CONTINENTAL COIN, et al v. HOLLOWAY, et al

Case Number: 1:1995cv01047
Filed: March 9, 1995
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization Office
Presiding Judge: Jerome B. Simandle
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 26, 2010 566 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 7/26/2010. (nf, )
April 8, 2009 552 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION re 551 MOTION for Reconsideration filed by GREGORY HOLLOWAY. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 4/8/2009. (nf, )
March 12, 2009 548 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle on 3/12/2009. (nf, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CONTINENTAL COIN, et al v. HOLLOWAY, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?