Aboussa et al v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Plaintiff: Ekoue Dodji Aboussa and Images Des Reves Photography
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency, Citizens Bank and Merrimack County Savings Bank
Case Number: 1:2023cv00024
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting re #8 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 6, 2023. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 4/6/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
March 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher J. Yagoobian on behalf of Citizens Bank Attorney Christopher J. Yagoobian added to party Citizens Bank(pty:dft).(Yagoobian, Christopher)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ///ENDORSED ORDER re #11 NOTICE of Appearance Compliance. Text of Order: On February 23, 2023, the court ordered plaintiff Images Des Rives Photography to have counsel file an appearance on its behalf, because a business entity may not appear pro se, and Mr. Aboussa, a pro se plaintiff, may not represent another party. On March 2, 2023, plaintiff filed a Notice of Appearance Compliance (11), apparently asserting that because it is a Limited Liability Corporation it may appear pro se. Plaintiff is incorrect. [B]usiness entities, including limited liability companies, cannot litigate their claims pro se. Dickey v. City of Bos., 405 F. Supp. 3d 195, 200 (D. Mass. 2019), aff'd sub nom. Dickey v. City of Bos. through Inspectional Servs. Dep't, No. 19-2045, 2020 WL 13568761 (1st Cir. Dec. 31, 2020) (citing Hooper-Haas v. Ziegler Holdings, LLC, 690 F.3d 34, 36 n.2 (1st Cir. 2012)). Accordingly, any claims asserted by Image Des Rives are dismissed without prejudice. See LR 1.3(a). So Ordered. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. (ko)
March 9, 2023 Filing 15 OBJECTION to #8 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 6, 2023 served on 3/9/2023 filed by Images Des Reves LLC. (ko)
March 9, 2023 Filing 14 OBJECTION to #8 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 6, 2023 served on 3/9/2023 filed by Ekoue Dodji Aboussa. Follow up on Reply on 3/16/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ko)
March 6, 2023 Filing 13 Disclosure Statement by Citizens Bank disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Millsom, Geoffrey)
March 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Williams Millsom on behalf of Citizens Bank Attorney Geoffrey Williams Millsom added to party Citizens Bank(pty:dft).(Millsom, Geoffrey)
March 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance Compliance by Images Des Reves Photography. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Local Rule, #2 IRS Identification Number, #3 State of NH 2023 Annual Report, #4 Certificate of Existence, #5 Copies of Endorsed Orders, #6 Cover Letter)(ko)
March 2, 2023 Filing 10 Disclosure Statement by Ekoue Dodji Aboussa, Images Des Reves Photography disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (jb)
March 1, 2023 Filing 9 Disclosure Statement by Merrimack County Savings Bank disclosing a parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Dietel, Robert)
February 27, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to April 6, 2023 filed by Merrimack County Savings Bank.Follow up on Objection on 3/13/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Dietel, Robert)
February 27, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Joseph Dietel on behalf of Merrimack County Savings Bank Attorney Robert Joseph Dietel added to party Merrimack County Savings Bank(pty:dft).(Dietel, Robert)
February 27, 2023 Clerk's Notice - No Disclosure Statements Filed. The parties are directed to file statements by March 6, 2023. Disclosure Statements due by 3/6/2023.(ko)
February 23, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Central Intelligence Agency, Citizens Bank by Ekoue Dodji Aboussa. Served/Mailed on 2/16/2023. Answer Follow Up on 3/9/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
February 23, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER: Images Des Reves Photography is listed as a plaintiff in this matter. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.6(c), a corporation, unincorporated association, or trust may not appear in any action pro se. Nor may a pro se litigant represent another party. See 28 U.S.C. 1654. Accordingly, Images Des Reves Photography shall have counsel file an appearance on its behalf within twenty one (21) days of the date of this order or this matter will be referred to a judicial officer for the imposition of an appropriate sanction, which may include a dismissal of this case without prejudice pursuant to Local Rule 1.3(a). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (Compliance Deadline set for 3/16/2023.) (ko)
February 23, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER re #3 Report and Recommendation. Text of Order: The court sua sponte vacates the Report and Recommendation (3) issued January 27, 2023. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (ko)
February 10, 2023 Filing 5 Return of Service Executed as to Citizens Bank, Merrimack County Savings Bank. Served/Mailed on 2/10/2023. Answer Follow Up on 3/3/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
February 10, 2023 Filing 4 OBJECTION to #3 Report and Recommendation. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Summons)(ko)
January 27, 2023 Filing 3 VACATED PER ORDER DATED 2/23/2023. REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint, recommending the district judge should dismiss the complaint. (Doc. No. 1). Any objections to this Report and Recommendation must be filed within fourteen days of receipt of this notice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Follow up on Objections to R&R on 2/10/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(ko) Modified on 2/23/2023 to add: vacated docket text and terminated(ko).
January 23, 2023 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to Central Intelligence Agency, Citizens Bank, Merrimack County Savings Bank. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ed)
January 23, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
January 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Central Intelligence Agency, Citizens Bank, Merrimack County Savings Bank with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 342) filed by Ekoue Dodji Aboussa, Images Des Reves Photography. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Summons - Waiver)(ed)
January 17, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-24-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aboussa et al v. Central Intelligence Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ekoue Dodji Aboussa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Images Des Reves Photography
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citizens Bank
Represented By: Geoffrey Williams Millsom
Represented By: Christopher J. Yagoobian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrimack County Savings Bank
Represented By: Robert Joseph Dietel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?