Nice v. US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Michele Nice
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Not Classified By Court: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00369
Filed: September 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Samantha D Elliott
Referring Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, Nice is given an additional 60 days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint as directed in the prior order. Doc. no. 4. Absent good cause shown no further extensions of time will be allowed. Failure to respond to this order will result in dismissal of the case without prejudice due to a lack of subject matter jurisdiction. ( Amended Pleadings due by 1/13/2023.) So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(lw)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re: #1 SSA Complaint - Nice is directed to file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order that shows she has received a final decision from the Commissioner of Social Security on her claim for benefits. Nice shall file a copy of the notice that she received of that decision with her amended complaint. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal of this case. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2022.)(lw)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs.. Text of Order: Plaintiffs request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ed)
September 28, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Michele Nice. (ed)
September 28, 2022 Application complete - case converted to a civil case. Case assigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. New case number is 1:22-cv-369-SE. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Compliance Deadline set for 11/22/2022. (ed)
September 19, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
September 16, 2022 Filing 1 SSA COMPLAINT filed by Michele Nice. SSA Record Due 11/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Records, #2 Records 2) (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nice v. US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Nice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?