PIRCHES et al v. MENU FOODS INCOME FUND et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: KAREN PIRCHES and DINITRISE HICKS
Defendant: MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., DOES 1 THROUGH 100, MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS HOLDINGS, INC., MENU FOODS, INC. and MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2007cv01685
Filed: April 10, 2007
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 29, 2007 8
Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (sb) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/29/2007 (sb, ).
May 2, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Granting 3 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/2/07. (gn, )
April 30, 2007 6
NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH G. SAUDER on behalf of KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS (SAUDER, JOSEPH)
April 13, 2007 2
Summons Issued as to MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS LIMITED, MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS HOLDINGS, INC..Days Due - 20. (TH, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PIRCHES et al v. MENU FOODS INCOME FUND et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN PIRCHES
Represented By: KIMBERLY M. DONALDSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DINITRISE HICKS
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC.
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 THROUGH 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS INCOME FUND
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS LIMITED
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS HOLDINGS, INC.
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS, INC.
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORPORATION
Represented By: GERARD H. HANSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?