Young et al v. Conway, NH, Town of
Plaintiff: Sean Young, Forever Young Bakeries LLC and Forever Young Properties LLC
Defendant: Conway, NH, Town of
Case Number: 1:2023cv00070
Filed: January 31, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 28, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2023 Filing 14 Return of Service Executed as to Conway, NH, Town of by Sean Young, Forever Young Properties LLC, Forever Young Bakeries LLC. Served/Mailed on 2/7/2023. Answer Follow Up on 2/28/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Sanz, Elizabeth)
February 10, 2023 Filing 13 Joint Notice to Court re: Next Steps by Conway, NH, Town of(Lovett Shilo, Brooke)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER re #13 Joint Notice to Court re: Next Steps. Text of Order: As requested by the parties, the case is STAYED. Counsel shall make a joint filing communicating the status of their dealings on or before May 10, 2023. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Sanz on behalf of Forever Young Bakeries LLC, Forever Young Properties LLC, Sean Young Attorney Elizabeth Sanz added to party Forever Young Bakeries LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Sanz added to party Forever Young Properties LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Elizabeth Sanz added to party Sean Young(pty:pla).(Sanz, Elizabeth)
February 6, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Peller Frommer on behalf of Forever Young Bakeries LLC, Forever Young Properties LLC, Sean Young Attorney Robert Peller Frommer added to party Forever Young Bakeries LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Peller Frommer added to party Forever Young Properties LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Robert Peller Frommer added to party Sean Young(pty:pla).(Frommer, Robert)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order See CORRECTED ENDORSED ORDER - ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #9 Stipulation. Text of Order: Reviewed. Motion for TRO denied based on the terms of this stipulation. The clerk shall schedule a preliminary injunction hearing in consultation with counsel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) Modified on 2/3/2023 to add corrected text (jb).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTED ENDORSED ORDER reviewing #9 Stipulation. Text of Order: Motion for TRO denied without prejudice as moot based on the terms of this stipulation. The clerk shall set a briefing schedule and schedule a preliminary injunction hearing in consultation with counsel. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order See CORRECTED ENDORSED ORDER - ENDORSED ORDER denying #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Text of Order: Denied. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb) Modified on 2/3/2023 to add corrected text (jb).
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order CORRECTED ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice as moot #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Re: #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Text of Order: Denied without prejudice as moot based on the terms of #9 Stipulation. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 2, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jason B. Dennis on behalf of Conway, NH, Town of Attorney Jason B. Dennis added to party Conway, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Dennis, Jason)
February 2, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION by Conway, NH, Town of(Hilliard, Russell)
February 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo on behalf of Conway, NH, Town of Attorney Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo added to party Conway, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Lovett Shilo, Brooke)
February 1, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell F. Hilliard on behalf of Conway, NH, Town of Attorney Russell F. Hilliard added to party Conway, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Hilliard, Russell)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #3 Motion for Elizabeth Sanz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
February 1, 2023 NOTICE of Hearing. In Chambers Conference Vvia video-conference set for 2/1/2023 at 11:00 AM before Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
February 1, 2023 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. IN CHAMBERS CONFERENCE held via video-conference on 2/1/2023. Parties to file stipulation with the court by 3:00 PM on 2/2/2023. (Pltfs Atty: John M. Crabbs, Elizabeth Sanz, Robert Frommer) (Defts Atty: Jason Dennis, Brooke Lovett Shilo)(Total Hearing Time: 10 minutes) (jb)
February 1, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion for Robert Frommer to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(jb)
January 31, 2023 Filing 6 Summons issued electronically as to Conway, NH, Town of. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summons and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ed)
January 31, 2023 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Forever Young Bakeries LLC, Forever Young Properties LLC, Sean Young disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Crabbs, John)
January 31, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Forever Young Bakeries LLC, Forever Young Properties LLC, Sean Young.Follow up on Objection on 2/14/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law Memorandum of Law, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting TRO)(Crabbs, John)
January 31, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Elizabeth Sanz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2339453.) filed by Forever Young Bakeries LLC, Forever Young Properties LLC, Sean Young.Follow up on Objection on 2/14/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Crabbs, John)
January 31, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Robert Frommer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2339447.) filed by Forever Young Bakeries LLC, Forever Young Properties LLC, Sean Young.Follow up on Objection on 2/14/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Crabbs, John)
January 31, 2023 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2339439 filed by Sean Young, Forever Young Properties LLC, Forever Young Bakeries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Mural Photograph, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Google Street Views, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 August 17, 2022 ZBA Minutes, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 September 21, 2022 ZBA Minutes, #5 Exhibit June 2022 Notice of Violation Letter, #6 Exhibit December 23, 2022 Letter from Conway, #7 Exhibit August 23, 2006 ZBA Minutes, #8 Exhibit August 19, 2009 ZBA Minutes, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons - Waiver Summons)(Crabbs, John)
January 31, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-70-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
January 31, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young et al v. Conway, NH, Town of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Young
Represented By: John M. Crabbs, II
Represented By: Robert Peller Frommer
Represented By: Elizabeth Sanz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forever Young Bakeries LLC
Represented By: John M. Crabbs, II
Represented By: Elizabeth Sanz
Represented By: Robert Peller Frommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forever Young Properties LLC
Represented By: John M. Crabbs, II
Represented By: Elizabeth Sanz
Represented By: Robert Peller Frommer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conway, NH, Town of
Represented By: Brooke Lois Lovett Shilo
Represented By: Jason B. Dennis
Represented By: Russell F. Hilliard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?