Bernier v. Turbocam, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lillian Bernier
Defendant: Turbocam, Inc., Health Plans, Inc. and Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv00523
Filed: November 21, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Landya B McCafferty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Assented to Motion to Extend Time. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to File Responsive Pleading is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Answer Follow Up on 2/29/2024.(de)
January 11, 2024 Filing 19 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to file a responsive pleading filed by Turbocam, Inc..(Minich, Bethany)
January 11, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bethany P. Minich on behalf of Turbocam, Inc. Attorney Bethany P. Minich added to party Turbocam, Inc.(pty:dft).(Minich, Bethany)
January 9, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to February 29, 2024 .. Text of Order: Motion to Extend Time to Answer is granted. For the reasons stated in the motion, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (vln)
January 3, 2024 Filing 17 Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to February 29, 2024 filed by Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc..(Mahan, Kathleen)
December 27, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lisa Zaccardelli on behalf of Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc. Attorney Lisa Zaccardelli added to party Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lisa Zaccardelli added to party Health Plans, Inc.(pty:dft).(Zaccardelli, Lisa)
December 26, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 Amended Assented to Motion for Lisa A. Zaccardelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(de)
December 20, 2023 Filing 15 Disclosure Statement by Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc. disclosing a parent company, one or more publicly traded companies, and no merger agreement. (Mahan, Kathleen)
December 14, 2023 Filing 14 Amended Assented to MOTION for Lisa A. Zaccardelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2454383.) filed by Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Affidavit of Lisa A. Zaccardelli)(Mahan, Kathleen)
December 13, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michelle R. Peirce on behalf of Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc. Attorney Michelle R. Peirce added to party Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michelle R. Peirce added to party Health Plans, Inc.(pty:dft).(Peirce, Michelle)
December 13, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion for Lisa A. Zaccardelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Denied without prejudice to refiling the motion with an affidavit containing the year of admission for each court to which the attorney has been admitted to practice as required by LR 83.2(b)(1)(B). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(de)
December 6, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bennett H. Klein on behalf of Lillian Bernier Attorney Bennett H. Klein added to party Lillian Bernier(pty:pla).(Klein, Bennett)
December 5, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc. by Lillian Bernier. Served/Mailed on 11/28/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/30/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Erchull, Chris)
December 5, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Health Plans, Inc. by Lillian Bernier. Served/Mailed on 11/28/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/30/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Erchull, Chris)
December 5, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Turbocam, Inc. by Lillian Bernier. Served/Mailed on 11/28/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/30/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Erchull, Chris)
December 5, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #4 Assented to Motion for Michelle R. Peirce to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(de)
December 4, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc. by Lillian Bernier. Served/Mailed on 11/21/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/23/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Erchull, Chris)
December 4, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Health Plans, Inc. by Lillian Bernier. Served/Mailed on 11/21/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/23/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Erchull, Chris)
December 4, 2023 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Turbocam, Inc. by Lillian Bernier. Served/Mailed on 11/21/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/23/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Erchull, Chris)
December 4, 2023 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Lisa A. Zaccardelli to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2450203.) filed by Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Affidavit of Lisa A. Zaccardelli)(Mahan, Kathleen)
December 4, 2023 Filing 4 Assented to MOTION for Michelle R. Peirce to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2450004.) filed by Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A - Affidavit of Michelle R. Peirce)(Mahan, Kathleen)
December 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kathleen M. Mahan on behalf of Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc., Health Plans, Inc. Attorney Kathleen M. Mahan added to party Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen M. Mahan added to party Health Plans, Inc.(pty:dft).(Mahan, Kathleen)
December 4, 2023 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(mc)
November 28, 2023 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
November 21, 2023 Case assigned to Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty and US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-523-LM-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
November 21, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Bennett H. Klein to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2446754.) filed by Lillian Bernier.Follow up on Objection on 12/5/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Affidavit of Bennett H. Klein)(Erchull, Chris)
November 21, 2023 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2446655 filed by Lillian Bernier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Erchull, Chris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bernier v. Turbocam, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Bernier
Represented By: Chris Erchull
Represented By: Bennett H. Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turbocam, Inc.
Represented By: Bethany P. Minich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plans, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Mahan
Represented By: Lisa Zaccardelli
Represented By: Michelle R. Peirce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harvard Pilgrim Healthcare of New England, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Mahan
Represented By: Lisa Zaccardelli
Represented By: Michelle R. Peirce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?