USA v. McCord Corporation
Plaintiff: United States of America and USA
Defendant: McCord Corporation
Consolidated Plaintiff: NH, State of, Dept of Environmental Services
Case Number: 1:2022cv00289
Filed: August 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Steven J McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 9607 Real Property Tort to Land (CERCLA)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2022 Filing 16 CONSOLIDATED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by NH, State of, Dept of Environmental Services, USA. Answer to Consolidated Complaint Follow Up 10/20/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Harrison, Natalie)
September 20, 2022 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion for Lauren M. Karam to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #13 Assented to Motion for Eric L. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #14 Assented to Motion for Marc J. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #15 Assented to Motion for James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(lw)
September 19, 2022 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION for James B. Slaughter to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2292735.) filed by McCord Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Lucic, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Filing 14 Assented to MOTION for Marc J. Goldstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2292733.) filed by McCord Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Lucic, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION for Eric L. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2292731.) filed by McCord Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Lucic, Robert)
September 19, 2022 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION for Lauren M. Karam to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2292720.) filed by McCord Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Lucic, Robert)
September 13, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas S. Burack on behalf of McCord Corporation Attorney Thomas S. Burack added to party McCord Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney Thomas S. Burack added to party McCord Corporation(pty:dft).(Burack, Thomas)
September 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSOLIDATION ORDER. 22-cv-289-SM & 22-cv-317-JL are consolidated into one case. 22-cv-317-JL is statistically closed. So Ordered by Judge Steven J. McAuliffe.(lw)
September 1, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of No Objection to Consolidation by USA.(Harrison, Natalie)
August 18, 2022 Filing 8 Potential CONSOLIDATION Notice. Cases 22-cv-317-JL and 22-cv-289-SM reference each other as related cases and may be consolidated. Objections to Consolidation due 10/3/2022.(ed)
August 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Abbygale Sarah Martinen on behalf of McCord Corporation Attorney Abbygale Sarah Martinen added to party McCord Corporation(pty:dft).(Martinen, Abbygale)
August 16, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryanna Kleber Devonshire on behalf of McCord Corporation Attorney Bryanna Kleber Devonshire added to party McCord Corporation(pty:dft).(Devonshire, Bryanna)
August 16, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert R. Lucic on behalf of McCord Corporation Attorney Robert R. Lucic added to party McCord Corporation(pty:dft).(Lucic, Robert)
August 8, 2022 Filing 4 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to McCord Corporation. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiver and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alison L. Kelly on behalf of United States of America Attorney Alison L. Kelly added to party United States of America(pty:pla).(Kelly, Alison)
August 8, 2022 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to McCord Corporation by United States of America. Served/Mailed on 8/5/2022. Answer Follow Up on 10/7/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Service)(Harrison, Natalie)
August 8, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 2, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Steven J. McAuliffe. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-289-SM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver)(Harrison, Natalie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. McCord Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Natalie G Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Alison L. Kelly
Represented By: Natalie G Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCord Corporation
Represented By: Abbygale Sarah Martinen
Represented By: Bryanna Kleber Devonshire
Represented By: Robert R. Lucic
Represented By: Thomas S. Burack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: NH, State of, Dept of Environmental Services
Represented By: Joshua Connor Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?