Human Rights Defense Center v. Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire et al
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire, County Administrator Raymond F. Bower, Superintendent Christopher Brackett and John and Jane Does, 1-10
Case Number: 1:2022cv00091
Filed: March 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to June 6, 2022 filed by Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire, Raymond F. Bower, Christopher Brackett.(Friedman, Christine)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to June 6, 2022. Text of Order: Granted. Motion to Extend Time to Answer and/or to Respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Answer Follow Up on 6/6/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla)
April 14, 2022 Filing 17 Addendum/ to #16 MOTION for Jesse W. Isom to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2237731.) by Human Rights Defense Center. (Sackman, Edward)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Jesse W. Isom to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Assented to). Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(de)
April 13, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Jesse W. Isom to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2237731.) filed by Human Rights Defense Center.Follow up on Objection on 4/27/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of J. Isom, #2 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Sackman, Edward)
April 13, 2022 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. STATUS CONFERENCE held on 4/13/2022 via video conference. (Court Reporter: Susan Bateman) (Pltfs Atty: Edward Sackman) (Defts Atty: Chris Friedman)(Total Hearing Time: 12 minutes) (de)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER. Text of Order: On today's date, the court held a video conference in this case. Attorney Edward Sackman appeared for plaintiff, and Attorney Christine Friedman appeared for defendants. Counsel indicated that they are working with their clients on a negotiated resolution or at least a narrowing of issues in dispute. In light of that, the court postpones issuing a scheduling order. Counsel shall file jointly, on or before May 11, 2022, a proposed scheduling order for a preliminary injunction hearing. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
April 4, 2022 NOTICE of Hearing. Status Conference set for 4/13/2022 at 11:30 AM Via VIDEO CONFERENCE before Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend Time to May 6, 2022. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer and to Respond to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). In addition, a Status Conference via video shall be scheduled for April 13, 2022 at 11:30 a.m. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Answer Follow Up on 5/6/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla)
April 1, 2022 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to May 6, 2022 filed by Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire, Raymond F. Bower, Christopher Brackett.(Friedman, Christine)
April 1, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christine Friedman on behalf of Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire, Raymond F. Bower, Christopher Brackett Attorney Christine Friedman added to party Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire(pty:dft), Attorney Christine Friedman added to party Raymond F. Bower(pty:dft), Attorney Christine Friedman added to party Christopher Brackett(pty:dft).(Friedman, Christine)
March 30, 2022 Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Christopher Brackett by Human Rights Defense Center. Served/Mailed on 3/21/2022. Answer Follow Up on 4/11/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sackman, Edward)
March 30, 2022 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Raymond F. Bower by Human Rights Defense Center. Served/Mailed on 3/16/2022.(Sackman, Edward)
March 30, 2022 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire by Human Rights Defense Center. Served/Mailed on 3/16/2022. Answer Follow Up on 4/6/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sackman, Edward)
March 14, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Exceed Page Limit in Memorandum In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Text of Order: Granted. Defendants will be permitted the same extension. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. (gla)
March 14, 2022 Filing 10 Exhibit J - Corrected Exhibit 1 to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Human Rights Defense Center.(Sackman, Edward)
March 14, 2022 Filing 9 Exhibit I - Corrected Exhibit 1 to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Human Rights Defense Center.(Sackman, Edward)
March 14, 2022 Filing 8 Exhibit H - Corrected Exhibit 1 to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Human Rights Defense Center.(Sackman, Edward)
March 14, 2022 Filing 7 Exhibit G - Corrected Exhibit 1 to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Human Rights Defense Center.(Sackman, Edward)
March 11, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Miller on behalf of Human Rights Defense Center Attorney Matthew Miller added to party Human Rights Defense Center(pty:pla).(Miller, Matthew)
March 11, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward J. Sackman on behalf of Human Rights Defense Center (Sackman, Edward)
March 11, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Exceed Page Limit in Memorandum In Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Human Rights Defense Center.Follow up on Objection on 3/25/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sackman, Edward)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Human Rights Defense Center.Follow up on Objection on 3/25/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit A, #4 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit B, #5 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit C, #6 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit D- 1 of 2, #7 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit D- 2 of 2, #8 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit E- 1 of 2, #9 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit E- 2 of 2, #10 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit F, #11 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit G, #12 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit H, #13 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit I, #14 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit J, #15 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit K, #16 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit L, #17 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit M, #18 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit N, #19 Attachment to Exhibit Exhibit 1- Exhibit O, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #21 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sackman, Edward)
March 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summonses issued electronically as to Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire, Raymond F. Bower, Christopher Brackett, John and Jane Does, 1-10. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF) (mc)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2226194 filed by Human Rights Defense Center. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver Board of County Commissioners, #3 Summons - Waiver Raymond Bower, #4 Summons - Waiver Christopher Brackett)(Sackman, Edward)
March 11, 2022 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-91-LM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
March 11, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Human Rights Defense Center v. Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Human Rights Defense Center
Represented By: Matthew Miller
Represented By: Edward J. Sackman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners For Strafford County, New Hampshire
Represented By: Christine Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County Administrator Raymond F. Bower
Represented By: Christine Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Christopher Brackett
Represented By: Christine Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does, 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?