Peterson v. Dalton, NH, Town of et al
Plaintiff: David Peterson
Defendant: Dalton, NH, Town of, Jessie R. Wentworth, Jo Beth Dudley, Carol Sheltry and Tamela Swan
Case Number: 1:2021cv00606
Filed: July 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dalton, NH, Town of, Jo Beth Dudley, Carol Sheltry, Tamela Swan, Jessie R. Wentworth. Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Dalton, NH, Town of(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Jo Beth Dudley(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Carol Sheltry(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Tamela Swan(pty:dft), Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Jessie R. Wentworth(pty:dft).Follow up on Objection on 9/17/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Dietel, Robert)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order ORDER re Rule 16 Scheduling Order. No pretrial conference will be scheduled until after resolution of the pending Motion to Dismiss (doc. no. #8 ). Given the issues raised in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) to after the rescheduled pretrial conference. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Dalton, NH, Town of, Jo Beth Dudley, Carol Sheltry, Tamela Swan, Jessie R. Wentworth by David Peterson. Served/Mailed on 8/13/2021. Answer Follow Up on 9/3/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re #3 Sealed Document, #4 Sealed Document. Plaintiff David Peterson has filed documents (Doc. Nos. 3, 4) in this case and states they should be filed "in camera." In an abundance of caution, as Mr. Peterson is representing himself in this action, the Court has placed the documents under provisional seal pending his response to this Order. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(ko)
August 2, 2021 Filing 4 SEALED Silver Surety Bond filed by David Peterson.(ko)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 SEALED In Camera Ledger filed by David Peterson.(ko)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to Dalton, NH, Town of, Jo Beth Dudley, Carol Sheltry, Tamela Swan, Jessie R. Wentworth. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
July 20, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
July 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dalton, NH, Town of, Jo Beth Dudley, Carol Sheltry, Tamela Swan, Jessie R. Wentworth with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 7.19.2021) filed by David Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Summonses) (ed)
July 19, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-606-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peterson v. Dalton, NH, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dalton, NH, Town of
Represented By: Robert Joseph Dietel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessie R. Wentworth
Represented By: Robert Joseph Dietel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Beth Dudley
Represented By: Robert Joseph Dietel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Sheltry
Represented By: Robert Joseph Dietel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamela Swan
Represented By: Robert Joseph Dietel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?