Arriagada Stuven v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: PEDRO RAMON ARRIAGADA STUVEN
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, Chad Wolf, Senior Official Perm Kenneth Cuccinelli, US Citizenship and Immigration Services, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary, US Department of Homeland Security and US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director
Case Number: 1:2021cv00359
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0701
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Stay. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Status Report due by 7/6/2021 and every thirty (30) days thereafter, as necessary.(vln)
May 25, 2021 Filing 18 Joint Assented to MOTION to Stay Proceedings filed by Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Fresco, Leon)
May 17, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leon Fresco on behalf of Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven (Fresco, Leon)
May 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney Worcester on behalf of Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven (Leon Fresco) (Worcester, Courtney)
May 14, 2021 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #16 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven. The login and password used must equal the /s/ name on the pleading. Attorney Leon Fresco, after obtaining e-filing access, must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 5/21/2021.(vln)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leon Fresco to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(vln)
May 11, 2021 Filing 15 Notice to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Robert J. Rabuck. Attorney Jeremy S. Simon terminated. Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party US Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J. Rabuck added to party US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary(pty:dft).(Rabuck, Robert)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Leon Fresco to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2112418.) filed by Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven. Certain exhibit(s) maintained conventionally in Clerks Office. (Attorney filers must submit conventional materials to the court within 72 hours.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Worcester, Courtney)
May 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Courtney Worcester on behalf of Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven Attorney Courtney Worcester added to party Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven(pty:pla).(Worcester, Courtney)
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Jeremy S. Simon must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (mc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. (mc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (mc)
May 3, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-359-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of Leon Fresco, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (mc)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number: 1:20-cv-02937. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
April 30, 2021 Filing 8 Case transferred to the USDC for the New Hampshire pursuant to Order on Motion to Transfer Case,,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time to,,, Sent to Court via extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #7 Consent Motion to to Transfer Case to the District of New Hampshire and for Extension of Time to Answer, it is hereby ORDERED that this case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of New Hampshire. Transfer is due by April 30, 2021. It is further ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within 30 days after this action is docketed in the transferee district. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/16/2021. (lccrc2) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
April 15, 2021 Filing 7 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case to the U.S. District Court for the District of New Hampshire, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Following Transfer by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of #6 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint or to Move to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), Defendants shall file any answer, transfer motion, or response in this matter by April 15, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 2/18/2021. (lccrc2) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
February 12, 2021 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint or to Move to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) Modified event on 2/16/2021 (ztd). [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: In light of #5 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, the following deadline shall apply: Defendants shall file any answer or response to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint by 2/16/2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/16/2020. (lccrc2) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint Or To Move To Transfer Venue Pursuant To 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) by KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Jeremy) Modified on 12/14/2020 (ztd). [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
October 20, 2020 NOTICE OF ERROR re #4 Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant; emailed to leon.fresco@hklaw.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Service for Homeland Security is missing. Please file. (ztd, ) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
October 19, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 10/15/2020, RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/15/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/14/2020.) (Fresco, Leon) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to KENNETH T. CUCCINELLI, GREGORY A. RICHARDSON, UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY, CHAD F. WOLF, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
October 15, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
October 14, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA by Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven #1 Complaint,,, filed by Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven. (Fresco, Leon) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]
October 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-7707172) filed by Pedro Ramon Arriagada Stuven. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Summons 2, #4 Exhibit 3 Part 1, #5 Exhibit 3 Part 2, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Summons 5 Part 1, #8 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #9 Summons DHS, #10 Summons DHS for DOJ, #11 Summons DHS for USAO, #12 Summons Richardson for DOJ, #13 Summons Richardson for USAO, #14 Summons Richardson, #15 Summons Cuccinelli for DOJ, #16 Summons Cuccinelli for USAO, #17 Summons Cuccinelli, #18 Summons USCIS for DOJ, #19 Summons USCIS for USAO, #20 Summons USCIS, #21 Summons Wolf for DOJ, #22 Summons Wolf for USAO, #23 Summons Wolf)(Fresco, Leon) [Transferred from dcd on 5/3/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arriagada Stuven v. US Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GREGORY A. RICHARDSON
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Official Perm Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director
Represented By: Jeremy S. Simon
Represented By: Robert J. Rabuck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEDRO RAMON ARRIAGADA STUVEN
Represented By: Leon Fresco
Represented By: Courtney Worcester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?