Verogna v. Johnstone et al
Plaintiff: Sensa Verogna
Defendant: Andrea Johnstone, Steven J. McAuliffe, Julie E. Schwartz and Jonathan M. Eck
Case Number: 1:2021cv01047
Filed: December 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with #13 Order. Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. (Case Closed). (de) (de).
January 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ///ORDER granting #8 Motion to File an Oversized MOL in Support (Exceed Page Limit); denying #9 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Recuse; denying as moot #11 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Alternative Service of Summons. The Complaint is dismissed without leave to amend. Clerk is directed to close the case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edwin F. Landers, Jr on behalf of Jonathan M. Eck (Landers, Edwin)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Attached Motion for Alternative Service of Summons filed by Sensa Verogna.Follow up on Objection on 2/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edwin F. Landers, Jr on behalf of Jonathan M. Eck Attorney Edwin F. Landers, Jr added to party Jonathan M. Eck(pty:dft).(Landers, Edwin)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Motion, MOL and Declaration in Support to Recuse filed by Sensa Verogna.Follow up on Objection on 2/4/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Motion and Memorandum)(de)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to File an Oversized MOL in Support (Exceed Page Limits) filed by Sensa Verogna.Follow up on Objection on 2/4/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(de)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Summons issued electronically as to Andrea Johnstone. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Summons issued electronically as to Steven J. McAuliffe. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Copies of Waivers of Service of Summons by Sensa Verogna. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service)(js)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Julie E. Schwartz by Julie E. Schwartz. Served/Mailed on 12/7/2021. Answer Follow Up on 2/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Bagatell, Dan)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dan L. Bagatell on behalf of Julie E. Schwartz Attorney Dan L. Bagatell added to party Julie E. Schwartz(pty:dft).(Bagatell, Dan)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jonathan M. Eck by Jonathan M. Eck. Attorney Linda M. Smith added to party Jonathan M. Eck(pty:dft). Served/Mailed on 12/7/2021. Answer Follow Up on 2/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Smith, Linda)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:21-cv-1047-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jonathan M. Eck, Andrea Johnstone, Steven J. McAuliffe, Julie E. Schwartz with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 14649021020) filed by Sensa Verogna. (Attachments: #1 Exhibts 001 - 076, #2 Notice of Lawsuits) (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verogna v. Johnstone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sensa Verogna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea Johnstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven J. McAuliffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie E. Schwartz
Represented By: Dan L. Bagatell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan M. Eck
Represented By: Edwin F. Landers, Jr.
Represented By: Linda M. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?