Lewis et al v. Abramson
Plaintiff: Robert Patrick Lewis, Philip A Luelsdorff, 1AP, Inc. and Philip A. Luelsdorff
Defendant: Seth Abramson
Case Number: 1:2022cv00126
Filed: April 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2022 Filing 11 Disclosure Statement by 1AP, Inc. disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Gould, Bryan)
June 10, 2022 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error: Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rules, Disclosure Statements must be filed. No Disclosure Statement has been filed. 1AP, Inc. must file a Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423. Disclosure Statement due 6/17/2022. (lw)
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Gould, Bryan)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by 1AP, Inc., Robert Patrick Lewis, Philip A. Luelsdorff. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Gould, Bryan)
May 31, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William E. Christie on behalf of Seth Abramson Attorney William E. Christie added to party Seth Abramson(pty:dft).(Christie, William)
May 25, 2022 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 6/30/2022 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 6/23/2022. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
May 24, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Timothy John McLaughlin on behalf of Seth Abramson Attorney Timothy John McLaughlin added to party Seth Abramson(pty:dft).(McLaughlin, Timothy)
May 23, 2022 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Seth Abramson by All Plaintiffs. Served/Mailed on 5/20/2022. Answer Follow Up on 7/22/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Gould, Bryan)
April 29, 2022 Filing 5 Summons and Waiver issued electronically as to Seth Abramson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
April 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Morgan Tanafon on behalf of 1AP, Inc., Robert Patrick Lewis, Philip A. Luelsdorff Attorney Morgan Tanafon added to party 1AP, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Morgan Tanafon added to party Robert Patrick Lewis(pty:pla), Attorney Morgan Tanafon added to party Philip A. Luelsdorff(pty:pla).(Tanafon, Morgan)
April 21, 2022 Filing 3 * FILED IN ERROR - REPLACED BY DOC #5 -- Summons and Waiver issued electronically as to Seth Abramson. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc) Modified on 4/29/2022 to add: FILED IN ERROR (mc).
April 19, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 6/6/2022.(mc)
April 15, 2022 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-126-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
April 15, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2238861 filed by Robert Patrick Lewis, 1AP, Inc., Philip A Luelsdorff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gould, Bryan) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/21/2022: #2 Service Documents) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis et al v. Abramson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Patrick Lewis
Represented By: Bryan K. Gould
Represented By: Morgan Tanafon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A Luelsdorff
Represented By: Bryan K. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1AP, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan K. Gould
Represented By: Morgan Tanafon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip A. Luelsdorff
Represented By: Morgan Tanafon
Represented By: Bryan K. Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Abramson
Represented By: Timothy John McLaughlin
Represented By: William E. Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?