Harp et al v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Plaintiff: Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, Ray Tillotson, Vincent Cicala, Jessica Cicala, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Benardino Nido and Karina Nido
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00058
Filed: February 27, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of New Hampshire
Presiding Judge: Andrea K Johnstone
Referring Judge: Joseph N Laplante
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER re Rule 16 Scheduling Order. As defendant has not appeared in this case, the court finds good cause to extend the deadline for issuing the scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b). The court will schedule the pretrial conference once defendant has appeared. So Ordered by Judge Joseph N. Laplante.(jb)
March 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: ASSIGNMENT OF CASES RELATED TO SIG SAUER P320 PRODUCT LIABILITY LITIGATION So Ordered by Chief Judge Landya B. McCafferty.(ed)
March 22, 2024 Case reassigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante and US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Reason for Reassignment: ADM-1 Order 24-4. The new case designation is: 1:24-cv-58-JL-AJ. Please show this number with the correct judge designation on all further pleadings. (ed)
March 7, 2024 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sig Sauer, Inc. by Miranda Rosas, Benardino Nido, Ray Tillotson, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., John Mazur-Baker, Karina Nido, Tamra Marie Harp, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jessica Cicala. Served/Mailed on 2/28/2024. Answer Follow Up on 5/1/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(King, Benjamin)
March 4, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Larry Bendesky on behalf of Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Jessica Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Vincent Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Colton Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Tamra Marie Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party John Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Kelsey Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Benardino Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Karina Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Miranda Rosas(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Larry Bendesky added to party Ray Tillotson(pty:pla).(Bendesky, Larry)
March 4, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert J Mongeluzzi on behalf of Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Jessica Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Vincent Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Colton Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Tamra Marie Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party John Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Kelsey Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Benardino Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Karina Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Miranda Rosas(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Robert J Mongeluzzi added to party Ray Tillotson(pty:pla).(Mongeluzzi, Robert)
March 4, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel A Haaz on behalf of Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Jessica Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Vincent Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Colton Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Tamra Marie Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party John Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Kelsey Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Benardino Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Karina Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Miranda Rosas(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Samuel A Haaz added to party Ray Tillotson(pty:pla).(Haaz, Samuel)
March 4, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan D. Hurd on behalf of Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Jessica Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Vincent Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Colton Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Tamra Marie Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party John Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Kelsey Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Benardino Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Karina Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Miranda Rosas(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Ryan D. Hurd added to party Ray Tillotson(pty:pla).(Hurd, Ryan)
March 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert W. Zimmerman on behalf of Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Jessica Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Vincent Cicala(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Colton Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Tamra Marie Harp(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party John Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Kelsey Mazur-Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Benardino Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Karina Nido(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Miranda Rosas(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr.(pty:pla), Attorney Robert W. Zimmerman added to party Ray Tillotson(pty:pla).(Zimmerman, Robert)
March 4, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #8 Assented to MOTION for Ryan D. Hurd to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
March 4, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #9 Assented to MOTION for Samuel A. Haaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
March 4, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #7 Assented to MOTION for Robert W. Zimmerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
March 4, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #6 Assented to MOTION for Larry Bendesky to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
March 4, 2024 ENDORSED ORDER granting: #5 Assented to MOTION for Robert J. Mongeluzzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc.The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
March 1, 2024 Filing 9 Assented to MOTION for Samuel A. Haaz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2484075.) filed by Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A- Affidavit of Samuel Haaz)(King, Benjamin)
March 1, 2024 Filing 8 Assented to MOTION for Ryan D. Hurd to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2484073.) filed by Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A- Affidavit of Ryan Hurd)(King, Benjamin)
March 1, 2024 Filing 7 Assented to MOTION for Robert W. Zimmerman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2484071.) filed by Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A- Affidavit of Robert Zimmerman)(King, Benjamin)
March 1, 2024 Filing 6 Assented to MOTION for Larry Bendesky to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2484070.) filed by Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A- Affidavit of Larry Bendesky)(King, Benjamin)
March 1, 2024 Filing 5 Assented to MOTION for Robert J. Mongeluzzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2484069.) filed by Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Affidavit) A- Affidavit of Robert Mongeluzzi)(King, Benjamin)
February 28, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Lawsuit/Waiver issued electronically as to Sig Sauer, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waiverand all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Assignment to Magistrate)(ed)
February 27, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiffs for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 4/17/2024.(ed)
February 27, 2024 Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Talesha L. Saint-Marc. The case designation is: 1:24-cv-58-TSM. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
February 27, 2024 Filing 2 Diversity of Citizenship Disclosure Statement by Jessica Cicala, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Tamra Marie Harp, John Mazur-Baker, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Benardino Nido, Karina Nido, Miranda Rosas, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., Ray Tillotson identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to them. (King, Benjamin)
February 27, 2024 Filing 1 NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANHDC-2482882 filed by Miranda Rosas, Benardino Nido, Ray Tillotson, Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr., John Mazur-Baker, Karina Nido, Tamra Marie Harp, Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios, Vincent Cicala, Colton Harp, Kelsey Mazur-Baker, Jessica Cicala. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheett, #2 Notice ECF Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Summons - Waiver of Service)(King, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Hampshire District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harp et al v. Sig Sauer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colton Harp
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamra Marie Harp
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Tillotson
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Cicala
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Cicala
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Rosas
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert Ramirez Rosas, Jr.
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Luis Munoz Palacios
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Mazur-Baker
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Mazur-Baker
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benardino Nido
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Nido
Represented By: Benjamin T. King
Represented By: Larry Bendesky
Represented By: Robert J Mongeluzzi
Represented By: Robert W. Zimmerman
Represented By: Ryan D. Hurd
Represented By: Samuel A Haaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sig Sauer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?