Easler et al v. US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee et al
Plaintiff: Brian Easler and Stephanie Easler
Defendant: US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust, Fay Servicing LLC and US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Case Number: 1:2022cv00090
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Samantha D Elliott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2022 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 6/2/2022 11:00 AM, via video conference, before Judge Samantha D. Elliott. Follow up on Discovery Plan 5/27/2022. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(lw)
April 25, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fay Servicing LLC, US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Seeley, Donald)
April 25, 2022 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fay Servicing LLC, US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. (Lake, Hale)
April 25, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fay Servicing LLC, US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee.Follow up on Objection on 5/9/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Lake, Hale)
April 25, 2022 NOTICE of ECF Filing Errors re: #10 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee, Fay Servicing LLC, #11 Affidavit in Support of Motion, filed by US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee, Fay Servicing LLC. (1.) Documents should have been filed as an attachment to the main document (AP 2.5(a)); AND (2.) No description of exhibits or attachments was included. Exhibits or attachments shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.(lw)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott. (vln)
March 23, 2022 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Fay Servicing LLC, US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee.(Seeley, Donald)
March 22, 2022 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Fay Servicing LLC disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Seeley, Donald)
March 22, 2022 Filing 6 Disclosure Statement by US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Seeley, Donald)
March 17, 2022 Filing 5 OBJECTION to #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FORECOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 17TH, 2022 AT 2:00 PM FILED WIHTOUT NOTICE filed by Fay Servicing LLC, US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee. Follow up on Reply on 3/24/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Lake, Hale)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Re: #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Text of Order: For the reasons stated in the defendants' objection, the motion for a temporary restraining order (doc. no, 4) is denied. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
March 16, 2022 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FORECOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 17TH, 2022 AT 2:00 PM FILED WIHTOUT NOTICE filed by Brian Easler, Stephanie Easler.Follow up on Objection on 3/30/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Propsed temporary restraining order)(Mathews, Keith)
March 16, 2022 NOTICE of VIDEO CONFERENCE re: #4 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order FORECOSURE SALE SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 17TH, 2022 AT 2:00 PM FILED WITHOUT NOTICE. VIDEO Conference set for 3/17/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
March 15, 2022 Filing 3 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 217-2022-CV-00429, Merrimack County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record - Part 2 of 3, #2 Exhibit State Court Record - Part 3 of 3)(Lake, Hale)
March 15, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE. (mc)
March 15, 2022 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee, Fay Servicing LLC. Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed after filing case initiating document. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee, Fay Servicing LLC shall file a disclosure statement by March 22, 2022. Disclosure Statement due 3/22/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
March 10, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-90-SE. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 10, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Donald W. Seeley, Jr on behalf of Fay Servicing LLC, US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust Attorney Donald W. Seeley, Jr added to party Fay Servicing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Donald W. Seeley, Jr added to party US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust(pty:dft).(Seeley, Donald)
March 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Merrimack Superior Court, case number 217-2022-CV-00429 (filing fee $402, receipt number ANHDC-2225591) filed by Fay Servicing LLC, US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust. Answer Follow Up on 3/31/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 3/24/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Notice of Removal to State Court and Counsel, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Lake, Hale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Easler et al v. US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Easler
Represented By: Keith A. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Easler
Represented By: Keith A. Mathews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust National Association as Owner Trustee for VRMTG Asset Trust
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fay Servicing LLC
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Bank Trust National Association, Trustee
Represented By: Donald W. Seeley, Jr.
Represented By: Hale Yazicioglu Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?