Vermont Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Generali U.S. Branch et al
Plaintiff: Ralph W. Cronin, Jr. and Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Generali U.S. Branch
Case Number: 1:2023cv00559
Filed: December 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER approving (with changes) #15 Proposed Discovery Plan. Length of Trial 1 day. Case Track: Expedited. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 3/1/2024. Amendment of Pleadings set for 3/1/2024. Summary Judgment Motions due by 3/25/2024. Objections due 4/19/2024. Reply due 5/3/2024. Bench trial to be set two (2) calendar months (60 days) from issuance of summary judgment order, if necessary.(jb)
February 16, 2024 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held via video-conference on 2/16/2024. Order to issue. (Pltfs Atty: Gary M. Burt) (Defts Atty: Howard M. Wollitz, Laura M. Gregory)(Total Hearing Time: 11 minutes) (jb)
February 6, 2024 RESCHEDULING NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference via video-conference reset for 2/16/2024 at 03:00 PM (from 2/9/2024) before Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The preliminary pretrial conference will not be canceled and at least one counsel for each party will be required to attend. While not mandatory, the court prefers that the Joint Discovery Plan filed in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) specify a summary judgment deadline which falls after the close of discovery, but at least 120 days before trial. Please note pursuant to Title 28 USC 636(c) and Local Rule 73.1, the parties may consent to have the case reassigned to the Magistrate Judge, but are free to withhold consent without adverse consequences.(jb)
February 6, 2024 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante and US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Reason for Reassignment: No Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge.. The new case designation is: 1:23-cv-559-JL-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (bd)
February 5, 2024 Filing 15 Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Generali U.S. Branch. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event.(Gregory, Laura)
February 5, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Assignment to United States Magistrate Judge and Consent Form by Generali U.S. Branch.(Gregory, Laura)
February 5, 2024 Clerk's Notice - No Proposed Discovery Plan Filed. The parties are directed to file a proposed discovery plan within 24 hours of this notice. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/6/2024. (bd)
January 25, 2024 Filing 13 Answer to Counterclaim re #11 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Ralph W. Cronin, Jr, Vermont Mutual Insurance Company.(Burt, Gary) Modified on 2/6/2024 to modify Reply to Answer (jb).
January 24, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Howard N. Wollitz on behalf of Generali U.S. Branch Attorney Howard N. Wollitz added to party Generali U.S. Branch(pty:dft).(Wollitz, Howard)
January 24, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Generali U.S. Branch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Generali Policy, #3 Exhibit C - Vermont Mutual Policy)(Gregory, Laura) Modified on 2/6/2024 to add exhibit descriptions: (jb).
January 12, 2024 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Generali U.S. Branch filed by Ralph W. Cronin, Jr, Vermont Mutual Insurance Company.(Burt, Gary)
January 12, 2024 Filing 9 Certified Copies of State Court Record. State Court Case No. 212-2023-CV-00189, Carroll County Superior Court (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Notice of Removal, #3 Summons, #4 Acceptance of Service, #5 Amended Notice of Removal)(Gregory, Laura)
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION to Amend #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, Petition for Declaratory Judgment filed by Ralph W. Cronin, Jr, Vermont Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit First Amended Petition for Declaratory Judgment)(Burt, Gary)
January 12, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #8 Assented to MOTION to Amend. Text of Order: Granted. Within 48 hours counsel shall electronically refile the pleading attached to the Motion to Amend using the appropriate event in CM/ECF. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. (bd)
January 11, 2024 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/9/2024 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/2/2024. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan. (bd)
January 4, 2024 Filing 7 Disclosure Statement by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company disclosing no parent company, no publicly traded company, and no merger agreement. (Burt, Gary)
January 4, 2024 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company. LR 7.1.1. In removal actions, a nongovernmental corporate plaintiff, partnership plaintiff, or LLC plaintiff must file a disclosure statement within twenty-one (21) days from the date the notice of removal is filed or with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, objection, or request, whichever is filed sooner. File Disclosure Statement using the Other Documents/Disclosure Statement event. Vermont Mutual Insurance Company shall file a disclosure statement by January 25, 2024. Disclosure Statement due 1/25/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(mc)
January 4, 2024 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. Pursuant to Local Rule 81.1(a) and (b), answers and motions filed in the state court will not be considered unless refiled in this court. Please note that all filings in this District must comply with Local Rule 7. The Local Rules and Administrative Procedures for ECF can be downloaded from our website #HERE.(mc)
January 4, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 MOTION for Howard N. Wollitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
January 3, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal - New Case, by Generali U.S. Branch. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Gregory, Laura)
January 3, 2024 Filing 4 Disclosure Statement by Generali U.S. Branch disclosing a parent company, and no merger agreement. (Gregory, Laura).
January 3, 2024 Filing 3 Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by Generali U.S. Branch identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (Gregory, Laura)
January 3, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Howard N. Wollitz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2461170.) filed by Generali U.S. Branch.Follow up on Objection on 1/17/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Gregory, Laura)
December 27, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 2/15/2024. (mc)
December 27, 2023 Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-559-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
December 27, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Carroll County Superior Court, case number 212-2023-CV-00189 (filing fee $405, receipt number ANHDC-2459093) filed by Vermont Mutual Insurance Company. Answer Follow Up on 1/17/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c). State Court Record Follow Up 1/10/2024. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons in a Civil Action, #3 Exhibit - Acceptance of Service)(Gregory, Laura) Modified on 2/6/2024 to add exhibit descriptions: (jb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company et al v. Generali U.S. Branch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph W. Cronin, Jr.
Represented By: Gary M. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vermont Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura M. Gregory
Represented By: Gary M. Burt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generali U.S. Branch
Represented By: Howard N. Wollitz
Represented By: Laura M. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?