Parziale v. Bladecki
Plaintiff: Christine Parziale
Defendant: Joseph Bladecki and Joseph Bladecki doing business as The Boulders Motel & Cottage
Case Number: 1:2021cv01030
Filed: December 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2022 TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 2/22/2023 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2023 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 1/18/2023. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 2/1/2023. Summary Judgment Motions due by 10/1/2022.(vln)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER approving in part #10 Discovery Plan ; granting #11 Motion to waive and cancel pre-trial conference. Text of Order: The parties discovery plan (10) is approved and adopted as the scheduling order in this case with the following modifications: The parties shall exchange mandatory disclosures (Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)) on or before March 2, 2022. The close of discovery deadline is set for December 23, 2022. The parties shall file a joint report on the status of discovery 60 days prior to the close of discovery. Trial is scheduled for the two week period beginning February 22, 2023. As a result, the motion to waive and cancel the pretrial conference (11) is granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(vln)
January 18, 2022 Filing 11 Joint Assented to MOTION waive and cancel pre-trial conference set for February 16, 2022 filed by Christine Parziale.(Grant, Christopher)
January 18, 2022 Filing 10 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Christine Parziale. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Grant, Christopher)
December 30, 2021 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting: #9 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer. Text of Order: Granted So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 2/1/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (bt)
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 2/1/22 filed by Joseph Bladecki.(Getman, Naomi)
December 29, 2021 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Strike #4 Answer to Complaint filed by Joseph Bladecki.(Getman, Naomi)
December 29, 2021 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed as to Joseph Bladecki d/b/a The Boulder Motel & Cottage by Christine Parziale. Served/Mailed on 12/14/2021. Answer Follow Up on 1/4/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Grant, Christopher)
December 29, 2021 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Getman, Naomi)
December 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Naomi L. Getman on behalf of Joseph Bladecki d/b/a The Boulders Motel and Cottages Attorney Naomi L. Getman added to party Joseph Bladecki(pty:dft).(Getman, Naomi)
December 28, 2021 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/16/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Discovery Plan DUE BY 2/9/2022. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(vln)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Joseph Bladecki.(vln)
December 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to Joseph Bladecki. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate) (ed)
December 3, 2021 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
December 2, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. (ed)
December 2, 2021 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-1030-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
December 2, 2021 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2190876 filed by Christine Parziale. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grant, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parziale v. Bladecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Parziale
Represented By: Christopher E. Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bladecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Bladecki doing business as The Boulders Motel & Cottage
Represented By: Naomi L. Getman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?