Brady v. Mosca et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Brady
Defendant: Jeni Mosca, Pamela MacDonald, Dana Hilliard, Jeanne Kincaid, Somersworth School Board, Virginia Barry, Richard Farrell, NEA-NH, Daniel Habib, Mary Schuh and Michael McSheehan
Case Number: 1:2023cv00391
Filed: August 11, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Samantha D Elliott
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Assented to Motion to Establish Deadline for Defendant Daniel Habib's Responsive Pleading. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Reply/Response to Def. Objection filed by Lisa Marie Brady. HEARING REQUESTED..(Brady, Lisa) Modified on 10/6/2023 to Remove Motion Language - Filer used wrong event, this is a Response to an Objection (not a new motion) (de).
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Assented to MOTION Assented-To Motion to Establish Deadline for Defendant Daniel Habib's Responsive Pleading filed by Daniel Habib.(Rodgers, Cassandra)
October 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cassandra O Rodgers on behalf of Daniel Habib, Michael McSheehan, Mary Schuh Attorney Cassandra O Rodgers added to party Daniel Habib(pty:dft), Attorney Cassandra O Rodgers added to party Michael McSheehan(pty:dft), Attorney Cassandra O Rodgers added to party Mary Schuh(pty:dft).(Rodgers, Cassandra)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Amend filed by Lisa Marie Brady.Follow up on Objection on 10/18/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Brady, Lisa)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 UNH DEFENDANTS' JOINDER IN THE SOMERSWORTH DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STAY AND FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Daniel Habib, Michael McSheehan, Mary Schuh Attorney Christopher Cole added to party Daniel Habib(pty:dft).(Cole, Christopher)
October 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 OBJECTION to #19 MOTION to Stay rulings & Motion for evidentiary hearing filed by Dana Hilliard, Pamela MacDonald, Jeni Mosca, Somersworth School Board. Follow up on Reply on 10/11/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Cullen, Brian)
October 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 REPLY to Objection to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dana Hilliard, Pamela MacDonald, Jeni Mosca, Somersworth School Board. Surreply due by 10/10/2023. (Cullen, Brian)
October 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Stay rulings & Motion for evidentiary hearing filed by Lisa Marie Brady. HEARING REQUESTED.Follow up on Objection on 10/16/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Brady, Lisa)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 OBJECTION to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Objection 9-28-2023 filed by Lisa Marie Brady. Follow up on Reply on 10/5/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Brady, Lisa)
September 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Demetrio F. Aspiras, III on behalf of Jeanne Kincaid Attorney Demetrio F. Aspiras, III added to party Jeanne Kincaid(pty:dft).(Aspiras, Demetrio)
September 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to November 15, 2023. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Answer Follow Up on 11/15/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(gla)
September 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin on behalf of Virginia Barry, Richard Farrell Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party Virginia Barry(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party Richard Farrell(pty:dft).(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to November 15, 2023 filed by Virginia Barry, Richard Farrell.(Monty, Eric)
September 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric S. Monty on behalf of Virginia Barry, Richard Farrell Attorney Eric S. Monty added to party Virginia Barry(pty:dft), Attorney Eric S. Monty added to party Richard Farrell(pty:dft).(Monty, Eric)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Return of Service Executed as to Virginia Barry, Richard Farrell, Daniel Habib, Dana Hilliard, Jeanne Kincaid, Pamela MacDonald, Michael McSheehan, Jeni Mosca, NEA-NH, Mary Schuh, Somersworth School Board by Lisa Marie Brady. (ko)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing. Text of Order: Document number 4 is granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to file Evidence under Seal as exhibits 1 and 2. Text of Order: Document number 2 is granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(de)
September 18, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 11/15/2023. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Answer Follow Up on 11/15/2023. (de)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dana Hilliard, Pamela MacDonald, Jeni Mosca, Somersworth School Board re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss (Supplemental) (Cullen, Brian)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Dana Hilliard, Pamela MacDonald, Jeni Mosca, Somersworth School Board. Attorney Brian J.S. Cullen added to party Dana Hilliard(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J.S. Cullen added to party Pamela MacDonald(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J.S. Cullen added to party Jeni Mosca(pty:dft), Attorney Brian J.S. Cullen added to party Somersworth School Board(pty:dft).Follow up on Objection on 9/29/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint - 2016 USDC, #3 Exhibit 2 - Complaint - 2018 Strafford, #4 Exhibit 3 - Order granting MSJ - 12-13-19, #5 Exhibit 4 - 07-21-2020 Appeal dismissed order)(Cullen, Brian)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Elliott Recused. The new case designation is: 23-cv-391-LM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (vln)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Samantha D. Elliott recused. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott.(vln)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to 11/15/2023 filed by Michael McSheehan, Mary Schuh. Attorney Christopher Cole added to party Michael McSheehan(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Cole added to party Mary Schuh(pty:dft).(Cole, Christopher)
September 14, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting re: Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 10, 2023 . Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Samantha D. Elliott. (vln)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to October 10, 2023 filed by NEA-NH.(Miller, Matthew)
September 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Miller on behalf of NEA-NH Attorney Matthew Miller added to party NEA-NH(pty:dft).(Miller, Matthew)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joseph N. Laplante recused - reassign to another judge. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summonses issued by mail as to Virginia Barry, Richard Farrell, Daniel Habib, Dana Hilliard, Jeanne Kincaid, Pamela MacDonald, Michael McSheehan, Jeni Mosca, NEA-NH, Mary Schuh, Somersworth School Board. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(mc)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott. Reason for Reassignment: Judge Laplante recused. The new case designation is: 23-cv-391-SE. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (jb)
August 16, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Motion to Participate in Electronic Filing filed by Lisa Marie Brady.(mc)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to file Evidence under Seal as exhibits 1 and 2 filed by Lisa Marie Brady.(mc)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Virginia Barry, Richard Farrell, Daniel Habib, Dana Hilliard, Jeanne Kincaid, Pamela MacDonald, Michael McSheehan, Jeni Mosca, NEA-NH, Mary Schuh, Somersworth School Board with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 871) filed by Lisa Marie Brady. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses, #3 Exhibit Index & Exhibits 3-11, #4 Exhibits 12-18)(mc)
August 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-391-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brady v. Mosca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeni Mosca
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela MacDonald
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dana Hilliard
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Kincaid
Represented By: Demetrio F. Aspiras, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somersworth School Board
Represented By: Brian J.S. Cullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Barry
Represented By: Eric S. Monty
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Farrell
Represented By: Eric S. Monty
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NEA-NH
Represented By: Matthew Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Habib
Represented By: Cassandra O Rodgers
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Schuh
Represented By: Cassandra O Rodgers
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McSheehan
Represented By: Cassandra O Rodgers
Represented By: Christopher Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?