LONG v. MENU FOODS INCOME FUND et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: MATT LONG
Defendant: MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS HOLDINGS, INC., MENU FOODS INC., MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION and CHEMNUTRA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2007cv01624
Filed: April 6, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2007 Filing 10
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (sb) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2007 (sb, ).
May 14, 2007 Filing 9
STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by CHEMNUTRA, INC. (js)
May 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 8
ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/2/07. (gn, )
April 25, 2007 Filing 7
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on ChemNutra, Inc. on April 18, 2007, filed by MATT LONG. (MOFFA, DONNA)
April 20, 2007 Filing 5
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Menu Foods Holdings, Inc. on 4/18/07, filed by MATT LONG. (MOFFA, DONNA)
April 10, 2007 Filing 2
Summons Issued as to MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS HOLDINGS, INC., MENU FOODS INC., MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, CHEMNUTRA, INC. Days Due - 20. (sk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LONG v. MENU FOODS INCOME FUND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT LONG
Represented By: DONNA SIEGEL MOFFA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS INCOME FUND
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS LIMITED
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS INC.
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEMNUTRA, INC.
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER E. MARTIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?