TIG Insurance Company v. National Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: TIG Insurance Company
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2022cv00165
Filed: May 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Samantha D Elliott
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2022 Filing 27 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Nebraska filed by National Indemnity Company. Surreply due by 7/13/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Supplemental Declaration of Donald Wurster)(Netburn, Peter)
July 8, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Knoerzer on behalf of National Indemnity Company Attorney Michael Knoerzer added to party National Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Knoerzer, Michael)
July 8, 2022 Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter Dinunzio on behalf of National Indemnity Company Attorney Peter Dinunzio added to party National Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Dinunzio, Peter)
July 7, 2022 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #20 Objection to Motion,, filed by TIG Insurance Company, #21 Exhibit filed by TIG Insurance Company. No description of exhibit or attachment was included. Exhibit or attachment shall be followed by a short description of the document and shall not exceed five words. AP 2.5(a). See #Properly Attach Exhibits to Pleadings in ECF. NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-226-7733.(vln)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Motion for Leave to File Oversized Reply. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
July 6, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File Oversized Reply (Unobjected to) filed by National Indemnity Company.Follow up on Objection on 7/20/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Netburn, Peter)
July 6, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin John O'Connor on behalf of National Indemnity Company Attorney Kevin John O'Connor added to party National Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(O'Connor, Kevin)
July 5, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian O'Sullivan on behalf of TIG Insurance Company Attorney Brian O'Sullivan added to party TIG Insurance Company(pty:pla).(O'Sullivan, Brian)
July 1, 2022 Filing 21 Exhibit 16 to #20 Objection to Motion,,, by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 17, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19, #4 Exhibit 20, #5 Exhibit 21, #6 Exhibit 22)(Hamilton, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Filing 20 OBJECTION to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Nebraska filed by TIG Insurance Company. Follow up on Reply on 7/8/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of William Bouvier, #3 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Brian J. O'Sullivan, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, Part 1, #11 Exhibit 7, Part 2, #12 Exhibit 8, Part 1, #13 Exhibit 8, Part 2, #14 Exhibit 9, #15 Exhibit 10, #16 Exhibit 11, #17 Exhibit 12, #18 Exhibit 13, #19 Exhibit 14, #20 Exhibit 15)(Hamilton, Andrew)
July 1, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Assented to Motion for Kevin J. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #18 Assented to Motion for Michael A. Knoerzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #19 assented to Motion for Peter J. Dinunzio to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(lw)
June 30, 2022 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION for Peter J. Dinunzio to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2265998.) filed by National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Peter J. Dinunzio)(Netburn, Peter)
June 30, 2022 Filing 18 Assented to MOTION for Michael A. Knoerzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2265993.) filed by National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Michael A. Knoerzer)(Netburn, Peter)
June 29, 2022 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION for Kevin J. O'Connor to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2265684.) filed by National Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Kevin J. O'Connor)(Netburn, Peter)
June 24, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam Singer on behalf of TIG Insurance Company Attorney Adam Singer added to party TIG Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Singer, Adam)
June 24, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harry P. Cohen on behalf of TIG Insurance Company Attorney Harry P. Cohen added to party TIG Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Cohen, Harry)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion for Harry P. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Assented to Motion for Brian J. O'Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Assented to Motion for Adam J. Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorneys with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorneys must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorneys must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(lw)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond re: #7 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott. Follow up on Objection on 7/1/2022. (lw)
June 20, 2022 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Adam J. Singer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2262009.) filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Adam J. Singer)(Hamilton, Andrew)
June 20, 2022 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Brian J. O'Sullivan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2262008.) filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Brian J. O'Sullivan)(Hamilton, Andrew)
June 20, 2022 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Harry P. Cohen to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2262007.) filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration of Harry P. Cohen)(Hamilton, Andrew)
June 20, 2022 Filing 11 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Nebraska to July 1, 2022 filed by TIG Insurance Company.(Hamilton, Andrew)
June 10, 2022 NOTICE of ECF Filing Error re: #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by National Indemnity Company, #9 Affidavit in Support of Motion filed by National Indemnity Company. Documents should have been filed as attachments to the Motion to Dismiss (AP 2.5(a)). NO ACTION REQUIRED - FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY AND MERELY INTENDED TO EDUCATE ALL PARTIES IN THE CASE. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-226-7733.(vln)
June 10, 2022 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 7/25/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Samantha D. Elliott. Discovery Plan DUE BY 7/18/2022. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(vln)
June 9, 2022 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by National Indemnity Company disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Netburn, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Nebraska of Donald Wurster filed by National Indemnity Company. (Netburn, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Nebraska filed by National Indemnity Company. (Netburn, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer to the District of Nebraska filed by National Indemnity Company.Follow up on Objection on 6/23/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Netburn, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Peter C. Netburn on behalf of National Indemnity Company Attorney Peter C. Netburn added to party National Indemnity Company(pty:dft).(Netburn, Peter)
June 9, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint as to National Indemnity Company filed by TIG Insurance Company. Served/Mailed on 6/3/2022. Answer Follow Up on 6/24/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Hamilton, Andrew)
May 12, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott H. Harris on behalf of TIG Insurance Company Attorney Scott H. Harris added to party TIG Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Harris, Scott)
May 12, 2022 Filing 3 Summons issued electronically as to National Indemnity Company. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (mc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/12/2022: #1 Notice ECF) (mc).
May 12, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
May 11, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-165-SE. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
May 11, 2022 Filing 2 Disclosure Statement by TIG Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Hamilton, Andrew)
May 11, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2248258 filed by TIG Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Hamilton, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TIG Insurance Company v. National Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIG Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew Ryan Hamilton
Represented By: Harry P. Cohen
Represented By: Scott H. Harris
Represented By: Adam Singer
Represented By: Brian O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Indemnity Company
Represented By: Michael Knoerzer
Represented By: Peter C. Netburn
Represented By: Kevin John O'Connor
Represented By: Peter Dinunzio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?