Martel v. Hillsborough County et al
Plaintiff: Stephanie Martel
Defendant: Hillsborough County, Bryanna Gue, Erica Gustafson, Katelyn Hrubiec and Samuel Mutungi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00880
Filed: November 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Samuel Mutungi by Stephanie Martel. Served/Mailed on 12/7/2021. Answer Follow Up on 2/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
November 30, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Bryanna Gue, Erica Gustafson, Hillsborough County, Katelyn Hrubiec by Stephanie Martel. Served/Mailed on 11/23/2021. Answer Follow Up on 1/25/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Vogelman, Lawrence)
November 29, 2021 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Reason for Reassignment: No Consent to Magistrate Judge. The new case designation is: 21-cv-880-JL. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings.(vln)
November 24, 2021 Filing 5 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Vogelman, Lawrence)
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Bryanna Gue, Erica Gustafson, Hillsborough County, Katelyn Hrubiec, Samuel Mutungi. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ed)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Brittani Schanstine, Esq. must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 12/10/2021. (ed)
November 10, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
November 9, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-880-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
November 9, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2181393 filed by Est. of Robert Martel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice to Gue, #3 Notice to Gustafson, #4 Notice to Hillsborough County, #5 Notice to Hrubiec, #6 Notice to Mutungi, #7 Waiver of Service - Gue, #8 Waiver of Service - Gustafson, #9 Waiver of Service - Hillsborough County, #10 Waiver of Service - Hrubiec, #11 Waiver of Service - Mutungi)(Vogelman, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martel v. Hillsborough County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Martel
Represented By: Lawrence A. Vogelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hillsborough County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryanna Gue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Gustafson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katelyn Hrubiec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Mutungi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?