Williams v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Petitioner: Nolan Williams
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Case Number: 1:2022cv00564
Filed: December 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting re #15 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to March 8, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Objection on 3/8/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
February 22, 2023 Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to March 8, 2023 filed by Nolan Williams.(Francis, Craig)
February 22, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by FCI Berlin, Warden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Giovinco v. Pullen)(Cherniske, Heather)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to February 22, 2023. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Objection on 2/22/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
February 14, 2023 Filing 13 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to February 22, 2023 filed by Nolan Williams.(Francis, Craig)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 2/15/2023. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Objection on 2/15/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
February 6, 2023 Filing 12 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to 2/15/2023 filed by Nolan Williams.(Francis, Craig)
January 26, 2023 Filing 11 FILED IN ERROR. Petitioner is represented by counsel. NOTICE Regarding Summary Judgment.(ko) Modified on 1/26/2023 to add: Filed in error docket text. (ko)
January 25, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by FCI Berlin, Warden.Follow up on Objection on 2/24/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Declaration of Robert Rouleau, #3 Attachment to Exhibit A1 - J&C, No. CR-97-1146-04, #4 Attachment to Exhibit A2 - J&C, No. 18-CR-00093-DAP, #5 Attachment to Exhibit A3 - Sentence Computation, #6 Attachment to Exhibit A4 - Admission Release History)(Cherniske, Heather)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer to January 25, 2023 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 1/25/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
January 20, 2023 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 25, 2023 filed by FCI Berlin, Warden.(Cherniske, Heather)
January 19, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER re #6 Status Report. Text of Order: Approved. A further status report shall be filed on or before February 3, 2023. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (Status Report due by 2/3/2023.) (ko)
January 18, 2023 Filing 6 STATUS REPORT by FCI Berlin, Warden (Cherniske, Heather)
January 17, 2023 Filing 8 Return of Service Executed as to FCI Berlin, Warden. Served/Mailed on 1/17/2023. (ko)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Follow up on Objection on 1/20/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
January 11, 2023 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 to January 20, 2023 filed by FCI Berlin, Warden.(Cherniske, Heather)
January 10, 2023 Filing 7 Return of Service Executed (U.S. AG) as to FCI Berlin, Warden. Served/Mailed on 1/6/2023. (ko)
January 10, 2023 Filing Fee paid: $ 5 (Credit Card), receipt number 300 by Nolan Williams re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241. (mc)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Case Management Conference. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (Summary Judgment Motions due by 1/11/2023. Status Report due by 1/18/2023.) (ko)
January 6, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE held on 1/6/2023. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Craig Francis) (Defts Atty: Heather Cherniske) (Tape #11:40)(Total Hearing Time: 17 min.) (kad)
January 3, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing. Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2023 11:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
December 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Clerk to Make Service. Copies to be delivered to USAO NH, and mailed certified to FCI Berlin, Warden and Attorney General of the United States. Warden is directed to file an answer or dispositive motion as outlined within thirty (30) days of service on the USA. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(jb)
December 30, 2022 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies hand delivered to United States Attorney's Office DNH ATTN: Civil Process Clerk and mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to FCI Berlin, Warden and Attorney General of the United States per #3 Order Directing Service of #1 Petition.(jb)
December 30, 2022 ENDORSED Order Appointing Counsel. Appointment of Attorney Craig E. Francis for Nolan Williams for civil. Assignment accepted on 12/30/2022. Text of Order: Craig E. Francis is hereby appointed counsel. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(jb)
December 30, 2022 ENDORSED ORDER re appointment of counsel. Text of Order: The clerk's office is directed to appoint counsel for the petitioner in this matter under 18 U.S.C. 3006A (CJA), in accordance with this court's CJA plan, as an appointment of counsel appears to be in the interest of justice. The clerk's office is further directed to schedule a case management conference in this matter within seven days. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(jb)
December 28, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE - Filing Fee Omitted. Either the filing fee or an application to proceed without fees or costs must be submitted within 60 days. If proceeding without prepayment of fees or costs is sought the court needs: Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs, Certificate of Custodial Institution. Compliance Deadline set for 2/28/2023. (mc)
December 28, 2022 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
December 27, 2022 Filing 1 Emergency Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus under 28 USC 2241 filed by Nolan Williams. (mc)
December 27, 2022 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:22-cv-564-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 27, 2022 NOTICE of Filing - Case filed under 28 U.S.C. 2241. A copy of the petition has been electronically sent via ECF to your office. No further action is required by the United States Attorney unless directed by the presiding judge.(mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. FCI Berlin, Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nolan Williams
Represented By: Craig E. Francis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: FCI Berlin, Warden
Represented By: Heather A Cherniske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?