Hassell v. Kimbark et al
Plaintiff: Matthew-Lane Hassell
Defendant: Devin Aileen Kimbark, Cheryl L. Kimbark, Mark Kimbark, Todd H. Prevett, Michael L. Alfano and Kerry P. Steckowych
Case Number: 1:2023cv00472
Filed: October 16, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Devin Aileen Kimbark. Served on 12/11/2023. Follow up on Objection on 12/26/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Police Reports)(ko)
December 8, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Michael L. Alfano, Todd H. Prevett, Kerry P. Steckowych.Follow up on Objection on 12/22/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law The Judicial Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Support of their Motion to Dismiss)(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
December 8, 2023 Filing 13 OBJECTION to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, served on 12/8/2023, filed by Matthew-Lane Hassell. Follow up on Reply on 12/15/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (ko)
December 8, 2023 Filing 12 Return of Service Executed as to Devin Aileen Kimbark. Served/Mailed on 11/20/2023. Answer Follow Up on 12/11/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
November 28, 2023 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mark Kimbark. Served on 11/27/2023.Follow up on Objection on 12/12/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Harassing Mail)(ko) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2023: #2 Correspondence) (ko).
November 21, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Matthew-Lane Hassell. (Attachments: #1 Correspondence)(ko)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER granting #9 Assented to Motion to Extend Time to Answer tp December 8, 2023, #1 Complaint. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Answer Follow Up on 12/8/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
November 17, 2023 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to December 8, 2023 filed by Michael L. Alfano, Todd H. Prevett, Kerry P. Steckowych.(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin on behalf of Michael L. Alfano, Todd H. Prevett, Kerry P. Steckowych Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party Michael L. Alfano(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party Todd H. Prevett(pty:dft), Attorney Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin added to party Kerry P. Steckowych(pty:dft).(Kenison-Marvin, Nathan)
November 14, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Cheryl L. Kimbark. Served on 11/14/2023. Follow up on Objection on 11/28/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Copy of Motion to Vacate, #3 Copy of Objection to Motion, #4 State Court Case Summary(s), #5 Copies of Original Filings)(ko)
November 9, 2023 Filing 7 Return of Service Unexecuted by Matthew-Lane Hassell as to Devin Aileen Kimbark.(ko)
November 9, 2023 Filing 6 Return of Service Executed as to Michael L. Alfano, Cheryl L. Kimbark, Mark Kimbark, Todd H. Prevett, Kerry P. Steckowych by Matthew-Lane Hassell. Served/Mailed on 11/7/2023. Answer Follow Up on 11/28/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(ko)
November 9, 2023 Filing 5 Summons issued in hand as to Devin Aileen Kimbark. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ed)
November 9, 2023 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Matthew-Lane Hassell.(ed)
November 3, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew-Lane Hassell. (ko)
October 19, 2023 Filing 2 Summonses issued by mail as to Michael L. Alfano, Cheryl L. Kimbark, Devin Aileen Kimbark, Mark Kimbark, Todd H. Prevett, Kerry P. Steckowych. Counsel shall serve all documents in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF)(ed)
October 19, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
October 16, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael L. Alfano, Cheryl L. Kimbark, Devin Aileen Kimbark, Mark Kimbark, Todd H. Prevett, Kerry P. Steckowych with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 995) filed by Matthew-Lane Hassell. (Attachments: #1 Defendant List, #2 Points and Authority, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summonses)(ed)
October 16, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante and US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-472-JL-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hassell v. Kimbark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew-Lane Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Aileen Kimbark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl L. Kimbark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Kimbark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd H. Prevett
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael L. Alfano
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry P. Steckowych
Represented By: Nathan W. Kenison-Marvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?