WORKMAN et al v. MENU FOODS LIMITED et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: MARK COHEN, JARED WORKMAN and MONA COHEN
Defendant: MENU FOODS INC., MENU FOODS LIMITED and MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2007cv01338
Filed: March 23, 2007
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2008 ***Civil Case Terminated. (nf, )
July 3, 2008 39 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE - Attorney LISA J. RODRIGUEZ for JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN and MONA COHEN added. Attorney DONNA SIEGEL MOFFA terminated. (th, )
October 16, 2007 38 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 24, 2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Theodore M. Formaroli. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
July 10, 2007 37 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on June 5, 2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
July 2, 2007 36 Featured Case JOINT STIPULATION REGARDING CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/2/07. (sb)
June 29, 2007 35 Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (sb)
June 20, 2007 34 Order of MDL Panel adding this action to MDL #1850. (sb)
June 14, 2007 33 NOTICE of Appearance by CARLOS FRANCISCO ORTIZ on behalf of MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC. (ORTIZ, CARLOS)
June 12, 2007 32 NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN F. GOOBY on behalf of MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC. (GOOBY, STEVEN)
June 5, 2007 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman : Telephone Conference held on the record on 6/5/2007. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner.) (sb)
June 4, 2007 31 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER re: 10 Motion for Order to Show Cause why a Protective Order Should Not be Issued. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/4/07. (sb)
May 31, 2007 29 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 23, 2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Lisa Marcus. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
May 31, 2007 28 Letter from Plaintiffs Counsel Enclosing Signed Consent Order and Declaration of Mark Tamblyn re Defendants' Contacts with Represented Parties and Class Members. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Order# 2 Declaration of Mark J. Tamblyn Regarding Menu Foods Defendants' Contacts with Represented Parties and Class Members)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 24, 2007 Pro Hac Vice fee recv'd as to Michael Turiello, Esq: $ 150, receipt number 306264 (sb)
May 24, 2007 Pro Hac Vice fee recv'd as to Edward Ruff, Esq.: $ 150, receipt number 306263 (sb)
May 24, 2007 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman : Continued Motion Hearing held on 5/24/2007 re 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue filed by MONA COHEN, JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN. Terms of agreement between parties placed on the record. Consent Orders to be submitted. (Court Reporter Theodore Formaroli.) (sb)
May 23, 2007 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman : Continued Hearing held on 5/23/2007 re 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue filed by MONA COHEN, JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN. Order to be entered. Ordered affidavits of attorneys employed by defendants to be submitted. Order to be entered enjoining defendants for a period of 10 days. Ordered defendants to submit further documentation regarding phone calls to plaintiffs. Ordered hearing continued to May 24, at 12:00pm.(Court Reporter Lisa Marcus.) (sb)
May 23, 2007 25 Letter from Jay Edelson, Esq. addressed to Judge Hillman. (sb)
May 22, 2007 24 BRIEF Response to Plaintiffs' Proposed Letter to Claimants filed by MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC.. (HANSON, GERARD)
May 22, 2007 23 Letter from Michael A. Ferrara, Jr., Esquire regarding concerns with the current proposed "solicitation" letter submitted by a limited number of Plaintiff's counsel. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
May 22, 2007 22 Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Russell D. Paul to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 22, 2007 21 AFFIDAVIT of Lisa J. Rodriguez Attesting Compliance with Rule 1:28-2(a) for Attorney Russell D. Paul by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 21, 2007 Pro Hac Vice fee recvd as to Russell D. Paul, Esq.: $ 150, receipt number 306245 (sb)
May 21, 2007 20 Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel to The Honorable Noel L. Hillman Submitting Plaintiffs' Proposed Curative Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Mark J. Tamblyn Regarding Menu Foods Defendants' Contacts with Represented Parties and Absent Class Members# 2 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 21, 2007 19 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 18, 2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
May 18, 2007 NOTICE OF CONTINUED HEARING: May 23, 2007 at 3:00PM Before The Honorable Noel L. Hillman in Courtroom 3A (sa, )
May 18, 2007 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ordered that the attorney admitted pro hac vice is to make payment of $150 made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/18/07. (sb)
May 18, 2007 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Order directing attorney admitted pro hac vice to make payment of $150 made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/18/07. (sb) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/18/2007 (sb, ).
May 18, 2007 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Order directing attorney admitted pro hac vice to make payment of $150 made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/18/07. (sb)
May 18, 2007 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman : Motion Hearing held on 5/18/2007 re 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue filed by MONA COHEN, JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN. Hearing on application by pltfs for pro hac vice admission. Ordered application granted appointing Russell D. Paul, Esq. pro hac vice. Order entered. Hearing on defendants' application for pro hac admissions. Ordered application granted. Order entered. Supplemental documents to be submitted. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner.) (sb)
May 17, 2007 14 RESPONSE in Support re 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue filed by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 15, 2007 13 BRIEF in Opposition re 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue filed by MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D)(HANSON, GERARD)
May 15, 2007 Setting Deadlines as to 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell D. Paul. Motion returnable date set for 6/15/2007 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (sb)
May 15, 2007 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Russell D. Paul by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Statement As To Why No Brief Is Necessary# 2 Certification of Lisa J. Rodriguez# 3 Certification of Russell D. Paul, Esquire, in Support of the Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission# 4 Text of Proposed Order # 5 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 10, 2007 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue on Friday, May 18, 2007 at 11:00AM in Courtroom 3A : Defendants' opposition due Tuesday, May 15, 2007 by 5PM; Plaintiffs' reply due Thursday, May 17, 2007 by Noon (sa, ) Modified on 5/10/2007 (sa, ).
May 9, 2007 Setting Deadlines as to 11 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Motion returnable date set for 6/1/2007 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (sb)
May 8, 2007 11 Second MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Gerard H Hanson# 2 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Order re Edward Ruff# 3 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Order re Michael Turiello# 4 Text of Proposed Order Pro Hac Vice Order re Priya Jesani# 5 Certificate of Service # 6 Affidavit Edward Ruff# 7 Affidavit Priya Jesani# 8 Affidavit Michael Turiello)(HANSON, GERARD)
May 8, 2007 Setting Deadlines as to 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue. Motion returnable date set for 6/1/2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (sb)
May 7, 2007 10 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why a Protective Order to Supervise or Limit Communications With Absent Class Members Should Not Issue by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support# 2 Affidavit of Russell D. Paul in Support# 3 Order# 4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 2, 2007 9 Featured Case ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/2/07. (gn, )
April 20, 2007 Setting Deadlines as to 8 First MOTION to Stay. Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2007 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. PLEASE BE ADVISED THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (db, )
April 19, 2007 8 First MOTION to Stay by MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Gerard H. Hanson# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Brief # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(HANSON, GERARD)
April 4, 2007 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Menu Foods Midwest Corporation on March 29, 2007, filed by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (MOFFA, DONNA)
April 2, 2007 6 Copy of motion before the MDL Panel to have this case transferred to S.D. of Florida. (th, )
March 30, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Menu Foods, Inc. on 3/27/07, filed by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (MOFFA, DONNA)
March 29, 2007 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion to appoint special process service to serve a corporation in a foreign country. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 03/28/07. (db, )
March 28, 2007 Setting Deadlines as to 3 MOTION to Authorize Service of Process of Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint on Menu Foods Limited in Accordance with the Hague Convention. Motion Returnable for 4/20/2007 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. PLEASE BE ADVISED THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (db, )
March 27, 2007 3 MOTION to Authorize Service of Process of Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint on Menu Foods Limited in Accordance with the Hague Convention by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Authorize Service of P rocess of Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint on Menu Foods Limited in Accordance with the Hague Convention# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(MOFFA, DONNA)
March 23, 2007 2 Summons Issued as to MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC. Days Due - 20. (sk)
March 23, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INC. (Filing fee $350 receipt number 1403626.) JURY DEMAND, filed by JARED WORKMAN, MARK COHEN, MONA COHEN. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WORKMAN et al v. MENU FOODS LIMITED et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS INC.
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS LIMITED
Represented By: CARLOS F. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION
Represented By: CARLOS F. ORTIZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK COHEN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED WORKMAN
Represented By: DONNA SIEGEL MOFFA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONA COHEN
Represented By: DONNA SIEGEL MOFFA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?