InSync Training, LLC v. American Society for Training and Development, Inc.
Plaintiff: InSync Training, LLC
Defendant: American Society for Training and Development, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00594
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dickison, John)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc..Follow up on Objection on 9/10/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Dickison, John)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (doc. no. #14 ). (AP 2.5(a)). Further, no description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-369-5374.(jb)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re #7 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Granted. No pretrial conference will be scheduled until after resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss. Given the issues raised in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) to after the rescheduled pretrial conference. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Objection on 9/14/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ko)
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint to September 14, 2021 filed by InSync Training, LLC.(Sackman, Edward)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John R. Bauer on behalf of American Society for Training and Development, Inc. Attorney John R. Bauer added to party American Society for Training and Development, Inc.(pty:dft).(Bauer, John)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion for John R. Bauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #11 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #10 Assented to MOTION for John R. Bauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2148037.) filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc.. (Dickison, John)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Assented to MOTION for John R. Bauer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2148037.) filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc..(Dickison, John)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc. Document should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(ko)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by American Society for Training and Development, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Dickison, John)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc.. (Dickison, John)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by American Society for Training and Development, Inc.. Attorney John Mark Dickison added to party American Society for Training and Development, Inc.(pty:dft). HEARING REQUESTED.Follow up on Objection on 8/24/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Dickison, John)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lauren Pritchard on behalf of InSync Training, LLC Attorney Lauren Pritchard added to party InSync Training, LLC(pty:pla).(Pritchard, Lauren)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright forwarded this date to the Register of Copyrights, Washington, DC. (ed)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to American Society for Training and Development, Inc. by InSync Training, LLC. Served/Mailed on 7/13/2021. Answer Follow Up on 9/14/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sackman, Edward)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by InSync Training, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Sackman, Edward)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons issued electronically as to American Society for Training and Development, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE re: #1 Complaint - New Case, filed by InSync Training, LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. InSync Training, LLC shall file a disclosure statement by July 20, 2021. Disclosure Statement due 7/20/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ed)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-594-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (receipt number 14649020634) filed by InSync Training, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- License Agreement, #2 Exhibit B -- 2020 Designing Virtual Training Guide, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Sackman, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: InSync Training, LLC v. American Society for Training and Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: InSync Training, LLC
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Represented By: Lauren Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Society for Training and Development, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Bauer
Represented By: John Mark Dickison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?