Brookline Opportunities, LLC et al v. Brookline, NH, Town of et al
Plaintiff: Brookline Opportunities, LLC and Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Town of Brookline, NH, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH and Brookline, NH, Town of
Case Number: 1:2021cv00770
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Motion for Michael Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Motion for Reed Colfax to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #16 Motion for VALERIE D. COMENENCIA ORTIZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(vln)
November 5, 2021 Filing 17 Addendum/ to #14 MOTION for Michael Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2177822.), #16 MOTION for VALERIE D. COMENENCIA ORTIZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2177839.), #15 MOTION for Reed Colfax to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2177837.) Statement of Concurrence Regarding Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC. (Carrier, Megan)
November 2, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Documents re #14 MOTION for Michael Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #15 MOTION for Reed Colfax to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #16 MOTION for VALERIE D. COMENENCIA ORTIZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC, Brookline Opportunities, LLC. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1-No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to documents no. 14,15,16. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. Compliance Deadline set for 11/12/2021.(vln)
October 29, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for VALERIE D. COMENENCIA ORTIZ to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2177839.) filed by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 11/12/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of VALERIE D. COMENENCIA ORTIZ)(Carrier, Megan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Reed Colfax to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2177837.) filed by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 11/12/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Reed Colfax)(Carrier, Megan)
October 29, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Michael Allen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2177822.) filed by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC.Follow up on Objection on 11/12/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) of Michael Allen)(Carrier, Megan)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Laplante recused. Case to be reassigned to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
October 29, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Laplante recused. The new case designation is: 21-cv-770-PB. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (jb)
October 29, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2021 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 12/13/2021. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
October 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amanda Ellen Quinlan on behalf of Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH Attorney Amanda Ellen Quinlan added to party Brookline, NH, Town of(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Ellen Quinlan added to party Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH(pty:dft), Attorney Amanda Ellen Quinlan added to party Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH(pty:dft).(Quinlan, Amanda)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alexandra Saanen Cote on behalf of Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH Attorney Alexandra Saanen Cote added to party Brookline, NH, Town of(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Saanen Cote added to party Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH(pty:dft), Attorney Alexandra Saanen Cote added to party Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH(pty:dft).(Cote, Alexandra)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven J. Dutton on behalf of Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH (Dutton, Steven)
October 27, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, with jury demand filed by Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH.(Dutton, Steven)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH (Patricia Howard-Barnett, Town Clerk; Valerie Rearick, Town Planner) by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC. Served/Mailed on 10/6/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/27/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carrier, Megan)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH (Eddie Arnold, Vice Chair of the Selectboard of the Town of Brookline; Alan Rosenberg, Chair of the Planning Board) by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC. Served/Mailed on 10/1/2021. Answer Follow Up on 10/22/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Carrier, Megan)
September 28, 2021 Filing 6 Summonses issued electronically as to Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver - Town of Brookline - Eddie Arnold, #2 Summons - Waiver - Selectboard of Town of Brookline - Patricia Howard-Barnett, #3 Summons - Waiver - Selectboard of the Town of Brookline- Eddie Arnold, #4 Summons - Waiver - Planning Board of the Town of Brookline - Valerie Rearick, #5 Summons - Waiver - Planning Board of the Town of Brookline - Alan Rosenberg)(Carrier, Megan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Carrier, Megan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 3 Disclosure Statement by Brookline Opportunities, LLC disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Carrier, Megan)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Brookline, NH, Town of, Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH, Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
September 22, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
September 21, 2021 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-770-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2162479 filed by Brookline Opportunities, LLC, Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver - Town of Brookline, #3 Summons - Waiver - Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, #4 Summons - Waiver - Planning Board of the Town of Brookline)(Carrier, Megan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookline Opportunities, LLC et al v. Brookline, NH, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookline Opportunities, LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamposi Brothers Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Megan C. Carrier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Brookline, NH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning Board of the Town of Brookline, NH
Represented By: Alexandra Saanen Cote
Represented By: Amanda Ellen Quinlan
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selectboard of the Town of Brookline, NH
Represented By: Alexandra Saanen Cote
Represented By: Amanda Ellen Quinlan
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brookline, NH, Town of
Represented By: Alexandra Saanen Cote
Represented By: Amanda Ellen Quinlan
Represented By: Steven J. Dutton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?