Motion Keith W. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(vln)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Keith W. Miller to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2112950.) filed by LBRY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Keith W. Miller)(Christie, William)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for John T. Dixon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2112941.) filed by LBRY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of John T. Dixon)(Christie, William)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Adam H. Schuman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2112934.) filed by LBRY, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Adam H. Schuman)(Christie, William)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by LBRY, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Christie, William)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William E. Christie on behalf of LBRY, Inc. Attorney William E. Christie added to party LBRY, Inc.(pty:dft).(Christie, William)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Endorsed Order. This case shall be assigned to another judge. So Ordered by District Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. Case reassigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. (ko)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Forni on behalf of US Securities and Exchange Commission Attorney Eric Forni added to party US Securities and Exchange Commission(pty:pla).(Forni, Eric)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to LBRY, Inc. April 7, 2021 by US Securities and Exchange Commission. Served/Mailed on 4/6/2021. Answer Follow Up on 6/8/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Moores, Peter)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to LBRY, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Joseph A. DiClerico, Jr. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-260-JD. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by US Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Summons)(Jones, Marc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/31/2021: #3 Corrected Signature Block Complaint) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Securities and Exchange Commission v. LBRY, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LBRY, Inc.
Represented By: William E. Christie
Represented By: John Thomas Dixon
Represented By: Keith Miller
Represented By: Adam Schuman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Marc Jonathan Jones
Represented By: Eric Forni
Represented By: Peter Moores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?