Quaratiello v. Raymond, NH, Town of et al
Plaintiff: Arlene Quaratiello
Defendant: Raymond, NH, Town of, Dudley Tucker Library, Valerie Moore, Jill Galus, Sabrina Maltby and Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett
Case Number: 1:2023cv00482
Filed: October 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dona Feeney on behalf of Raymond, NH, Town of Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Raymond, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Feeney, Dona)
December 12, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Valerie Moore by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
December 12, 2023 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Raymond, NH, Town of by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sabrina Maltby by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
December 12, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
December 12, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jill Galus by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
December 12, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dudley Tucker Library by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
November 16, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Olivia F. Summers on behalf of Arlene Quaratiello Attorney Olivia F. Summers added to party Arlene Quaratiello(pty:pla).(Summers, Olivia)
November 8, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey R. Surtees on behalf of Arlene Quaratiello Attorney Geoffrey R. Surtees added to party Arlene Quaratiello(pty:pla).(Surtees, Geoffrey)
November 7, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Jeremiah Moelker on behalf of Arlene Quaratiello Attorney Nathan Jeremiah Moelker added to party Arlene Quaratiello(pty:pla).(Moelker, Nathan)
November 3, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Geoffrey R. Surtees to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2439579.) filed by Arlene Quaratiello.Follow up on Objection on 11/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(Rhodes, Jacob)
November 3, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION for Olivia F. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2439566.) filed by Arlene Quaratiello.Follow up on Objection on 11/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(Rhodes, Jacob)
November 3, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Nathan J. Moelker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2439552.) filed by Arlene Quaratiello.Follow up on Objection on 11/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice)(Rhodes, Jacob)
November 3, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Geoffrey R. Surtees to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
November 3, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Olivia F. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
November 3, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 MOTION for Nathan J. Moelker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
October 30, 2023 Filing 3 Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Dudley Tucker Library, Jill Galus, Sabrina Maltby, Valerie Moore, Raymond, NH, Town of, Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(ed)
October 30, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ed)
October 27, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 12/18/2023.(ed)
October 27, 2023 Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-482-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
October 27, 2023 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2437054 filed by Arlene Quaratiello. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Republican Club Email, #2 Exhibit B-Letter to Editor, #3 Exhibit C-Termination Letter, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Town of Raymond, #6 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Town of Raymond, #7 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Dudley Tucker Library, #8 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Dudley Tucker Library, #9 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Valerie Moore, #10 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Valerie Moore, #11 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Jill Galus, #12 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Jill Galus, #13 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Sabrina Maltby, #14 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Sabrina Maltby, #15 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Kirsten Rundquist Corbett, #16 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Kirsten Rundquist Corbett)(Rhodes, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quaratiello v. Raymond, NH, Town of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlene Quaratiello
Represented By: Jacob Rhodes
Represented By: Geoffrey R. Surtees
Represented By: Nathan Jeremiah Moelker
Represented By: Olivia F. Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond, NH, Town of
Represented By: Dona Feeney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dudley Tucker Library
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Galus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sabrina Maltby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?