Next Insurance US Company v. Courtemarche et al
Plaintiff: Next Insurance US Company
Defendant: Scott Courtemarche, Scoco Family Home Builders, LLC, Scott Halcarz and Lisa Halcarz
Case Number: 1:2024cv00017
Filed: January 17, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Samantha D Elliott
Referring Judge: Talesha L Saint-Marc
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2024 Filing 12 NO CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Because not all parties to the case consent to the assignment of a United States Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73, 28 U.S.C. sec. 636(c), and Local Rule 73.1(b)(2), the case will be assigned to a United States District Judge. Clerk Daniel J. Lynch. (Ober, Scott)
March 11, 2024 Filing 11 Return of Service Executed as to Scoco Family Home Builders, LLC by Next Insurance US Company. Served/Mailed on 3/7/2024. Answer Follow Up on 3/28/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ober, Scott)
March 11, 2024 Filing 10 Return of Service Executed as to Scott Courtemarche by Next Insurance US Company. Served/Mailed on 3/7/2024. Answer Follow Up on 3/28/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Ober, Scott)
March 11, 2024 Case reassigned to Judge Samantha D. Elliott and US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. Reason for Reassignment: No Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. The new case designation is: 1:24-cv-17-SE-TSM. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (bd)
February 7, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Piegore on behalf of Next Insurance US Company Attorney John Piegore added to party Next Insurance US Company(pty:pla).(Piegore, John)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 Summonses issued electronically as to Scott Courtemarche, Lisa Halcarz, Scott Halcarz, Scoco Family Home Builders, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(mc)
January 23, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 MOTION for John J. Piegore, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 3/7/2024.(mc)
January 17, 2024 NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (mc)
January 17, 2024 Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-17-TSM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (mc)
January 17, 2024 Filing 6 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT (receipt # ANHDC-2466795) filed by Next Insurance US Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Waiver Scott Courtemarche, #5 Summons - Waiver Scoco Family Home Builders, LLC, #6 Summons - Waiver Scott Halcarz, #7 Summons - Waiver Lisa Halcarz)(Ober, Scott) Modified file date to match signature date on 1/22/2024 (mc).
January 17, 2024 Filing 5 Disclosure Statement by Next Insurance US Company disclosing,, and. (Ober, Scott)
January 17, 2024 Filing 4 Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by Next Insurance US Company identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (Ober, Scott)
January 17, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Casey Ryder McCaffrey on behalf of Next Insurance US Company Attorney Casey Ryder McCaffrey added to party Next Insurance US Company(pty:pla).(McCaffrey, Casey)
January 17, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for John J. Piegore, Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2466807.) filed by Next Insurance US Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit))(Ober, Scott) Modified on 1/17/2024 to remove: "assented to" (bf).
January 17, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott T. Ober on behalf of Next Insurance US Company Attorney Scott T. Ober added to party Next Insurance US Company(pty:pla).(Ober, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Next Insurance US Company v. Courtemarche et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Next Insurance US Company
Represented By: John Piegore
Represented By: Scott T. Ober
Represented By: Casey Ryder McCaffrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Courtemarche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scoco Family Home Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Halcarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Halcarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?