Matosantos International Corporation v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Matosantos International Corporation
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company and Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00317
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2021 Filing 6 Addendum/ to #5 MOTION for Kara Thorvaldsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2124817.) (STATEMENT OF CONCURRENCE) by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Sears, Michele)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. (js)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Kara Thorvaldsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2124817.) filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company.Follow up on Objection on 6/28/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Sears, Michele)
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to June 24, 2021 filed by Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. Attorney Michele Carlucci Sears added to party Hartford Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michele Carlucci Sears added to party Twin City Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion)(Sears, Michele)
June 14, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re #5 MOTION for Kara Thorvaldsen to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Twin City Fire Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1- No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 5. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. Compliance Deadline set for 6/18/2021.(js)
April 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summonses issued electronically as to Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
April 22, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-317-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by Matosantos International Corporation disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (O'Neil, Michael)
April 16, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2104061 filed by Matosantos International Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- The Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(O'Neil, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matosantos International Corporation v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matosantos International Corporation
Represented By: Michael K. O'Neil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michele Carlucci Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Michele Carlucci Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?