Obregon-Mina v. Lechleitner et al
Petitioner: Ivan Obregon-Mina
Respondent: Patrick Lechleitner, DHS ICE Boston Field Office and Christopher Brackett
Case Number: 1:2023cv00474
Filed: October 18, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Office: Concord Office
Presiding Judge: Paul J Barbadoro
Referring Judge: Talesha L Saint-Marc
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2023 Filing 12 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT on US Attorney General re: Clerk Service. (jwb)
November 22, 2023 Filing 11 US Marshal Service of Process re: #6 Order Directing Service served on 11/16/2023 on Christopher Brackett.(jwb)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #7 Motion to Extend Time to Object/Respond; granting #10 Motion to Dismiss. Text of Order: Petitioner's motion to dismiss without prejudice is granted. The motion to extend time to respond is denied as moot. So Ordered by Judge Paul J. Barbadoro.(jwb)
November 22, 2023 Civil Case Terminated. (jwb)
November 21, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Petitioner's Notice and Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 41 filed by Ivan Obregon-Mina. Attorney William Keefe added to party Ivan Obregon-Mina(pty:pet).Follow up on Objection on 12/5/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Keefe, William)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT on ICE Boston Field Office re: Clerk Service. (jwb)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Mail Returned- Return to Sender, Not Deliverable as Addressed, Unable to Forward re #5 Transfer Case Procedural Order In, Order Re: Local Counsel,, 2 Case Assigned,.(jwb)
November 15, 2023 Filing 7 MOTION to Extend Time to Object/Respond to December 27, 2023 filed by Patrick Lechleitner. Attorney Michael T. McCormack added to party Patrick Lechleitner (pty:res).Follow up on Objection on 11/29/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(McCormack, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Clerk and US Marshal to Make Service. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.(jwb)
November 13, 2023 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies to US Marshal as to Christopher Brackett per #6 Order Directing Service.(jwb)
November 13, 2023 SERVICE BY CLERK: Copies mailed via certified mail, return receipt requested to DHS ICE Boston Field Office, Patrick Lechleitner per #6 Order Directing Service. Copies sent electronically to Civil Bureau Chief and in paper to civil process clerk, US Attorney for the District of NH. (jwb)
October 20, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. William Keefe, Esq. must complete an online registration form within 30 days. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Compliance Deadline set for 11/20/2023.(ed)
October 20, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER REGARDING VISITING ATTORNEY: The Local Rules for the District of New Hampshire provide that an attorney may, at the discretion of the court, on motion by a member of our bar, be permitted to practice before this court in a particular action. Any attorney so admitted shall at all times be associated with a member of the bar of this court. Our records indicate that no motion for pro hac vice admission of William Keefe, Esq. has been received. Unless said motion with the required fee is filed within thirty (30) days, the case may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 11/20/2023.(ed)
October 18, 2023 Filing 5 PROCEDURAL ORDER IN TRANSFERRED CASE. ORDER Signed by Daniel J. Lynch, Clerk of Court. Compliance Deadline set for 11/17/2023.(ed)
October 18, 2023 Case assigned to Judge Paul J. Barbadoro and US Magistrate Judge Talesha Leah Saint-Marc. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-474-PB-TSM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
October 18, 2023 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number: 1:23-cv-12398. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received
October 17, 2023 Filing 3 District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: TRANSFER ORDER entered. (Belmont, Kellyann) [Transferred from mad on 10/18/2023.]
October 17, 2023 Filing 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Paul G. Levenson. (Cowan, Nicole) [Transferred from mad on 10/18/2023.]
October 17, 2023 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-10087821 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Ivan Obregon-Mina.(Keefe, William) [Transferred from mad on 10/18/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Obregon-Mina v. Lechleitner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Ivan Obregon-Mina
Represented By: William Keefe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Patrick Lechleitner
Represented By: Michael T. McCormack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DHS ICE Boston Field Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher Brackett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?