Rosato v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Plaintiff: Lisa Rosato
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Social Security Administratrion and US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Not Classified By Court: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only) and US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00516
Filed: November 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Feb. 13, 2023. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 2/13/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to Feb. 13, 2023 filed by US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner. Attorney Michael L. Henry added to party US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner(pty:dft).(Henry, Michael)
December 5, 2022 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner by Lisa Rosato. Served/Mailed on 12/2/2022. Answer Follow Up on 12/23/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Tillinghast, D.)
November 15, 2022 Filing 4 Summonses issued electronically as to US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE case referred to Magistrate Judge for Report & Recommendation. Copy of SSA Order of Reference attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice in SSA Case, #3 SSA - ADM Order of Reference) (mc)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (mc)
November 15, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 14, 2022 Filing 3 Copy of ADM-1 Order 14-2 referring 12.5% of all SSA review cases to the Magistrate Judge for report and recommendation. Copy sent to plaintiff's counsel for notice and for service on defendant.(mc)
November 14, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-516-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Lisa Rosato.Follow up on Objection on 11/28/2022. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Tillinghast, D.)
November 14, 2022 Filing 1 NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Lisa Rosato. SSA Record Due 1/13/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Tillinghast, D.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/15/2022: #5 PDF Text Searchable Complaint) (mc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosato v. US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Rosato
Represented By: D. Lance Tillinghast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Commissioner Social Security Administratrion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Acting Commissioner
Represented By: Michael L. Henry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?