Jespersen et al v. Colony Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Mrs. Margaret Jespersen, Mr. David Jespersen, Margaret Jespersen and David Jespersen
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
3Rd Party Defendant: JPKS Management LLC and Penuches Sports and Music Complex LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00846
Filed: October 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Return of Service Executed as to Penuches Sports and Music Complex LLC by Colony Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 12/10/2021. Answer Follow Up on 1/3/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Boesch, William)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to JPKS Management LLC by Colony Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 12/10/2021. Answer Follow Up on 1/3/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Boesch, William)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint,, Third Party Complaint,, Counterclaim, (Answer to Counterclaim) by David Jespersen, Margaret Jespersen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Insurance)(Felmly, Bruce)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Third Party Summons Issued Electronically as to JPKS Management LLC, Penuches Sports and Music Complex LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (ed)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS/WAIVER by Colony Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Summons - Waiver)(Boesch, William)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Reason for Reassignment: No Consent to Magistrate Judge. The new case designation is: 21-cv-846-JL. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(vln)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Felmly, Bruce)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint - New Case, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against JPKS Management LLC, Penuches Sports and Music Complex LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Colony Insurance Company.(Boesch, William)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Disclosure Statement by Colony Insurance Company disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Boesch, William)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William L. Boesch on behalf of Colony Insurance Company Attorney William L. Boesch added to party Colony Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Boesch, William)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Colony Insurance Company by Margaret Jespersen, David Jespersen. Served/Mailed on 10/21/2021. Answer Follow Up on 12/23/2021. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Felmly, Bruce)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Graham Steadman on behalf of David Jespersen, Margaret Jespersen Attorney Graham Steadman added to party David Jespersen(pty:pla), Attorney Graham Steadman added to party Margaret Jespersen(pty:pla).(Steadman, Graham)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin B. Folsom on behalf of David Jespersen, Margaret Jespersen Attorney Benjamin B. Folsom added to party David Jespersen(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin B. Folsom added to party Margaret Jespersen(pty:pla).(Folsom, Benjamin)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Colony Insurance Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ed)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. (ed)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-846-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Fee Paid ANHDC-2174037) filed by Margaret Jespersen, David Jespersen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commercial General Liability Coverage Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order re Default Judgment and Pltfs' Award, #3 Exhibit 3 - Manchester Ordinance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Waiver)(Felmly, Bruce) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/22/2021: #6 Notice of Lawsuit, #7 Waiver of Service) (ed).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jespersen et al v. Colony Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mrs. Margaret Jespersen
Represented By: Bruce W. Felmly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. David Jespersen
Represented By: Bruce W. Felmly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Jespersen
Represented By: Benjamin B. Folsom
Represented By: Graham Steadman
Represented By: Bruce W. Felmly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Jespersen
Represented By: Benjamin B. Folsom
Represented By: Graham Steadman
Represented By: Bruce W. Felmly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colony Insurance Company
Represented By: William L. Boesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: JPKS Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Penuches Sports and Music Complex LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?