IN RE: PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION Featured Case

Plaintiff: HELEN PERCY, GEORGE BIRNEY, AUDREY BIRNEY, GINGER SNYDER, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, CIRO AIELLO, JOSEPH P SNYDER, SCOTT STACEY, CHERYL CARVER, TRACY RICHARDSON, JUDY SHOPE, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, LORRAINE JOHNSON, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, MITCH ENGLANDER, MARK CASHMAN, KELLY FINESTONE, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, LAURIE WOODMAN, STEVE BARTILUCCI, CRAIG ANDERSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, KIMBERLY BOWSER, ALLISON JERNIGAN, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, RENE HANSON, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, STEPHEN M. BARONE, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, FRANK BODEMAN, SANDRA SHINGLE, JAYNE ENGLANDER, JUSTIN REVENE, BROOK REVSTOCK, MONA COHEN, LIZAJEAN HOLT, DONNA LEFEBVRE, KIM LEONARD, DEBRA LEROY, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, BARBARA WIDEN, SHIRLEY SEXTON, LAURI A. OSBORNE, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHRISTINA TROIANO, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, SUZANNE THOMSON, DONALD STIMMEL, Lidia Rodrigues, CAROL BROWN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, MARY TUNNELL, MYRNA LAW, BARBARA GONZALES, LERAE DINEEN, LORI L. WILSON, Kimberly Mello, MARK BONADIO, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DIXIE KELLER, DIANN DECKER, TOM WHALEY, STACEY HELLER, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, AUDREY KORNELIUS, CECILY MITCHELL, TERRENCE MITCHELL, DAVID RAPP, CAROL HAUGH, RICHARD MUELLER, PAUL LAVOIE, LARRY KLIMES, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, LYNDA NAGEL, NORMAN BRENTON, MARIA MITCHELL, GARY THOMAS, Megan Connerton, DAWN HOWE, TERESA EILERS, JEFF RUSIECKI, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, WILLIAM MCMAHON, KAROLE VANDUSEN, MARJORIE READY, JANICE BONIER, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, JULIE HIDALGO, CLARISSA KING, CAROL BAKER, JOHN COLLIARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, JENNIFER HART, DONNA KEAN, RUTH BEAL, DELORES STIMMEL, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, KAYE STEINSAPIR, LOIS GRADY, MICHELLE ADAMS, LINDA WEITZ, MEGAN WHITT, JASON LABBATE, ELIZABETH PALMER, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHERYL PUETT, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, KATHERINE DEMITH, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, DENISE VOLLMER, JETHRO WAGNER, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, PRUDENCE WALTERS, THERESA LUNA, CANDACE LAROSE, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, PATRICIA KAY, JASON KATZ, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, KIM GORGENS, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, MARY DICAPRIO, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, LARRY WILSON, TOINETTE ROBINSON, BARBARA SMITH, MICHELE SUGGETT, DON JAMES, DIANE SWARBERG, CHARLES RAY SIMS, PAMELA SIMS, DINA KARGER, VIRGINIA KOSLOW and Kirby Cooper
Defendant: CHEMNUTRA LLC, NESTLE SA, NESTLE HOLDINGS INC., NESTLE USA INC., MENU FOODS, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC., EUKANUBA, MASTERFOODS U.S.A., WALTHAM, CHENANGO VALLEY PET FOODS, IAMS CO., MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., DEL MONTE FOODS, INC., NEW ALBERTSONS, INC, NATURAL BALANCE PET FOODS, INC, JOHN DOES 1-100, ABC PARTNERSHIPS, XYZ CORPORATIONS, XUZHOU ANYING BIOLOGIC TECHNOLOGY DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LTD., M & M MARS INCORPORATED, FOSTER AND SMITH, INC, DEL MONTE CORPORATION, WALMART, INC., BINZHOU FUTIAN BIOLOGY TECHNOLOGY CO. LTD., WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY, SUNSHINE MILLS, INC., AMERICAN NUTRITION, INC., BLUE BUFFALO COMPANY, NATURAL BALANCE, INC., DIAMOND PET FOODS, SIERRA PET PRODUCTS, LLC, CERAL BYPRODUCTS, ROYAL CANIN, SMART PAK, CJ FOODS, SUZHOU TEXTILE IMPORT AND EXPORT COMPANY, CHEMNUTRA, INC., ALBERTSONS, INC, NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., PETCO SOUTHWEST, INC., PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES STORES, INC., FRY'S FOOD CENTERS, SMITH'S FOOD AND DRUG CENTERS, INC., KROGER CO., THE, PETSMART, NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES, INC., SAFEWAY, INC., THE PROCTOR & GAMBLE COMPANY, DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, HILL'S PET NUTRITION SALES, INC., COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, TARGET CORPORATION, HILLS PET NUTRITION, MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP and MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC.
Case Number: 1:2007cv02867
Filed: June 20, 2007
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: Camden
Referring Judge: Ann Marie Donio
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2010 376 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JACQUELINE JOHNSON re 375 Notice of Change of Address (DRURY, LARRY)
June 1, 2010 375 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by LARRY D. DRURY (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk)(DRURY, LARRY)
December 23, 2009 374 Featured Case Exhibit to 371 Amended Document by PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 23, 2009 373 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING SECOND AMENDMENT TO CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/23/2009. (nf, )
December 23, 2009 372 Featured Case Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez enclosing the Proposed Order to the Second Amendment To Settlement Agreement. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 22, 2009 371 Featured Case AMENDED DOCUMENT by PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. Second Amendment To Settlement Agreement. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 28, 2009 Featured Case Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 10/27/09.. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (lc)
October 27, 2009 370 Featured Case MANDATE of USCA as to 302 Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by Donald R. Earl. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to D.C. Clerk, # 2 Opinion)(ca3dm, )
September 30, 2009 369 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 363 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Order that defendant shall serve copies of this Order on John Lizotte and his attorney Christopher Uhl. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/30/2009. (nf, )
September 29, 2009 368 Featured Case Letter from Defendant, Iams, Inc. to withdraw Motion to Show Cause. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HADDEN, FRANCIS)
September 29, 2009 367 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by IAMS CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(HADDEN, FRANCIS)
September 23, 2009 366 Featured Case USCA JUDGMENT as to 302 Notice of Appeal (USCA) (ca3cjc )
September 10, 2009 365 Featured Case ORDER that Mr. Lizotte and his attorney Christopher Uhl show cause within 14 days from the date of this Order why they should not be held in contempt. Copies of this Order shall be served on Mr. Lizotte and his attorney Christopher Uhl and such service shall constitute notice. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/10/2009. (nf, )
August 27, 2009 364 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 363 MOTION for Order to Show Cause filed by IAMS CO.. (HADDEN, FRANCIS)
August 27, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 363 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 9/21/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nf, )
August 27, 2009 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: The Motion to Show Cause submitted by F.Hadden on 8/26/2009 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE SIGNATURE PAGES WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE AS AN EXHIBIT TO THE MOTION. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (nf, )
August 26, 2009 363 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Show Cause by IAMS CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Exhibit)(HADDEN, FRANCIS)
August 3, 2009 362 Featured Case ORDER that any individual objections to the destruction of recalled wheat gluten, etc... must be provided in written notice to the Court and Defendants by 8/31/2009, etc... Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/3/2009. (nf, )
August 3, 2009 361 Featured Case ORDER that if Yvonne and Ron McKim do not withdraw their complaint in the District Court of Clark County, Small Claims Department, State of Washington within 15 days they will be held in contempt. Defendants shall serve copies of this Order on Yvonne and Ron McKim and that such service shall constitute notice. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/3/2009. (nf, )
July 29, 2009 360 Featured Case RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY. (DEFEO, STEPHEN)
July 27, 2009 359 Featured Case Letter from Mary E. Gately re 356 Letter, 347 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, 317 Memorandum in Support of Motion,. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(GATELY, MARY)
July 21, 2009 358 Featured Case ORDER denying Donald Earl's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/21/2009. (nf, )
July 20, 2009 357 Featured Case Letter to Judge Hillman from Yvonne & Ron McKim, Re: Small Claims Case. (nf, )
July 17, 2009 356 Featured Case Letter from Class Plaintiffs Responding to the June 17, 2008 Order re 347 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
July 6, 2009 355 Featured Case ORDER that Yvonne and Ron McKim show cause within 14 days from the date of this Order why they should not be held in contempt. Defendants shall serve copies of this order on Yvonne and Ron McKim. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/6/2009. (nf, )
July 1, 2009 354 Featured Case ORDER denying 349 Motion to Dismiss. Ordered that if Paul and Ava Paquette do not withdraw their complaint with the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California within 15 days they will be held in contempt. Defendants shall serve copies of this Order on Paul and Ava Paquette and that such service shall constitute notice. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/1/2009. (nf, )
July 1, 2009 353 Featured Case Letter from Mary E. Gately and Craig A. Hoover. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Paquettes' Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Relief filed in C.D.Cal.)(GATELY, MARY)
June 30, 2009 352 Featured Case Plaintiffs Reply to Defendants Opposition, re 351 Brief in Opposition to Motion. (nf, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/30/2009: # 1 Declaration of Paul N. Paquette) (nf, ).
June 29, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 350 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 7/20/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nf, )
June 26, 2009 351 Featured Case BRIEF in Opposition re 349 MOTION to Dismiss Order To Show Cause For Lack Of Personal Jurisdiction And Request To Opt Out Late filed by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, MENU FOODS. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miranda Berge)(GATELY, MARY)
June 26, 2009 350 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Show Cause by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Miranda L. Berge, # 2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 3 to Declaration, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(DEFEO, STEPHEN)
June 24, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 349 MOTION to Dismiss OSC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motion set for 7/20/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nf, )
June 22, 2009 349 Featured Case MOTION to Dismiss OSC for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by PAUL N PAQUETTE, AVA PAQUETTE. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul Paquette, # 2 Declaration of Ava Paquette, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Text of Proposed Order)(nf, )
June 22, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Ordered that defendants' response to Paul and Ava Paquette's response to this Court's June 8, 2009 Order to Show Cause shall be due Friday, June 26, 2009. The Paquette's reply, if any, shall be due Tuesday, June 30, 2009. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on June 22, 2009. (gn )
June 18, 2009 348 Featured Case Letter from Mary E. Gately, Esq. and Craig A. Hoover. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Notice of Motion re Paquette)(HANSON, GERARD)
June 17, 2009 347 Featured Case ORDER granting 316 Motion for Issuance of Order to Show Cause for an Order Allowing for the Destruction of Recalled Wheat Gluten. This Order shall be stayed for 90 days or pending further Order of the Court, etc... Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/17/2009. (nf, )
June 8, 2009 346 Featured Case ORDER granting 343 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Paul and Ava Paquette to show cause within 14 days from the date of this Order. Defendants shall serve copies of this Order on Paul and Ava Paquette. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/8/2009. (nf, )
June 8, 2009 345 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 339 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Defendants shall serve copies of this Order on Kyung Oh, Michelle Barrett and their attorneys William Green and Jerry Lux. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/8/2009. (nf, )
June 8, 2009 344 Featured Case Letter from Morris Polich & Attorney, Counsel for Chemnutra re 316 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ORDER ALLOW FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND OTHER INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSE. (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
June 5, 2009 343 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Show Cause by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in support of Show Cause Motion, # 2 Declaration of Cristen Sikes Rose with Exhibits 1 through 7, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(HANSON, GERARD)
June 5, 2009 342 Featured Case Letter from D. Jeffery Ireland, Attorney for Defendants. (HADDEN, FRANCIS)
May 29, 2009 341 Featured Case Letter from Mary E. Gately, Esq.. (HANSON, GERARD)
May 20, 2009 340 Featured Case ORDER that Kyung Oh and Michelle Barrett and their attorneys show cause within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/20/2009. (nf, )
May 19, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 339 MOTION for Order to Show Cause. Motion set for 6/15/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nf, )
May 15, 2009 339 Featured Case MOTION for Order to Show Cause by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief In Support of Expedited Motion for Show Cause Order, # 2 Declaration of Christen Sikes Rose with Exhibits, # 3 Declaration of Brian D. Wright with Exhibits 1-2-3 (A,B), # 4 Declaration of Brian D. Wright Continued Exhibits 3-(C,D), # 5 Text of Proposed Order, # 6 Certificate of Service)(HANSON, GERARD)
May 4, 2009 Featured Case NOTICE TO COUNSEL: re 337 Telephone Status Conference set for May 7, 2009 at 1:00 p.m. has been CANCELLED. (gn )
April 20, 2009 338 Featured Case ORDER Enjoining Settlement Class Members Slembecker and Dotoli. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 4/20/2009. (nf, )
April 20, 2009 337 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/20/2009. Telephone Status Conference set for 5/7/2009 at 1:00pm (Court Reporter/Recorder Carl Nami.) (nf, )
April 13, 2009 336 Featured Case REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 316 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ORDER ALLOW FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND OTHER INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSE filed by DEL MONTE FOODS, INC., DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, DEL MONTE CORPORATION. (FAMA, RICHARD)
April 8, 2009 335 Featured Case Transcript of Proceedings held on 4/3/2009, before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter/Transcriber Stephen J. Daner, Telephone number 609-393-3001. NOTICE REGARDING REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this Transcript. If no such notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely available in electronic format to the public without redaction after ninety(90) calendar days. The redaction policy is located on our website at www.njd.uscourts.gov. Transcripts may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for release of transcript restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/29/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2009. (nf, )
April 7, 2009 334 Featured Case Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Enjoining Settlement Class Members Slembecker and Dotoli)(HANSON, GERARD)
April 3, 2009 333 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Order to Show Cause Hearing held on 4/3/2009 re 305 MOTION to Enforce Judgment For a Show Cause Order filed by MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD 327 CROSS MOTION to join class action settlement. Ordered motion Denied without prejudice. 330 Motion to join class action settlement by Cynthia Detoli, Ordered motion DENIED without prejudice. Ordered counsel for settlement class members to enjoin prosecution of claims in Southern District of NJ and State Court of NJ. Counsel consent to withdraw claims. Ordered order to be submitted by Mary E. Gately, Esq. Hearing on status update re: class settlement escrow funds. Telephone Status conference set for 4/20/2009 at 1:00pm (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (nf, )
April 3, 2009 332 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 316 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ORDER ALLOW FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND OTHER INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSE filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, SAFEWAY, INC., DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, EUKANUBA, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (BRECKENRIDGE, JENIPHR)
April 3, 2009 331 Featured Case REPLY MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MENU FOODS CORP. AND IAMS COMPANY'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY COUNSEL AND HER CLIENT LOIS SLEMBECKER SHOULD NOT BE HELD IN CONTEMPT ETC.. AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANTS ETC.. by Lois Slembecker (nf, )
April 3, 2009 330 Featured Case RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS EXPEDITED MOTION FOR DAMAGES by William Anastascio (nf, )
March 30, 2009 329 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC. "Corrected" Certificate of Service re Filing (325) (HANSON, GERARD)
March 27, 2009 328 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 305 MOTION to Enforce Judgment For a Show Cause Order, 327 MOTION filed by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(HANSON, GERARD)
March 26, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 327 RESPONSE AND CROSS MOTION FILED BY Nora Constance Marino on behalf of Lois Slembecker, Re: doc # 307 Motion set for 4/20/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nf, )
March 25, 2009 327 Featured Case RESPONSE AND CROSS MOTION FILED BY Nora Constance Marino on behalf of Lois Slembecker, Re: doc # 307 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Exhibit)(nf, )
March 24, 2009 325 Featured Case Defendant's Response Brief by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC.. (HANSON, GERARD)
March 23, 2009 326 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 3/23/2009, Re: Class Settlement escrow funds. Status Conference adjourned to 4/3/2009 at 11:00am in Courtroom 3A. (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (nf, )
March 19, 2009 324 Featured Case Letter from RICHARD FAMA, ESQ. re 319 Declaration, 322 Declaration, 320 Declaration, 321 Declaration, 317 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 316 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ORDER ALLOW FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND OTHER INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSE. (FAMA, RICHARD)
March 18, 2009 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 316 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ORDER ALLOW FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND OTHER INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSE. Motion set for 4/20/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (nf, )
March 17, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: ORDERED that the renewed request of counsel, Nora Constance Marino, for an extension of time for the briefing and oral argument on the Order to Show Cause 305 is GRANTED as to the extension of time for briefing. Her opposition shall be due Monday, March 23, 2009; Menu Foods' opposition shall be due Friday, March 27, 2009; and her reply shall be due April 1, 2009. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/17/09 (gn, )
March 17, 2009 323 Featured Case Letter from Mary E. Gately, Esq.. (HANSON, GERARD)
March 17, 2009 322 Featured Case DECLARATION of Michael Hayes by MENU FOODS. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1 to Declaration of Michael Hayes, # 2 Attachment 2 to Delcaration of Michael Hayes, # 3 Attachment 3 to Delcaration of Michael Hayes)(FAMA, RICHARD)
March 17, 2009 321 Featured Case DECLARATION of Stephen Miller by MENU FOODS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Stephen Miller)(FAMA, RICHARD)
March 17, 2009 320 Featured Case DECLARATION of Karen Firstenberg by MENU FOODS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Karen Firstenberg, # 2 Exhibit Part 1 to Exhibit B to Declaration of Karen Firstenberg, # 3 Exhibit Part 2 to Exhibit B to Declaration of Karen Firstenberg)(FAMA, RICHARD)
March 17, 2009 319 Featured Case DECLARATION of Anthony G. Brazil by MENU FOODS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Part 1 of Exhibit A to Declaration of Anthony G. Brazil, # 2 Exhibit Part 2 of Exhibit A to Anthony G. Brazil, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Anthony G. Brazil, # 4 Exhibit C to Declarationof Anthony G. Brazil, # 5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Anthony G. Brazil)(FAMA, RICHARD)
March 17, 2009 318 Featured Case MOTION [PROPOSED] ORDER ALLOWING FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSESSION OF SUCH INGREDIENTS by MENU FOODS. (FAMA, RICHARD)
March 17, 2009 317 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Support re 316 MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ORDER ALLOW FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND OTHER INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSE filed by MENU FOODS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Memo of Law in Support of Motion)(FAMA, RICHARD)
March 17, 2009 316 Featured Case MOTION DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR AN ORDER ALLOW FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF RECALLED WHEAT GLUTEN, RECALLED RICE PROTEIN CONCENTRATE AND OTHER INGREDIENTS ALLEGEDLY CONTAINING MELAMINE BEING STORED BY DEFENDANTS IN THE POSSESSION OF SUCH INGREDIENTS by MENU FOODS. (FAMA, RICHARD)
March 16, 2009 Featured Case TEXT ORDER, Ordered that the request of counsel, Nora Constance Marino, for an extension of time for the briefing and oral argument on the Order to Show Cause 305 is DENIED.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/16/2009. (nf, )
March 16, 2009 315 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 305 MOTION to Enforce Judgment For a Show Cause Order filed by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO.. (HANSON, GERARD)
March 11, 2009 314 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO. of Order to Show Cause and for Expedited Motion for Show Cause Order (HANSON, GERARD)
March 10, 2009 313 Featured Case Defendant's Response Brief by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(HANSON, GERARD)
March 10, 2009 312 Featured Case DESIGNATION OF CLERK'S PAPERS by Donald R. Earl (lc)
March 9, 2009 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: The Certificate of Service submitted by G. Hanson on 3/6/2009 contains an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (nf, )
March 6, 2009 311 Featured Case STATEMENT OF THE ISSUES by Donald R. Earl. (lc)
March 6, 2009 310 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Donald R. Earl -- UNNECESSARY FOR APPEAL PURPOSES-- RE: 302 APPEAL (lc)
March 6, 2009 309 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/6/2009, Re: Class Settlement Escrow Funds. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/23/2009 at 12:30pm. (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (nf, )
March 6, 2009 308 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO. of the Order to Show Cause and Amended Certificate of Service for the Expedited Motion for a Show Cause Order (HANSON, GERARD)
March 6, 2009 307 Featured Case ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 3/20/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Defendants Menu Foods and The Iams Company response due by 3/25/2009. Lois Slembecker and Cynthia Dotoli and their attorneys may submit a reply on 4/1/2009. A hearing on this matter will be held on 4/3/2009 at 11:00am Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/6/2009. (nf, )
March 5, 2009 306 Featured Case Letter from Mary E. Gately, Esq. re Expedited Motion for Show Cause Order. (HANSON, GERARD)
March 5, 2009 305 Featured Case MOTION to Enforce Judgment For a Show Cause Order by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Expedited Motion, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Declaration of Cristen Rose, Esq., # 10 Text of Proposed Order)(HANSON, GERARD)
March 5, 2009 304 Featured Case Notice to Pro se to receive NEF, by Donald Earl. (nf, )
March 3, 2009 Featured Case AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing:Status Conference scheduled for 3/6/2009 at 3:00 PM will be a Telephone Conference before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (gn )
February 26, 2009 Featured Case MOTION for Reconsideration re 303 Letter by NonParty in interest Donald R. Earl. (Clerk's Note: Doc. 303 was filed in error as a letter and has been reclassified as a Motion for Reconsideration)(gn)
February 26, 2009 303 Featured Case Letter from Non Party In Interest DONALD R. EARL addressed to Judge Hillman (lc)
February 26, 2009 302 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL by DONALD R. EARL objector and Non party in interest as to 140 Order on Motion for Discovery, 299 Order, 106 Order on Motion for Discovery, 128 Order. Filing fee $ 455.00, receipt number 100 308504. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: # 1 EXHIBIT 1, # 2 EXHIBIT 2, # 3 EXHIBIT 3, # 4 EXHIBIT 4)(lc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/27/2009: # 5 Cover Letter) (lc, ).
February 23, 2009 301 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Status Conference, re: class settlement escrow funds held on 2/23/2009. Status Conference set for March 6, 2009 at 3:00pm in Courtroom 3A (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (nf, )
February 23, 2009 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/6/2009 03:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (gn, )
February 10, 2009 299 Featured Case ORDER Motions of Donald R. Earl to intervene [287-2] and vacate 287 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/10/2009. (nf, )
February 9, 2009 300 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Status Conference held on 2/9/2009, Re: class settlement escrow funds. Telephone Status Conference reset for 2/23/2009 at 11:00am. (Court Reporter/Recorder Frank Gable.) (nf, )
February 4, 2009 298 Featured Case Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Advising Counsel that the February 9, 2009, Conference Call is for Lead/Liaison Counsel Only re 297 Letter. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
February 2, 2009 297 Featured Case Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Confirming the February 9, 2009, Telephone Conference Call with Judge Hillman (Dial-In and Reference I.D. Numbers Provided). (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 30, 2009 296 Featured Case Letter from Counsel for Menu Foods Defendants re Reply to Earl Letter (Docket No. 287). (HANSON, GERARD)
January 27, 2009 295 Featured Case ORDER Approving First Amendment to Settlement Agreement.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/27/2009. (nf, )
January 27, 2009 293 Featured Case Letter from Sandra L. McKenzie, Esq. requesting she be removed from the service list. (th, )
January 27, 2009 292 Featured Case BRIEF in Support re 284 MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe Plaintiffs Reply In Support Of Their Motion For Appeal Bond From Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus And Daniel Kaffer (REFILED, INCLUDING ALL NAMED PLAINTIFFS) filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 26, 2009 294 Featured Case Letter from Gail L. Oakley, Re: Payment (nf, )
January 26, 2009 291 Featured Case Plaintiff's Reply Brief by MATT LONG. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Kyle Kveton, # 2 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 26, 2009 290 Featured Case BRIEF in Support re 284 MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 22, 2009 289 Featured Case Letter from Counsel to the Honorable Noel L. Hillman enclosing First Amendment to Settlement Agreement. (Attachments: # 1 First Amended to Settlement Agreement, # 2 Proposed Order Approving First Amendment to Settlement Agreement)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
January 19, 2009 288 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 284 MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe filed by Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug in support of Opposition to Motion)(NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
January 9, 2009 287 Featured Case Letter from Donald R. Earl, Re: Motion to Vacate and Motion to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Motion, # 2 Certificate of Service)(nf, )
January 8, 2009 286 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Status Conference held on 1/8/2009 re: class settlement escrow funds. Ordered counsel to submit within two weeks a proposed amended agreement to amend funding mechanism. (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (nf, )
January 6, 2009 285 Featured Case MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 284 MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appe filed by JIM W JOHNSON, DUSTIN TURNER. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Brief, # 3 Declaration of Jeffrey Weinstein, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(MARGULIES, ROBERT)
December 29, 2008 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 284 MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson, etc. Motion returnable for 2/2/2009 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (gn, )
December 29, 2008 284 Featured Case MOTION for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer re 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs Notice of Motion for for Appeal Bond from Objectors/Appeallants Jim W. Johnson and Dustin Turner, and from Objectors/Appellants Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer, # 2 Declaration of Stuart A. Davidson, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
December 22, 2008 283 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by JIM W JOHNSON, DUSTIN TURNER for proceedings held on October 14, 2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman, (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MARGULIES, ROBERT)
December 19, 2008 282 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer for proceedings held on October 14, 2008 before Judge Hon. Noel L. Hillman, re 281 USCA Case Number, 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) Transcript due by 2/12/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
December 17, 2008 281 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-4779 for 279 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by Daniel Kaffer and Margaret Picus. USCA Case Manager Dana Moore (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3dm, )
December 17, 2008 280 Featured Case USCA Case Number 08-4741 for 277 Notice of Appeal (USCA), Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by DUSTIN TURNER and JIM W JOHNSON. USCA Case Manager Dana Moore (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3dm, )
December 12, 2008 279 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 275 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear,, Order on Motion to Intervene,,,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion for Settlement,,,, Order on Motion to Strike, 272 Order, 273 Judgment by Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 03120000000002310479. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 2/12/2009. (NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
December 11, 2008 278 Featured Case Letter from ROBERT M. JOSEPHS, ESQ.. (kr, )
December 3, 2008 277 Featured Case NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 272 Order, 273 Judgment by JIM W JOHNSON, DUSTIN TURNER. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 03120000000002296145. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(MARGULIES, ROBERT)
November 26, 2008 276 Featured Case Letter from Miriam Lewis, Re: Pet Food Products Settlement (nf, )
November 19, 2008 Featured Case ***Civil Case Terminated. (nf, )
November 19, 2008 273 Featured Case JUDGMENT DISMISSING ALL DEFENDANTS WITH PREJUDICE. (nf, )
November 18, 2008 275 Featured Case ORDER granting 202 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying 204 Motion to Intervene; granting 227 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice; denying 248 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 249 Motion for Settlement; granting 249 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 255 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/18/2008. (nf, )
November 18, 2008 271 Featured Case OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/18/2008. (nf, )
November 17, 2008 272 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASS, DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT AND AWARDING ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/17/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-C)(nf, )
November 14, 2008 274 Featured Case ORDER,That Plaintiffs are hereby authorized to move the escrow fund from Charter One Bank to JP Morgan Chase. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/14/2008. (nf, )
November 14, 2008 270 Featured Case Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez Plaintiffs intention to move escrow account. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 4, 2008 269 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by LISA J. RODRIGUEZ (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 23, 2008 266 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHEMNUTRA, INC. re 265 Stipulation (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
October 23, 2008 265 Featured Case STIPULATION and [proposed] order to destroy retained wheat gluten stored in the Bloomberg, Pennsylvania warehouse by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
October 22, 2008 268 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROPOSED CONSENT ORDER TO DESTROY CHEMNUTRA'S RETAINED WHEAT GLUTEN STORED IN THE BLOOMSBURG PENNSYLVANIA WAREHOUSE. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/22/2008. (nf, )
October 20, 2008 267 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/14/2008 before Judge Noel L Hillman. Court Reporter/Recorder: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (nf, )
October 16, 2008 264 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Conference, re: 203 Motion to Destroy retained wheat gluten, held on 10/16/2008. (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (nf, )
October 15, 2008 262 Featured Case Letter from Mrs. Miriam M. Lewis. Re: Pet Food Claim (Exhibits too Voluminous to be filed) (nf, )
October 14, 2008 263 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 10/14/2008 re 202 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, 227 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees, 249 Motion for Settlement Class, 255 MOTION to Strike, 204 Motion to Intervene (Court Reporter/Recorder Stephen J. Daner.) (nf, )
October 14, 2008 261 Featured Case Letter from Deborah Williamson, Re: Pet Food Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(nf, )
October 10, 2008 260 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 255 MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses Objection to Motion to Strike Application by Newman, Creed & Associates For an Award of Reimbursement of Costs filed by TODD SOKOLWSKI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Objection to Motion to Strike Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, # 2 Certificate of Service)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
October 10, 2008 259 Featured Case BRIEF OBJECTION TO THE AUDET DECLARATION AND EXHIBITS AND ARGUMENTS OF CLASS COUNSEL filed by JIM W JOHNSON, DUSTIN TURNER. (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(MARGULIES, ROBERT)
October 10, 2008 258 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 249 MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer. (NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
October 9, 2008 257 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 249 MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Attorney Fees on behalf of Menu Foods Defendants, Nestle Purina PetCare Co., Imans Co. and Petco, Petsmart, Target and Walmart filed by MENU FOODS, INC.. (HANSON, GERARD)
October 8, 2008 256 Featured Case Letter from Sherri Angelina Enyart, Re: Settlement (nf, )
October 8, 2008 255 Featured Case MOTION to Strike 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, CERAL BYPRODUCTS, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion to Strike the Application by by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, # 2 Declaration of Russell D. Paul in Support of Motion to Strike Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses, # 3 Text of Proposed Order, # 4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 6, 2008 Featured Case Setting Returnable date as to 249 MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Attorney Fees, 248 MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses. for 11/3/2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman.(PLEASE BE ADVISED MOTION WILL BE HEARD ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT) (nf, )
October 3, 2008 254 Featured Case Letter from Michelle R. Cassell, Re: Settlement Claim (nf, )
October 3, 2008 253 Featured Case Letter from Matt Ditchey. Re: Proposed Settlement (nf, )
October 3, 2008 252 Featured Case DECLARATION of Sincavage (Exhibit I to Fee Brief) is missing Exhibit D (attached) re 249 MOTION for Settlement MOTION for Attorney Fees by PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 3, 2008 251 Featured Case BRIEF Joint Opposition to Motion of Margaret Picus and Daniel Kaffer to Intervene filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, JIM W JOHNSON, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, IAMS CO., BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/7/2008: # 2 Signature Page) (nf, ).
October 3, 2008 250 Featured Case BRIEF Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsels Response to Objection Filed by Jeffrey L. Weinstein and Robert E. Margulies filed by PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of William M. Audet in Support of Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsels Response to Objection Filed by Jeffrey L. Weinstein and Robert E. Margulies, # 2 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 3, 2008 249 Featured Case MOTION for Settlement, MOTION for Attorney Fees by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, EUKANUBA, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement, Certification of Settlement Class, and Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, # 2 Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsels Application for an Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof, # 3 Exh A to Fee Brief (summary of co-lead's lodestar), # 4 Exh B to Fee Brief (BM Declaration), # 5 Exh C to fee brief (Wexler declaration), # 6 Exh D to Fee Brief (Couglin Declaration), # 7 Exh E to Fee Brief (Hagens Declaration), # 8 Exh F to Fee Brief (Audet Declaration), # 9 Exh G to Fee Brief (KamberEdelson Declaration), # 10 Exh H to Fee Brief (Trujillo Declaration), # 11 Exh I to Fee Brief (Sincavage Declaration), # 12 exhibit A to Sincavage Declaration, # 13 exhibit B to Sincavage Declaration, # 14 exhibit C, part 1, to Sincavage Declaration, # 15 exhibit C, part 2, to Sincavage Declaration, # 16 exhibit C, part 3, to Sincavage Declaration, # 17 exhibit C, part 4, to Sincavage Declaration, # 18 Exh J to Fee Brief (Miller Affidavit), # 19 Exh K to Fee Brief (Composite Exhibit of Orders), # 20 Joint Declaration of Plaintiffs Co-Lead Counsel in Support of Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and An Award of Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Litigation Expenses, # 21 [Proposed] Order Approving Class Action Settlement, Certifying Settlement Class, Directing Entry of Final Judgment and Awarding Attorneys Fees and Reimbursement of Expenses, # 22 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 3, 2008 248 Featured Case MOTION for Attorney Fees Application by Newman, Creed & Associates for Award of Attorneys' Fees and Reimbursement of Costs and Expenses by TODD SOKOLWSKI. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law, # 2 Declaration Declaration of Bruce E. Newman in Support of Application for Award of Attorney's Fees and Reimbursement of Costs, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Text of Proposed Order, # 9 Certificate of Service)(DEPALMA, JOSEPH)
October 3, 2008 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: JOHN FRANCIS MULLEN, does not have a correct e-mail address listed with the court and is not receiving his/her notices of electronic filing in this case. Pursuant to local rule 10.1 and court procedures, counsel and unrepresented parties are required to notify the court of any mailing or e-mail address changes. The court has deleted the invalid e-mail address. Attorneys should review the ECF link on our web site for information on maintaining your account and unrepresented parties, or those attorneys without access to maintaining their account, should notice the Clerk. (sa, )
October 2, 2008 247 Featured Case Letter from Charlotte Tucker Regarding Settlement.. (TAMBLYN, MARK)
October 2, 2008 246 Featured Case Letter from Patricia L. Gohla Regarding Settlement. (TAMBLYN, MARK)
September 29, 2008 244 Featured Case Letter from Frances P. Jordan (nf, )
September 29, 2008 243 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHEMNUTRA, INC. re 241 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion to destroy retained wheat gluten (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 29, 2008 242 Featured Case DECLARATION of Karen M. Firstenberg re 241 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion to destroy its remaining wheat gluten by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 29, 2008 241 Featured Case REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion re 203 MOTION to destroy retained wheat gluten filed by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 26, 2008 245 Featured Case Letter of clarification to my objection letter from Dana Sheehan. (nf, )
September 22, 2008 234 Featured Case Letter from LOIS MOORE objecting to proposed settlement. (tp )
September 19, 2008 240 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference held on 9/17/2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (tp )
September 19, 2008 231 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 203 MOTION to destroy retained wheat gluten filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, Adria Tyndall, Erik Tyndall, Alex Tyndall, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, ANITA FARR, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 18, 2008 239 Featured Case Letter from GINA DAVIS. (tp )
September 18, 2008 233 Featured Case ORDER denying 188 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/18/2008. (tp )
September 18, 2008 232 Featured Case Letter Objection to Proposed Settlement from GINA DAVIS. (tp )
September 18, 2008 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 227 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice JEFFREY L. WEINSTEIN. Motion set for 10/20/2008 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. (PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE HEARD ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT.) (tp )
September 18, 2008 230 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. re 229 Proposed Pretrial Order re Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by Robert M. Josephs (PENNINGTON, LINDSAY)
September 18, 2008 229 Featured Case Proposed Pretrial Order re Motion for Declaratory Judgment filed by Robert M. Josephs by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. (PENNINGTON, LINDSAY)
September 17, 2008 238 Featured Case Letter from Patrick Keegan & Jason E. Baker representing clients who object to proposed settlement. (tp )
September 17, 2008 237 Featured Case Letter from KELLY SCHEIBE. (tp )
September 17, 2008 227 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice JEFFREY L. WEINSTEIN by JIM W JOHNSON, DUSTIN TURNER. (Attachments: # 1 CERTIFICATION OF SERVICE, # 2 AFFIDAVIT OF ROBERT E. MARGULIES, # 3 LETTER OF GOOD STANDING, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(MARGULIES, ROBERT)
September 17, 2008 226 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Conference on Motion held on 9/17/2008 re 188 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by ROBERT M. JOSEPHS. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner.) (tp )
September 17, 2008 225 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 188 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by ROBERT M. JOSEPHS. (tp )
September 17, 2008 224 Featured Case NOTICE by SHIRLEY SEXTON of Firm Name Change (TAMBLYN, MARK)
September 17, 2008 212 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. re 211 Reply to Response to Motion, SURREPLY (PENNINGTON, LINDSAY)
September 17, 2008 211 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 188 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment SURREPLY filed by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Declaration of Dan Calkins in Support of Surreply, # 2 Exhibit B Connerton Complaint, # 3 Exhibit C Rodrigues Complaint)(PENNINGTON, LINDSAY)
September 16, 2008 236 Featured Case Letter from KRISTIN PATSALOS. (tp )
September 16, 2008 235 Featured Case Letter from JON ROBERTS. (tp )
September 15, 2008 222 Featured Case Second Letter from JEANETTE PIVOT. (tp )
September 15, 2008 220 Featured Case Letter from MR. AND MRS. ROBERT JAMES. (tp )
September 15, 2008 219 Featured Case Letter from LAURA A. CECERE. (tp )
September 15, 2008 218 Featured Case Letter from YEN LI MOORE. (tp )
September 15, 2008 217 Featured Case Letter from MARY TUNNELL. (tp )
September 15, 2008 216 Featured Case Letter from VIRGINIA KOSLOW. (tp )
September 15, 2008 215 Featured Case PET FOOD LIABILITY CLAIM FORM from CHRISTINE KIEFERT (tp )
September 15, 2008 214 Featured Case Letter with exhibits from DEBORAH HOCK. (tp )
September 15, 2008 213 Featured Case Letter from DONNA ELLIOTT. (tp )
September 15, 2008 210 Featured Case ORDER extending the comment, objection and opt-out periods until 9/30/2008 for Certain Claimants. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/11/2008. (tp )
September 15, 2008 209 Featured Case ORDER stating that Robert M. Josephs is Enjoined from proceeding in the small claims action filed in Waltham District Court, Defendant Nutro Products is Ordered to file a sur-reply addressing Mr. Josephs arguments. Telephone conference set for 9/17/2008 at 2:00pm. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/12/2008. (tp )
September 15, 2008 Featured Case Set Deadlines as to 204 MOTION to Intervene as Settlement Class Members. Motion set for 10/20/2008 in Camden before Judge Noel L. Hillman. PLEASE NOTE THAT PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 78 AND LOCAL RULE 7.1(B)(4), NO ORAL ARGUMENT WILL BE HELD IN THIS MATTER AND PARTIES SHOULD NOT APPEAR UNLESS SPECIFICALLY DIRECTED TO DO SO BY THE COURT (tp )
September 12, 2008 208 Featured Case DECLARATION of Kyle R. Nordrehaug (part 1 of 2) in Support of Objections re 206 Notice (Other), 205 Notice (Other), 204 MOTION to Intervene as Settlement Class Members by Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug in Support of Objections with Exhibits 6-9 (part 2), # 2 Declaration of Robert Klein, # 3 Request for Limited Discovery in Connection with Objections, # 4 Certificate of Service)(NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
September 12, 2008 207 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL I. WARD on behalf of Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer (WARD, DANIEL)
September 12, 2008 206 Featured Case NOTICE by Margaret Picus OBJECTION TO CLASS SETTLEMENT AND OPPOSITION TO FINAL APPROVAL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Settlement Class member Margaret Picus)(NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
September 12, 2008 205 Featured Case NOTICE by Daniel Kaffer of OBJECTION TO CLASS SETTLEMENT AND OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Settlement Class member Daniel Kaffer)(NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
September 12, 2008 204 Featured Case MOTION to Intervene as Settlement Class Members by Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion for Intervention by Settlement Class Members, # 2 Certificate of Service, # 3 Declaration of Robert Klein, # 4 Declaration of Daniel Kaffer, # 5 Declaration of Margaret Picus, # 6 Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug with Exhibits 1-5 (part 1 of 2), # 7 Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug with Exhibits 6-9 (part 2 of 2), # 8 Text of Proposed Order Granting Intervention)(NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
September 11, 2008 Featured Case CLERK'S NOTE: Document #228 was corrected to read, Letter from Susan Foresman re: not opting out of proposed settlement. (MB, )
September 11, 2008 228 Featured Case Letter from SUSAN FORESMAN re: not opting out of proposed settlement. (tp ) Modified on 9/18/2008 (gn, ). Modified on 9/19/2008 (MB, ).
September 11, 2008 223 Featured Case Letter from JOHN MORASKI. (tp )
September 11, 2008 221 Featured Case Letter from JEANETTE PIVOT. (tp )
September 11, 2008 Featured Case Set Returnable Date as to 203 MOTION to destroy retained wheat gluten for 10/6/2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Please be advised, the motion will be decided on the papers unless otherwise notified by the Court. (th, )
September 11, 2008 Featured Case Set Returnable Date as to 202 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Settlement Class Members for 10/6/2008 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Please be advised, the motion will be decided on the papers unless otherwise notified by the Court. (th, )
September 11, 2008 203 Featured Case MOTION to destroy retained wheat gluten by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 11, 2008 202 Featured Case MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Settlement Class Members by Margaret Picus, Daniel Kaffer. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Daniel Ward and Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 2 Declaration of Kyle Nordrehaug in support of Pro Hac Vice Admission, # 3 Certificate of Service, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(NORDREHAUG, KYLE)
September 10, 2008 201 Featured Case Letter from (Joint Letter) from Counsel to Request a Short Extension of the Comment, Objection and Opt-Out Periods. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 10, 2008 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: The Notice of Motion to Destroy Retained Wheat Gluten document number 194 filed by Anthony Brazil on 9/5/08 was submitted incorrectly using the Notice (Other) event. The Certificate of Service document number 199 filed by Anthony Brazil on 9/5/08 did not contain a proper electronic signature. Only the attorney submitting a document my use the s/Attorney's Name, all other signatures must be scanned. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE MOTION TO DESTROY using the event MISCELLANEOUS RELIEF found in the Motions Menu AND ATTACH THE CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE with a scanned signature using the feature ATTACHMENTS TO DOCUMENT found on the BROWSE screen. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (th, )
September 8, 2008 200 Featured Case Letter from James Norbert Napier to the Clerk re: pet food. (th, )
September 8, 2008 Featured Case (TEXT ORDER) ORDERED THAT Robert M. Josephs' reply in support of his motion for declaratory judgment or relief from stay 188 is due no later than 12:00 p.m. (noon) Friday, September 12, 2008. No extensions or continuances will be granted to file the reply. by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/8/2008. (gn)
September 7, 2008 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: The Certificate of Service document # 192 submitted by L. Pennington on 9/3/08 was filed incorrectly as a Notice (Other). In the future when filing Certificates of Service, please use the event Certificate of Service found in the Service of Process menu. This message is for informational purposes only. (th, )
September 5, 2008 199 Featured Case CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by CHEMNUTRA, INC. re 194 Notice (Other) of motion and motion to destroy retained wheat gluten (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 5, 2008 198 Featured Case DECLARATION of Anthony G. Brazil re 194 Notice (Other) of motion and motion to destroy retained wheat gluten by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A, Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits C and D)(BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 5, 2008 197 Featured Case DECLARATION of Karen M. Firstenberg re 194 Notice (Other) of Motion and Motion to destroy retained wheat gluten by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 1, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 2, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B, Part 3)(BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 5, 2008 196 Featured Case DECLARATION of Stephen S. Miller re 194 Notice (Other) in Support of Chemnutra's Motion to Destroy Its Remaining Recalled Wheat Gluten by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 5, 2008 195 Featured Case Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Order Granting Chemnutra, Inc.'s Motion to Destroy Retained Wheat Gluten by CHEMNUTRA, INC.. (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 5, 2008 194 Featured Case NOTICE by CHEMNUTRA, INC. of Motion and Motion to Destroy Retained Wheat Gluten (BRAZIL, ANTHONY)
September 3, 2008 192 Featured Case NOTICE by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. re 189 Response in Opposition to Motion PROOF OF SERVICE (PENNINGTON, LINDSAY)
September 2, 2008 193 Featured Case Letter from Eric Peterson re: Pet Food Litigation. (th, )
September 2, 2008 191 Featured Case NOTICE by DUSTIN TURNER of Intention to Appear, Request to Speak at the Hearing, Objection to the Proposed Settlement, Objection to Class Certification and Certificate of Service (MARGULIES, ROBERT)
September 2, 2008 190 Featured Case NOTICE by JIM W JOHNSON of Intention to Appear, Request to Speak at the Hearing, Objection to Proposed Settlement, Objection to Class Certification, and Certificate of Service (MARGULIES, ROBERT)
September 2, 2008 189 Featured Case RESPONSE in Opposition re 188 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment filed by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration in Support of Opposition, # 2 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Declaration)(PENNINGTON, LINDSAY)
August 27, 2008 Featured Case Defendant Nutro Products Inc.'s opposition to motion for declaratory relief 188 is due September 2, 2008. (jm1, )
August 27, 2008 Featured Case NOTICE: Defendant Nutro Products Inc.'s opposition to motion for declaratory relief 188 is due September 2, 2008. (gn, )
August 26, 2008 Featured Case Setting returnable date as to 188 MOTION for Declaratory Judgment. Motion Hearing set for 9/15/2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. The motion will be decided on the papers unless otherwise notified by the Court. (jm1, )
August 25, 2008 187 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by MARK JOHN TAMBLYN (TAMBLYN, MARK)
August 22, 2008 188 Featured Case MOTION for Declaratory Judgment or Relief from Stay by ROBERT M. JOSEPHS. (jm1, )
August 21, 2008 186 Featured Case Letter from Mr. Dabney A. Lewis Re: proposed settlement (jm1, )
August 14, 2008 184 Featured Case Letter from Gerald J. Reilly. Re: Settlement (jm1, )
August 14, 2008 183 Featured Case Letter from James W. Keating Re: Settlement. (jm1, )
August 8, 2008 185 Featured Case Letter from Gerald J. Reilly Re: Settlement. (jm1, )
July 31, 2008 181 Featured Case SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY; substituting Stephen J. DeFeo for Warren W. Faulk. (DEFEO, STEPHEN) Modified on 8/7/2008 (jm1, ).
July 31, 2008 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: The Letter by Oriana Carrington documents 177 and 180 submitted by Oriana Carrington on 7/24/08 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (jm1, )
July 30, 2008 182 Featured Case Letter from Nancy Bradley. (jm1, )
July 28, 2008 179 Featured Case NOTICE by NATURAL BALANCE PET FOODS, INC of Disclosure Statement Form (BRACAGLIA, THOMAS)
July 28, 2008 178 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. BRACAGLIA on behalf of NATURAL BALANCE PET FOODS, INC (BRACAGLIA, THOMAS)
July 28, 2008 177 Featured Case Letter from Oriana Carrington. (jm1, ) Modified on 7/31/2008 (jm1, ).
July 28, 2008 176 Featured Case Letter from Roberta J. Leahy-Watts. (jm1, )
July 24, 2008 180 Featured Case Letter from Oriana Carrington. (jm1, ) Modified on 7/31/2008 (jm1, ).
July 17, 2008 175 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 173 MDL Conditional Transfer Order W.D. Texas 1:08-221. (th, )
July 17, 2008 174 Featured Case Clerk Notification Letter re 173 MDL Conditional Transfer Order - W.D. of Texas 1:08-221. (th, )
July 17, 2008 173 Featured Case Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order of MDL Panel transferring an action from the W.D. of Texas; Case# 1:08-221 to this court. (th, )
July 16, 2008 170 Featured Case Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney TRICIA B. O'REILLY and LIZA M. WALSH terminated. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 16, 2008 169 Featured Case Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney TRICIA B. O'REILLY and LIZA M. WALSH terminated. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 16, 2008 168 Featured Case Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney TRICIA B. O'REILLY and LIZA M. WALSH terminated. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 16, 2008 167 Featured Case Notice to be terminated and withdraw from Notices of Electronic filing as to case. Attorney TRICIA B. O'REILLY and LIZA M. WALSH terminated. (WALSH, LIZA)
July 14, 2008 172 Featured Case Letter from Anthony Peluso Re: Settlement. (jm1, )
July 14, 2008 171 Featured Case Letter from Dana Sheehan Re: Settlement. (jm1, )
July 3, 2008 166 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER directing Clerk to place "Pet Food Settlemnt" on docket which in turn will direct the viewer to the link www.petfoodsettlement.com. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 7/3/08. (jm1, )
July 3, 2008 165 Featured Case NOTICE by PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION of Withdrawal of Appearance for Donna Siegel Moffa (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
July 2, 2008 164 Featured Case STIPULATION By And Between Counsel Agreeing That A Link Will be Placed on the District Court's Home Page by PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
June 27, 2008 163 Featured Case Letter from Warren Irwin. (db, )
June 26, 2008 162 Featured Case Letter from Patricia Hancock. (js)
June 23, 2008 161 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 159 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (th, )
June 23, 2008 160 Featured Case Clerk Notification Letter re 159 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (th, )
June 20, 2008 158 Featured Case NOTICE by JENNIFER HART OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE (ODENBREIT, KATHERINE)
June 20, 2008 157 Featured Case NOTICE by HAYLEY FORD OF FILING PROOFS OF SERVICE (ODENBREIT, KATHERINE)
June 18, 2008 156 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 30, 2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (jm1, )
June 17, 2008 155 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by CARA A. BRYANT, SANDRA L. MCKENZIE on behalf of WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL (th, )
June 13, 2008 159 Featured Case Order of MDL Panel Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order and transferring certain action from the N.D. of Illinois; Case# 1:08-2427 to this court. (th, )
May 30, 2008 153 Featured Case ORDER granting 151 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Approval of Proposed Form of Notice, and Preliminary Certification of Settlement Class. Final Settlement Approval Hearing 10/14/08 @ 9:30, etc. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/30/08. (th, )
May 30, 2008 152 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Motion Hearing held on 5/30/2008 re 151 MOTION for Settlement (Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Approval of Proposed Form of Notice, and Preliminary Certification of Settlement Class) filed by SUSAN FORESMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, MARK COHEN, EMILY TOMPKINS, DON JAMES, RICHARD MUELLER, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, RICHARD KAY, KIRA ANDRES, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, PAULA MONK, DIANE LOWERY, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, LYNDA NAGEL, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, CAROL GRETZ, MARA BRAZILIAN, MELISSA BECKO, KIMBERLY BOWSER, Lidia Rodrigues, BARBARA GONZALES, LORI L. WILSON, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, MARY JO THOMAS, WENDY KROSSCHELL, JULIE HIDALGO, MARIANNA CUTTER, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, SUNSHINE MILLS, INC., BRANDON C. BOURRET, JETHRO WAGNER, CONNIE MCKINNEY, KIM GORGENS, Bobby Wingo, DEBORAH MASSO, KIM LEONARD, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, RAMONA BERRY, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, KELLY FINESTONE, SARAH CAVIN, PAMELA SIMS, PRUDENCE WALTERS, CHANTELLE CONTI, JAYNE ENGLANDER, LORRAINE JOHNSON, PAUL LAVOIE, ROBERT WEISS, RUTH BEAL, BARBARA WIDEN, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MICHAEL SENA, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, LAURA MIGLIORE, RHONDA GOOD, GARY THOMAS, MYRNA LAW, PAUL RICHARD, Kirby Cooper, STEPHEN TERRELL, SHIRLEY SEXTON, LAURI A. OSBORNE, CHERYL CARVER, CANDACE LAROSE, TODD SOKOLWSKI, RENE HANSON, TROY GAGLIARDI, CAROL BAKER, DAVID CARTER, CINDY CAMP, SHERYL PUETT, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, RAYMOND DEMITH, WILLIAM GRETZ, RICHARD SCHWINGER, STEPHEN DONNELLY, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, MIKE CLARK, HEATHER AMRO, ERYN MULLOY, LOIS GRADY, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, KENNETH WHITTEN, LYNN PUSILIO, STEVE COLQUITT, NORMAN BRENTON, RICHARD FEIGHT, JOHN COLLIARD, DEENA JACKSON, CAROL HAUGH, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, JEFF RUSIECKI, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, LARRY WILSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, TODD COLE, MITCH ENGLANDER, JIM BULLOCK, KAY BYERS, JESSICA KATZ, WILLIAM MCMAHON, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, SUZANNE THOMSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, LOIS MITCHELL, NICK JACKSON, DONNA LEFEBVRE, JENNIFER BUELL, DONALD STIMMEL, CHARLES KOHLER, LISA NICHOLS, DIXIE KELLER, SANDRA L. GRAY, GERALDINE PAULEY, MONNA MCCORMICK, CHARLES RAY SIMS, PATRICIA KAY, DIANA DIEDRICH, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, TOM WHALEY, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, DEBRA LEROY, LYNNE CARESTIO, MARIA MITCHELL, BROOK REVSTOCK, LOREN BYERS, MIRANDA DANIELE, CIRO AIELLO, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DARLENE WARD, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, KRISTEN BENECK, JUDY SHOPE, JOHN LOGAN, GAIL BRYAN, CLARISSA KING, GEORGE BIRNEY, Sonja Foxe, DENISE BOURRET, MONA COHEN, LESLIE BERNDL, ELIZABETH PALMER, LINDA GORRELL, TERRI MOSES, SHERRY INGLES, BARBARA LIGHT, LORRIE PARADISO, JON ROBERTS, TERESA EILERS, KAREN PIRCHES, DAWN HOWE, MICHELLE ADAMS, HARMONY ADAMS, MEGAN WHITT, CRYSTAL PICKETT, MARK BONADIO, CYNTHIA POOLE, KAMI HUFF, GREGORY BOEHM, ALLISON JERNIGAN, DANIEL RAY REEVES, HAYLEY FORD, EMORY ARIANO, CHRISTINA TROIANO, TAMMY MATTHEWS, DENISE FORSYTH, JEFFERY N. LUTHI, JEN OLBRICHT, TONI DENHAM, CRYSTAL WARD, STEPHENIE SHEME, JANICE BONIER, LERAE DINEEN, DONNA KEAN, TRACY RICHARDSON, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DIANE SWARBERG, DAVID RAPP, Megan Connerton, ROBERT PAYNE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, SANDRA SMITH, LEMECIA LANDRUM, LINDA WEITZ, ERICA RAMBUS, JAMES CONNER, MICHELLE GODE, KURT WHITT, SCOTT STACEY, CAROL BROWN, CARLA DETWILER, MARK CASHMAN, JUSTIN REVENE, JANET GOODWIN, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, DAWN MAJERCZYK, BETH DOMBROSKI, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, JO ANN OAKLIEF, JENNIFER HIRNI, MARK HEATON, THERESA LUNA, CAMILLA BRANKOV, TODD HANSON, MARK GOLDING, TRACY COLE, DINA KARGER, DON WARN, IAN WHITE, FRANCES NASH, MARY KAY URBAN, LAURIE WOODMAN, TAMARA ARENDT, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, KAYE STEINSAPIR, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, MARJORIE READY, CLAIRE WALTER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, KAMI TURTURRO, KROGER CO., THE, CARL DICKSON, BARBARA SMITH, DENISE VOLLMER, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, LUKE DEBARATHY, LIZAJEAN HOLT, PERRY K. ALLISON, LOU ANN CAMERON, SANDRA CRAFT, STACEY HELLER, RICK OBERNOLTE, JASON LABBATE, KAROLE VANDUSEN, KATHERINE ALLISON, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, DANNY MICKEY, FRANK BODEMAN, GLEN TUNNELL, SHANNON J. KRAMER, CECILY MITCHELL, GAIL MORAN, DELORES STIMMEL, EVELYN SEEMAN, JIM MOSES, GINGER SNYDER, SANDRA SHINGLE, KATHLEEN DEMITH, DINITRISE HICKS, STEPHEN M. BARONE, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, GARY BRUSKI, PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, BRUCE FOSTER, AUDREY BIRNEY, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LARRY KLIMES, GUY BRITTON, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, TONY BOYER, JARED WORKMAN, SARA DOSCH, JENNIFER SNELL, JENNIFER HART, LINDA TINKER, HELEN PERCY, KATERNINE FEIGHT, MARY TUNNELL, CRAIG ANDERSON, MICHELE THRASH, SUSIE LAWS, RANDY ST. ONGE, JASON KATZ, MATT LONG, JENNIFER RICHARD, KATHERINE DEMITH, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, DIANN DECKER, CHERI CUTLER. Terms of Settlement read into the record. Ordered class preliminarily certified. Ordered settlement hearing set for 10/14/08 @ 9:30 am. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner.) (th, )
May 27, 2008 154 Featured Case Acknowledgment of receipt of Clerk's Notification Letter sent to W.D. of Louisiana. (th, )
May 23, 2008 Featured Case Setting returnable date as to 151 MOTION for Settlement (Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Approval of Proposed Form of Notice, and Preliminary Certification of Settlement Class) Motion Hearing set for 5/30/2008 09:30 AM before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (jm1, )
May 22, 2008 151 Featured Case MOTION for Settlement (Joint Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Approval of Proposed Form of Notice, and Preliminary Certification of Settlement Class) by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, LARRY KLIMES, JAMES CONNER, PAUL LAVOIE, RICHARD MUELLER, FRANCES NASH, LORI L. WILSON, DONALD STIMMEL, DELORES STIMMEL, RUTH BEAL, MARK BONADIO, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, GEORGE BIRNEY, CHANTELLE CONTI, AUDREY BIRNEY, CHERI CUTLER, GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER, Lidia Rodrigues, Megan Connerton, Kimberly Mello, STEVEN FREEMAN, Kirby Cooper, SANDRA L. GRAY, NICK JACKSON, DEENA JACKSON, Sonja Foxe, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 08-959)), KAREN PIRCHES, KATHLEEN DEMITH, GARY BRUSKI, SUSIE LAWS, DINITRISE HICKS, MONNA MCCORMICK, MICHELE THRASH, PERRY K. ALLISON, KATHERINE ALLISON, JENNIFER BUELL, JAMES E. CLINE, WINSTON DAVID SNELL, JENNIFER SNELL, Bobby Wingo, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, KROGER CO., THE, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, JEFFERY N. LUTHI, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, SUNSHINE MILLS, INC., MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH((Civil 07-3296)), KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Notice Of Joint Motion And Joint Motion For Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement, Approval Of Proposed Forms Of Notice, And Preliminary Certification Of Settlement Class, # 2 Exhibit 1 to the Memorandum of Law (Settlement Agreement), # 3 Exhibit 1 to the Settlement Agreement ( List of Canadian Actions), # 4 Exhibit 2 to the Settlement Agreement (Claim Form), # 5 Exhibit 3A to the Settlement Agreement ( Short Form Notice (US)), # 6 Exhibit 3B to the Settlement Agreement (Long Form Notice (US)), # 7 Exhibit 3C to the Settlement Agreement (Short Form Notice (Canada)), # 8 Exhibit 3D to the Settlement Agreement (Long Form Notice (Canada)), # 9 Exhibit 4A to the Settlement Agreement (Preliminary Approval Order (US)), # 10 Exhibit 4B to the Settlement Agreement (Order for Cert and Notice Approval (Canada)), # 11 Exhibit 5 to the Settlement Agreement (CAFA Notice), # 12 Exhibit 6A to the Settlement Agreement (Final Approval Order (US)), # 13 Exhibit 6B to the Settlement Agreement (Final Approval Order (Canada)), # 14 Exhibit 7 to the Settlement Agreement (Guidelines), # 15 Exhibit 2 to the M emorandum of Law, # 16 Exhibit 3 to the Memorandum of Law, # 17 Exhibit 4 to the Memorandum of Law, # 18 Exhibit 5 to the Memorandum of Law, # 19 Exhibit 6 to the Memorandum of Law, # 20 Exhibit 7 to the Memorandum of Law, # 21 Declaration of Edward J. Sincavage in Support of the Proposed Notice Plan, # 22 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
May 13, 2008 150 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on May 8, 2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman, U.S.D.J.. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (jm1, )
May 9, 2008 149 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 147 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (th, )
May 9, 2008 148 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter re 147 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (th, )
May 8, 2008 146 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Telephone Conference held on 5/8/2008. Ordered preliminary fairness hearings set for 5/30/08 @ 9:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Stephen Daner.) (jm1, )
May 8, 2008 Featured Case (TEXT ORDER)ORDERED that the parties' papers in support of preliminary approval of the class action settlement shall be filed no later than May 20, 2008; and it is further ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for May 14, 2008 has been rescheduled for May 30, 2008 at 9:30am in Courtroom 3A. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/8/08. (sa, )
May 2, 2008 147 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order of MDL Panel transferring certain action from the W.D. of Louisiana; Case# 5:08-378 to this court. (th, )
May 1, 2008 145 Featured Case ORDER extending time for parties to submit papers in support of Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 05/01/08. (db, )
May 1, 2008 144 Featured Case LETTER ORDER granting extension of time to submit papers in support of Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 5/1/2008. (sk)
May 1, 2008 143 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT A. MCNEELY on behalf of GINGER SNYDER, JOSEPH P SNYDER (sk)
April 30, 2008 142 Featured Case Letter from All Parties Requesting an Additional Week to Submit Papers in Support of Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
April 17, 2008 141 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS P. BRACAGLIA on behalf of NATURAL BALANCE PET FOODS, INC (BRACAGLIA, THOMAS)
April 14, 2008 140 Featured Case ORDER granting 139 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 4/14/08. (js)
April 10, 2008 Featured Case Setting Deadlines as to 139 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2008 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. PLEASE BE ADVISED THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (js)
April 10, 2008 139 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, HILLS PET NUTRITION, NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Appendix A, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 1 pt.2, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Exhibit B, # 11 Exhibit C, # 12 Exhibit D, # 13 Exhibit E, # 14 Exhibit F, # 15 Exhibit G, # 16 Exhibit H)(SANOM, LAURA)
April 9, 2008 138 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 136 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
April 9, 2008 137 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter re 136 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
April 8, 2008 136 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order of MDL Panel transferring certain action from the Southern District of Texas (Victoria); Case# 6:07cv66 to this court. (sb)
April 2, 2008 135 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on April 1, 2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman and Judge Ann Marie Donio. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
April 1, 2008 134 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Pre Trial/Status Conference held on 4/1/2008. Ordered Settlement Conference set for 5/14/08 at 11:00am.(Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner.) (sb)
March 14, 2008 133 Featured Case ORDER denying counsel's request to appear via telephone for the March 18, 2008 hearing. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/14/08. (sb)
March 14, 2008 Featured Case (TEXT ORDER)ORDERED that the parties' request for an additional two-week adjournment of the continuation of the initial practice and procedure conference scheduled for Tuesday, March 18, 2008 at 9:30am is GRANTED, and the conference is rescheduled for Tuesday, April 1, 2008 at 10:00am. It is further ORDERED that this shall be the final adjournment of the conference, and if the parties' mediation has not been successful by that time, the case will proceed in standard course before this Court pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Manual for Complex Litigation, and Multidistrict Litigation guidelines. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/14/08. (sa, )
March 14, 2008 132 Featured Case NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., PETSMART (sb)
March 13, 2008 131 Featured Case Letter from Kenneth A. Wexler. (WEXLER, KENNETH)
March 4, 2008 Featured Case NOTICE of CHANGE OF HEARING DATE AND TIME: Status Conference rescheduled for 3/18/2008 09:30 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (sa, )
February 29, 2008 130 Featured Case ORDERED that the parties request for an additional two weeks to continue mediation is GRANTED and further ORDERED that the Court will hold the continuation of the initial practice and procedure conference on March 19, 2008 at 10:00am in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/29/08. (sb)
February 29, 2008 Featured Case NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/19/2008 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (sa, )
February 28, 2008 129 Featured Case STATUS REPORT , re: Resolution of Outstanding Matters by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC.. (HANSON, GERARD)
February 19, 2008 128 Featured Case ORDERED that the "Objection to Pet Food Evidence Disposal Plan Approved on December 18, 2007" is denied. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/19/08. (sb)
February 15, 2008 127 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 14, 2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
February 14, 2008 126 Featured Case OBJECTION TO PET FOOD EVIDENCE DISPOSAL PLAN APPROVED ON DECEMBER 18, 2007 filed by Donald R. Earl. (sb)
February 14, 2008 125 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by PATRICK D BLAKE, KEVIN L. KELLER, GARY A. BRYANT on behalf of WILBUR-ELLIS COMPANY (sb)
February 14, 2008 121 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman: Pretrial Conference held on 2/14/2008. Ordered application of (party in interest)/plaintiff Donald Earl denied. Order to be submitted. Status of Mediation and Preservation issues discussed. Ordered counsel to respond jointly by letter to Court advising of status of mediation.(Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner.) (sb)
February 14, 2008 120 Featured Case Letter from Menu Foods counsel enclosing Order Denying Earl Objection. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order denying Earl Objection)(HANSON, GERARD)
February 13, 2008 124 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 122 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
February 13, 2008 123 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter re 122 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
February 13, 2008 122 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order from Judicial Panel of MDL transferring certain action from the Northern District of Florida; Case# 07-180 to this court. (sb)
February 12, 2008 119 Featured Case Letter from Gerard H. Hanson. (HANSON, GERARD)
February 7, 2008 118 Featured Case Letter from Supplemental Letter from Menu Foods Counsel - Amy Schulman re Earl Objection. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2/5/08 Ltr from Menu Foods Counsel to Hon. Noel Hillman, # 2 Exhibit 2/6/08 Washington State Court of Appeals Order)(HANSON, GERARD)
February 7, 2008 Featured Case (TEXT ORDER) ORDERED that lead or liaison counsel for both plaintiffs and defendants shall submit a proposed agenda for the Thursday, February 14, 2008 continuation of the initial practice and procedures conference no later than Tuesday, February 12, 2008. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/7/08. (sa, )
February 5, 2008 117 Featured Case Letter from Del Monte's Counsel, Richard Fama, on behalf of non-Menu manufacturing defendants re 116 Letter. (FAMA, RICHARD)
February 5, 2008 116 Featured Case Letter from Menu Foods Counsel - Amy W. Schulman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Washington State Preservation Motion)(HANSON, GERARD)
February 5, 2008 Featured Case Notice: Defendants shall file a response to "OBJECTION TO PET FOOD EVIDENCE DISPOSAL PLAN APPROVED ON DECEMBER 18, 2007 filed by Donald R. Earl," Docket No. 115, by Friday, February 8, 2008. (sa, )
January 30, 2008 115 Featured Case OBJECTION TO PET FOOD EVIDENCE DISPOSAL PLAN APPROVED ON DECEMBER 18, 2007 filed by Donald R. Earl. (sb)
January 28, 2008 114 Featured Case STIPULATION AND CONSENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/28/08. (sb)
January 24, 2008 113 Featured Case Letter from Menu Foods counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Proposed Letter to Evans)(HANSON, GERARD)
January 7, 2008 112 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 110 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
January 7, 2008 111 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter re 110 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
January 7, 2008 110 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order from Judicial Panel of MDL transferring certain tag-along actions to this court. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk# 2 Counsel List) (Recv'd 12/7/07)(sb)
January 4, 2008 109 Featured Case ORDERED that the stay in this matter shall be extended until February 14, 2008, on which date the Court will hold the continuation of the initial practice and procedure conference at 11:00am in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/4/08. (sb)
January 4, 2008 108 Featured Case Letter from BRIAN P. HEERMANCE withdrawing as counsel for Chemnutra, Inc. (sb)
December 18, 2007 107 Featured Case CONSENT ORDER regarding organization of plaintiffs' counsel. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/18/07. (sb)
December 18, 2007 106 Featured Case ORDER granting 103 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/18/07. (sb)
December 18, 2007 105 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 87 Motion for Discovery. ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for December 20, 2007 at 2:00pm is cancelled. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/18/07. (sb)
December 18, 2007 Featured Case (TEXT ORDER)ORDERED that the continuation of the initial practice and procedure conference scheduled for Monday, January 7, 2007 at 11:00am is RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, January 8, 2007 at 11:00am. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/18/07. (sa, )
December 12, 2007 104 Featured Case DECLARATION of Service of Beth Harper re 101 Notice of Appearance by HILLS PET NUTRITION. (KARG, STEVEN)
December 12, 2007 Featured Case Setting Deadlines as to 103 MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Motion returnable date set for 1/4/2008 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (sb)
December 11, 2007 103 Featured Case MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by CHEMNUTRA, INC., DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, HILLS PET NUTRITION, NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., IAMS CO.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2-A# 3 Exhibit 2-B# 4 Exhibit 3# 5 Exhibit 3-A# 6 Exhibit 3-B# 7 Exhibit 3-C# 8 Exhibit 3-D# 9 Exhibit 3-D# 10 Exhibit 3-F# 11 Exhibit 3-G# 12 Exhibit 3-H# 13 Exhibit 3-I# 14 Exhibit 4# 15 Exhibit 4-A# 16 Exhibit 4 B-1# 17 Exhibit 4 B-2# 18 Exhibit 4 B-3# 19 Exhibit 4 C-1# 20 Exhibit 4 C-2# 21 Exhibit 4 C-3# 22 Exhibit 5# 23 Exhibit 5-A# 24 Exhibit 5-B# 25 Exhibit 6# 26 Exhibit 6-1# 27 Exhibit 6-2# 28 Exhibit 6-3# 29 Exhibit 7# 30 Exhibit 7-A# 31 Exhibit 7-B# 32 Exhibit 7-C# 33 Exhibit 7-D# 34 Exhibit 7-E# 35 Exhibit 7-F# 36 Exhibit 8# 37 Exhibit 8-A# 38 Exhibit 9# 39 Exhibit 9-A# 40 Exhibit 9-B# 41 Exhibit 10# 42 Exhibit 10 Appx.# 43 Exhibit 10-A# 44 Exhibit 11# 45 Text of Proposed Order 12)(SANOM, LAURA)
December 11, 2007 102 Featured Case Letter from Menu Foods counsel. (HANSON, GERARD)
December 10, 2007 101 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. KARG on behalf of HILLS PET NUTRITION (KARG, STEVEN)
December 7, 2007 100 Featured Case ORDERED that any party SHOW CAUSE within 10 days of the date of this Order why the "Consent Order Regarding Organization of Pltf's Counsel" should not be entered.. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 12/7/07. (MB, )
December 6, 2007 99 Featured Case Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Submitting Proposed Consent Order Regarding Organization of Plaintiffs' Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Consent Order)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 29, 2007 98 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 21, 2007 before Judge Ann Marie Donio. Court Reporter: J & J Transcribers. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
November 27, 2007 Featured Case (TEXT ORDER) ORDERED that the hearing on defendant Del Monte Foods Company's Emergency Motion for Discovery (87) scheduled for Friday, November 30, 2007 at 2:00 pm is rescheduled to Thursday, December 20, 2007 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 3A. Plaintiffs' opposition brief shall be filed no later than Monday, December 10, 2007 at 12:00 noon, and Del Monte's reply brief shall be filed no later than Wednesday, December 19, 2007 at 12:00 noon. The parties are reminded to provide courtesy copies of their filings to chambers. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/27/07. (sa, )
November 27, 2007 96 Featured Case Letter from Del Monte Foods Company. (FAMA, RICHARD)
November 26, 2007 95 Featured Case ORDERED that defendant Del Monte Foods, Inc's motion for a protective order to quash the subpoena or otherwise limit the discovery request shall be filed no later than November 27, 2007 at 12:00 noon; and Plaintiff's opposition shall be filed no later than November 29, 2007 at 12:00 noon. The Court will conduct a hearing on the motion for a protective order on November 30, 2007 at 2:00 pm. Signed by Judge Ann Marie Donio on 11/26/07. (sb)
November 21, 2007 97 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann Marie Donio : Telephone Conference held on 11/21/2007. (Tape #14.) (ar1, )
November 21, 2007 94 Featured Case Exhibit to DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY Re 93 Letter. (FAMA, RICHARD)
November 21, 2007 93 Featured Case Letter from Delmonte Food Company by Richard Fama. (FAMA, RICHARD)
November 19, 2007 Featured Case (TEXT ORDER)ORDERED: Hearing on defendant Del Monte Foods Company's Emergency Motion for Discovery 87 shall be held on Friday, November 30, 2007 at 2:00pm in Courtroom 3A. Plaintiffs' opposition brief shall be filed no later than Tuesday, November 27, 2007 at noon, and Del Monte's reply brief shall be filed no later than Thursday, November 29, 2007 at noon. The parties are reminded to provide courtesy copies of their filings to chambers. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/19/2007. (sa, )
November 19, 2007 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: The Declaration, document number 88, submitted by R. FAMA on 11/16/07 was incorrectly filed as a Motion. For future filings, please select 'Declaration' which is located under 'Other Documents'. This message is for informational purposes only. (sb)
November 19, 2007 Featured Case Setting Deadlines as to 87 Emergency MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Motion returnable date set for 12/21/2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THIS MOTION WILL BE DECIDED ON THE PAPERS UNLESS OTHERWISE NOTIFIED BY THE COURT. (sb)
November 18, 2007 92 Featured Case Exhibit to DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY Re 88 Motion for Discovery,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Independence Photo 11# 2 Exhibit Independence Photo 12# 3 Exhibit Independence Photo 13# 4 Exhibit Independence Photo 14# 5 Exhibit Independence Photo 15# 6 Exhibit Independence Photo 16)(FAMA, RICHARD)
November 16, 2007 91 Featured Case Exhibit to DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY Re 88 Motion for Discovery,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Topeka Photo 1# 2 Exhibit Topeka Photo 2# 3 Exhibit Topeka Photo 3# 4 Exhibit Topeka Photo 4# 5 Exhibit Topeka Photo 5# 6 Exhibit Topeka Photo 6# 7 Exhibit Topeka Photo 7# 8 Exhibit Topeka Photo 8# 9 Exhibit Topeka Photo 9)(FAMA, RICHARD)
November 16, 2007 90 Featured Case Exhibit to DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY Re 88 Motion for Discovery,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 1# 2 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 2# 3 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 3# 4 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 4# 5 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 5# 6 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 6# 7 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 7# 8 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 8# 9 Exhibit Watsontown Photo 9)(FAMA, RICHARD)
November 16, 2007 89 Featured Case Exhibit to DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY Re 88 Motion for Discovery,,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 1# 2 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 2# 3 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 3# 4 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 4# 5 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 5# 6 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 6# 7 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 7# 8 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 8# 9 Exhibit Mira Loma Photo 9)(FAMA, RICHARD)
November 16, 2007 88 Featured Case Emergency MOTION for Discovery Declaration of Michael Hayes in Support of Del Monte's Motion pursuant to Rule 26 by DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Independence Photo 1# 2 Exhibit Independence Photo 2# 3 Exhibit Independence Photo 3# 4 Exhibit Independence Photo 4# 5 Exhibit Independence Photo 5# 6 Exhibit Independence Photo 6# 7 Exhibit Independence Photo 7# 8 Exhibit Independence Photo 8# 9 Exhibit Independence Photo 9# 10 Exhibit Independence Photo 10)(FAMA, RICHARD)
November 16, 2007 87 Featured Case Emergency MOTION for Discovery Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 by DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order# 3 Affidavit Affidavit of Good Faith# 4 Declaration Declaration of Dr. George P. McCabe)(FAMA, RICHARD)
November 16, 2007 86 Featured Case Letter from Plaintiffs' Counsel Responding to Del Monte's Letter re 84 Letter. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
November 15, 2007 85 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by STUART C. TALLEY (TALLEY, STUART)
November 14, 2007 84 Featured Case Letter from Del Monte. (FAMA, RICHARD)
November 9, 2007 83 Featured Case Letter from Menu Foods Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letters sent to 7 non-party members of putative class)(HANSON, GERARD) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2007 (sb, ).
November 7, 2007 82 Featured Case ORDERED that the previous Orders of the Court enjoining Menu Foods from comunicating with putative class members are modified to allow Menu Foods to send these letters to these non-party members of the putative class; ORDERED that defendants shall mail these letters within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 11/7/07. (sb)
November 1, 2007 81 Featured Case NOTICE of Change of Address by NATALIE FINKELMAN BENNETT (BENNETT, NATALIE)
October 26, 2007 80 Featured Case STATUS REPORT (Joint) Regarding Evidence Preservation by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, STEPHANIE ROZMAN, WENDY KROSSCHELL, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, SCOTT STACEY, MARIA TERESA FERRARESE, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, MARY TUNNELL, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Agreement Regarding Preservation of Records# 2 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 17, 2007 79 Featured Case Letter from Amy Schulman, Esq. re: Judge Hillman's Order of 9/26/07 regarding the Court's OTSC dated 8/28/07. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Communication to Unrepresented Claimants)(HANSON, GERARD) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2007 (sb, ).
October 10, 2007 78 Featured Case ORDER re 73 Letter. The Court noting that if the parties cannot resolve the matters through mediation, the Court will rule on all pending motions at the end of the 90-day stay. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 10/10/07. (sb)
October 10, 2007 77 Featured Case STIPULATION Withdrawing Motion for Preservation of Evidence by LAURI A. OSBORNE. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 4, 2007 76 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by GERARD H. HANSON on behalf of MENU FOODS (HANSON, GERARD)
October 4, 2007 75 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on September 26, 2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Stephen Daner. PLEASE NOTE: The complete transcript of these proceedings is maintained in paper format on file in the Clerks Office. To request copies of this transcript, contact the Official Court Reporter or Transcription Service who prepared the transcript. (sb)
October 3, 2007 74 Featured Case Letter from Liaison Counsel Supplementing re 73 Letter. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
October 3, 2007 73 Featured Case Letter from Liaison Counsel Seeking Clarification of 9.26.07 Order. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 26, 2007 72 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 68 Motion to Stay; denying 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 28 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting in part and denying in part 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel. ORDERED that all cases in this MDL are stayed for 90 days. The continuation of the initial practice and procedure conference shall be held on January 7, 2008 at 11:00 am. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 9/26/07. (sb)
September 26, 2007 71 Featured Case Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman : Initial Pretrial Conference held on 9/26/2007, Motion Hearing held on 9/26/2007 re 40 Amended MOTION to Appoint Counsel Liaison filed by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, 28 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Liasion Counsel Attorney: Amy W. Schulman, Esq., Craig A. Hoover, Esq., D. Jeffrey Ireland, Esq., and Mark C. Goodman, Esq. filed by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel Lead Attorney: Gregory Nespole. filed by CIRO AIELLO, 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber filed by RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, et al 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash. filed by LINDA TINKER, MARJORIE READY, 68 MOTION to Stay re 67 Noti MOTION to Stay re 67 Notice (Other) filed by SUSAN FORESMAN, et al; 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel filed by SUSAN FORESMAN, et al. ORDERED 28 motion granted. Order appointing Amy Schulman, Esq, Craig Hoover, Esq, D. Jeffrey Ireland, Esq, and Mark Goodman, Esq liasion counsel for defts. ORDERED 32 motion granted. Order appointing Lisa Rodriguez, Esq as liaison counsel for pltfs. Hearing on joint motion to stay of proceedings. Hrg on motion by pltfs for preservation of evidence. Consent Order to be submitted withdrawing motion to be submitted within 14 days. Ordered matter stayed for a period of 90 days. Ordered all motions for appointment of lead counsel denied. Ordered Pre Trial Conference scheduled for January 7, 2008 at 11:00am. Ordered motions for lead counsel denied. Order to be entered. (Court Reporter Stephen J. Daner.) (sb)
September 26, 2007 Featured Case In 07-2867: Plaintiffs' motion for preservation of evidence 3 in Docket No. 07-3242 is adjourned for 14 days pending the possible submission of a consent order.(sa, )
September 24, 2007 70 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD FAMA on behalf of DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY (FAMA, RICHARD)
September 24, 2007 Featured Case Setting Deadlines as to 68 MOTION to Stay re 67 Notice (Other). Motion returnable date set for 9/26/2007 11:00 AM before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (sb)
September 24, 2007 Featured Case CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE: The Notice of Motion, document number 67, submitted by M. GOODMAN on 9/21/07 was filed incorrectly as a Notice. The Brief, document number 68, was filed incorrectly as a Motion. For future filings, the Notice of Motion should be filed as a Motion with all supporting documents as attachments. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise notified by the Court. This message is for informational purposes only. (sb)
September 21, 2007 69 Featured Case Proposed Pretrial Order RE JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF MDL PROCEEDINGS TO PERMIT MEDIATION by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, CHEMNUTRA, INC., JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, DEL MONTE FOODS, INC., RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, CHEMNUTRA LLC, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES, INC., THE PROCTOR & GAMBLE COMPANY, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., PETCO SOUTHWEST, INC., PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES STORES, INC., PETSMART, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, WALMART, INC., MENU FOODS, DEL MONTE CORPORATION, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., CHERYL CARVER, MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, PAMELA SIMS, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, TARGET CORPORATION, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, NESTLE SA, NESTLE HOLDINGS INC., NESTLE USA INC., LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, WAL-MART STORES, INC., RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, IAMS CO., BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (GOODMAN, MARK)
September 21, 2007 68 Featured Case MOTION to Stay re 67 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF MDL PROCEEDINGS TO ALLOW FOR MEDIATION by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, CHEMNUTRA, INC., JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, DEL MONTE FOODS, INC., RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, CHEMNUTRA LLC, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES, INC., THE PROCTOR & GAMBLE COMPANY, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., PETCO SOUTHWEST, INC., PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES STORES, INC., PETSMART, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, WALMART, INC., MENU FOODS, DEL MONTE CORPORATION, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., CHERYL CARVER, MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, PAMELA SIMS, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, TARGET CORPORATION, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, NESTLE SA, NESTLE HOLDINGS INC., NESTLE USA INC., LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, WAL-MART STORES, INC., RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, IAMS CO., BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (GOODMAN, MARK)
September 21, 2007 67 Featured Case NOTICE by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, CHEMNUTRA, INC., JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, KIMBERLY BOWSER, JULIE HIDALGO, DINA KARGER, DENISE VOLLMER, DOLLY PRUE-CERDA, MYRNA LAW, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, DEL MONTE FOODS, INC., RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, CHEMNUTRA LLC, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES, INC., THE PROCTOR & GAMBLE COMPANY, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, DEL MONTE FOODS COMPANY, NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY, NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC., PETCO SOUTHWEST, INC., PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES STORES, INC., PETSMART, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, COLGATE-PALMOLIVE COMPANY, WALMART, INC., MENU FOODS, DEL MONTE CORPORATION, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., CHERYL CARVER, MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, PAMELA SIMS, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, TARGET CORPORATION, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC., JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, ALBERTSONS, INC, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, NESTLE SA, NESTLE HOLDINGS INC., NESTLE USA INC., LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, WAL-MART STORES, INC., RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, IAMS CO., BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON OF JOINT MOTION FOR STAY OF MDL PROCEEDINGS TO ALLOW FOR MEDIATION (GOODMAN, MARK)
September 21, 2007 66 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by WARREN W. FAULK on behalf of NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY (FAULK, WARREN)
September 20, 2007 65 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. filed by MARY DICAPRIO, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, JANICE BONIER, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, LESLIE BERNDL, JAMES CONNER, CAROL BROWN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, CHARLES RAY SIMS, JAYNE ENGLANDER, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 19, 2007 64 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. National Plaintiffs' Consolidated Reply to The Application for Lead Counsel Submitted by the Berger/Wexler Group filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, JULIE HIDALGO, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (AUDET, WILLIAM)
September 19, 2007 63 Featured Case RESPONSE in Support re 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, MARY DICAPRIO, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON, TAMMY NAVARRETE, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, JULIE HIDALGO, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CIRO AIELLO, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Paul J. Geller in Reply to Kamber Groups Opposition to Majority Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)# 2 Supplemental Declaration of Kenneth A. Wexler Regarding Majority Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(g)# 3 Declaration Of Steve W. Berman In Reply To Appointment Of Interim Lead Counsel Opposition Brief Of The Kamber Group# 4 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 19, 2007 62 Featured Case REPLY to Response to Motion re 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash. Reply to Opposition Papers filed by LINDA TINKER. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(SASH, ALAN)
September 18, 2007 61 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. BONI on behalf of CHERI CUTLER (BONI, MICHAEL)
September 17, 2007 60 Featured Case Letter from Gerard H. Hanson, Esq.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Suggested Agenda Items for 9/26/07 Conference)(HANSON, GERARD)
September 17, 2007 59 Featured Case Letter from Lisa J. Rodriguez (Proposed Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs) and the Proposed Lead Counsel Group. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 14, 2007 58 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by GAIL E. LEES on behalf of NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. (sb)
September 14, 2007 57 Featured Case Substitution of Attorney - Attorney LINDSAY R. PENNINGTON for NUTRO PRODUCTS, INC. added. Attorney CHARLES H. ABBOTT terminated. (sb)
September 13, 2007 56 Featured Case Letter from Amy W. Schulman, Esq. as counsel for Menu Foods responding to the Court's Order of 8/28/07. (HANSON, GERARD)
September 13, 2007 55 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on all counsel on attached list on September 12, 2007, filed by MARY DICAPRIO, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, JANICE BONIER, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, LESLIE BERNDL, JAMES CONNER, CAROL BROWN, CHARLES RAY SIMS, JAYNE ENGLANDER, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 13, 2007 54 Featured Case NOTICE by CHRISTINA TROIANO, SHERRY INGLES of Firm Name Change to Coughlin Stoia Geller Rudman & Robbins LLP (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 12, 2007 53 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber., 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash. filed by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, LERAE DINEEN, SANDRA SHINGLE, GARY THOMAS, DEBORAH A. MULLEN, HELEN PERCY, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, PAULA MONK, TONY BOYER, NORMAN BRENTON, LYNDA NAGEL, TERESA EILERS, WILLIAM MCMAHON, JEFF RUSIECKI, KAROLE VANDUSEN, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, JULIE HIDALGO, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 12, 2007 52 Featured Case BRIEF in Opposition re 28 Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Liasion Counsel Attorney: Amy W. Schulman, Esq., Craig A. Hoover, Esq., D. Jeffrey Ireland, Esq., and Mark C. Goodman, Esq.., 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel Lead Attorney: Gregory Nespole., 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash., 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. filed by MARY DICAPRIO, DAWN HOWE, KELLY FINESTONE, JANICE BONIER, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, LESLIE BERNDL, JAMES CONNER, CAROL BROWN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, CHARLES RAY SIMS, JAYNE ENGLANDER, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES. (FERRARA, MICHAEL) Additional attachment(s) added on 9/14/2007 (sb, ).
September 12, 2007 51 Featured Case RESPONSE to Motion re 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel Lead Attorney: Gregory Nespole., 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber., 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash., 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. Response filed by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC., MENU FOODS OPERATING TRUST, MENU FOODS ACQUISITION INC.. (HANSON, GERARD)
September 11, 2007 50 Featured Case Letter from Alan E. Sash re 10 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings. (SASH, ALAN)
September 11, 2007 49 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 47 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
September 11, 2007 48 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter re 47 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
September 11, 2007 46 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 44 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
September 11, 2007 45 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter re 44 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (sb)
September 10, 2007 47 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order from Judicial Panel on MDL transferring certain action from the Northern District of Indiana; Case# 4:07cv33 to this court. (sb)
September 10, 2007 43 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service Summons and Amended Complaint served on Menu Foods Income Fund on May 10, 2007, filed by LINDA TINKER. (SASH, ALAN)
September 7, 2007 44 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order from Judicial Panel on MDL transferring certain action from the Western District of Tennessee; Case# 2:07cv2246 to this court. (sb)
September 7, 2007 42 Featured Case AMENDED DOCUMENT by JANICE BONIER, LESLIE BERNDL. Amendment to 36 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 39 Declaration, 38 Declaration, 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber., 37 Declaration, 35 Brief in Support of Motion, Proposed Order for Lead Counsel. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 7, 2007 41 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Appointment of Lead Counsel served on see attached list on September 6, 2007, filed by JANICE BONIER, LESLIE BERNDL. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 6, 2007 40 Featured Case Amended MOTION to Appoint Counsel Liaison by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY. (FAULK, WARREN)
September 5, 2007 39 Featured Case DECLARATION of Jason M. Hatfield re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. by Kirby Cooper. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 5, 2007 38 Featured Case DECLARATION of Scott A. Kamber re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. by JANICE BONIER, LESLIE BERNDL. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 5, 2007 37 Featured Case DECLARATION of William A. Audet re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. by JANICE BONIER, LESLIE BERNDL. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 5, 2007 36 Featured Case AFFIDAVIT in Support re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. filed by JANICE BONIER, LESLIE BERNDL. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 5, 2007 35 Featured Case BRIEF in Support re 34 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. filed by JANICE BONIER, LESLIE BERNDL. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 5, 2007 34 Featured Case MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of National Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead Attorney: William A. Audet, Jay Edelson and Scott A. Kamber. by MARY DICAPRIO, Dawn Howe, Dennis Lee townsend, Kirby Cooper, JANICE BONIER, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, LESLIE BERNDL, JAMES CONNER, CAROL BROWN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, LORRAINE JOHNSON, CHARLES RAY SIMS, MITCH ENGLANDER, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES. (FERRARA, MICHAEL)
September 5, 2007 33 Featured Case DECLARATION of Kenneth A. Wexler re 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. (Exhibit A inadvertently omitted) by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, WILLIAM MCMAHON, KAROLE VANDUSEN, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, JULIE HIDALGO, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, WALTHAM, MARK CASHMAN, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 5, 2007 32 Featured Case MOTION to Appoint Counsel (of Majority Plaintiffs) Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Attorney: Kenneth A. Wexler, Sherrie R. Savett, Paul J. Geller, Steven W. Berman, Interim Co-Lead, and Lisa J. Rodriguez, as Liaison Counsel. by PAUL RICHARD, JENNIFER RICHARD, CHARLES KOHLER, BARBARA WIDEN, ALICIA KOHLER, LINDA TINKER, GAIL BRYAN, SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN, CRYSTAL WARD, DARLENE WARD, ALEXANDRA STARKEY, WILLIAM MCMAHON, KAROLE VANDUSEN, MARJORIE READY, SHIRLEY SEXTON, JANICE BONIER, GUY BRITTON, TAMMY MATTHEWS, JULIE HIDALGO, ALEXANDER NUNEZ, MARK GOLDING, TROY GAGLIARDI, KAMI TURTURRO, PEGGY SCHNEIDER, LAURI A. OSBORNE, LESLIE BERNDL, JIM MOSES, TERRI MOSES, JAYME PITTSONBERGER, DAVID CARTER, JIM BULLOCK, CHRISTINA JOHNSON, JAMES CONNER, FRANCES NASH, MATT LONG, TODD SOKOLWSKI, CHANTELLE CONTI, CHERI CUTLER, STEVEN FREEMAN, KAREN PIRCHES, DINITRISE HICKS, DIANA DIEDRICH, MICHELE MCCULLOUGH, CHRISTINA TROIANO, STEVE COLQUITT, MARIANNA CUTTER, LUKE DEBARATHY, LOREN BYERS, KAY BYERS, CAMILLA BRANKOV, GLEN TUNNELL, LYNNE CARESTIO, OLIVIA GUERCIONI, JUDY MCGURIMAN, DAWN MAJERCZYK, JARED WORKMAN, DIXIE KELLER, CAROL BROWN, MARK COHEN, RICHARD SCHWINGER, SARAH CAVIN, BARBARA LIGHT, PENNY J. ROBERTS, DONALD GILBERT IVERSON, JACQUELINE JOHNSON, MONA COHEN, MARA BRAZILIAN, DIANE LOWERY, SHERRY INGLES, LIZAJEAN HOLT, STEPHEN DONNELLY, JENNIFER HIRNI, GREGORY BOEHM, ROBERT PAYNE, STEVE BARTILUCCI, DONNA LEFEBVRE, HAYLEY FORD, SHANNON J. KRAMER, JOHN COLLIARD, KIM LEONARD, EMILY TOMPKINS, HARMONY ADAMS, KIRA ANDRES, TAMARA ARENDT, EMORY ARIANO, CAROL BAKER, STEPHEN M. BARONE, DEBRA LEROY, MELISSA BECKO, KRISTEN BENECK, RAMONA BERRY, DAVID BONDARCHURCH, BRANDON C. BOURRET, DENISE BOURRET, LOU ANN CAMERON, TOM WHALEY, CINDY CAMP, MIKE CLARK, TRACY COLE, TODD COLE, SANDRA CRAFT, MIRANDA DANIELE, STACEY HELLER, DIANN DECKER, TONI DENHAM, CARLA DETWILER, CARL DICKSON, BETH DOMBROSKI, SARA DOSCH, KATERNINE FEIGHT, SUZANNE E. JOHNSON, RICHARD FEIGHT, SUSAN FORESMAN, DENISE FORSYTH, BRUCE FOSTER, MICHELLE GODE, RHONDA GOOD, JANET GOODWIN, CRAIG R. KLEMANN, KIM GORGENS, LINDA GORRELL, VICTORIA GOSTEVA, CAROL GRETZ, WILLIAM GRETZ, TODD HANSON, AUDREY KORNELIUS, RENE HANSON, CAROL HAUGH, MARK HEATON, KAMI HUFF, ALLISON JERNIGAN, LORRAINE JOHNSON, JASON KATZ, CECILY MITCHELL, JESSICA KATZ, RICHARD KAY, PATRICIA KAY, DONNA KEAN, CLARISSA KING, VIRGINIA KOSLOW, CANDACE LAROSE, TERRENCE MITCHELL, LEMECIA LANDRUM, JOHN LOGAN, THERESA LUNA, CHARLES RAY SIMS, DEBORAH MASSO, CONNIE MCKINNEY, DANNY MICKEY, DAVID RAPP, LOIS MITCHELL, ERYN MULLOY, STACY NEWMAN-ROOLF, LISA NICHOLS, JO ANN OAKLIEF, RICK OBERNOLTE, JEN OLBRICHT, TOINETTE ROBINSON, LORRIE PARADISO, GERALDINE PAULEY, CRYSTAL PICKETT, CYNTHIA POOLE, LYNN PUSILIO, ERICA RAMBUS, JUSTIN REVENE, BARBARA SMITH, BROOK REVSTOCK, TRACY RICHARDSON, JON ROBERTS, EVELYN SEEMAN, MICHAEL SENA, STEPHENIE SHEME, MICHELE SUGGETT, JUDY SHOPE, SANDRA SMITH, RANDY ST. ONGE, STEPHEN TERRELL, MARY JO THOMAS, MARY KAY URBAN, CLAIRE WALTER, DON JAMES, PRUDENCE WALTERS, JETHRO WAGNER, DON WARN, ROBERT WEISS, IAN WHITE, KURT WHITT, KENNETH WHITTEN, DIANE SWARBERG, LAURIE WOODMAN, TERESA ZANKIEWICZ, DEBBIE ZEIGLER, MARK CASHMAN, CHERYL CARVER, PAMELA SIMS, HEATHER AMRO, RAYMOND DEMITH, KATHERINE DEMITH, JAYNE ENGLANDER, MITCH ENGLANDER, JENNIFER HART, SHEILA R. WASHINGTON, MARIA MITCHELL, RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN, LAURA MIGLIORE, GAIL MORAN, SHERYL PUETT, DANIEL RAY REEVES, SHEREE A. ROBINSON, PHYLLIS A. ULLMAN, ELIZABETH PALMER, JASON LABBATE, MEGAN WHITT, LINDA WEITZ, MICHELLE ADAMS, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN, LOIS GRADY, KAYE STEINSAPIR, CRAIG ANDERSON, FRANK BODEMAN, BARBARA GONZALES, SUZANNE THOMSON, ROBERT TRAUTMANN, LARRY WILSON. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion in Support of Majority Plaintiffs Motion for Appointment of Interim Co-Lead and Liaison Counsel Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(G)# 2 Declaration of Kenneth A. Wexler# 3 Declaration of Sherrie R. Savett, part 1# 4 Declaration of Sherrie R. Savett, part 2# 5 Declaration of Paul J. Geller, part 1# 6 Declaration of Paul J. Geller, part 2# 7 Declaration of Paul J. Geller, part 3# 8 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, part 1# 9 Declaration of Steve W. Berman, part 2# 10 Declaration of Lisa J. Rodriguez# 11 Appendix of Exhibits, part 1# 12 Appendix of Exhibits, part 2# 13 Text of Proposed Order # 14 Certificate of Service)(RODRIGUEZ, LISA)
September 5, 2007 31 Featured Case DECLARATION of Gregory Mark Nespole re 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel Lead Attorney: Gregory Nespole. by CIRO AIELLO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(RESTITUYO, MARTIN)
September 5, 2007 30 Featured Case BRIEF in Support re 29 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel Lead Attorney: Gregory Nespole. filed by CIRO AIELLO. (RESTITUYO, MARTIN)
September 5, 2007 29 Featured Case MOTION to Appoint Counsel Motion for Appointment of Interim Counsel Lead Attorney: Gregory Nespole. by CIRO AIELLO. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service Declaration of Service)(RESTITUYO, MARTIN)
September 5, 2007 28 Featured Case Joint MOTION to Appoint Counsel Liasion Counsel Attorney: Amy W. Schulman, Esq., Craig A. Hoover, Esq., D. Jeffrey Ireland, Esq., and Mark C. Goodman, Esq.. by NESTLE PURINA PETCARE COMPANY. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Defendants' Joint Motion to Appoint Liaison Counsel# 2 Text of Proposed Order)(FAULK, WARREN)
September 5, 2007 Featured Case Setting Deadlines as to 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash. Motion returnable date set for 9/26/2007 11:00 AM before Judge Noel L. Hillman. (sb)
September 4, 2007 27 Featured Case BRIEF in Support re 25 MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash. filed by LINDA TINKER. (SASH, ALAN)
September 4, 2007 26 Featured Case Certification of Alan E. Sash on behalf of LINDA TINKER Re 25 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Firm Resume)(SASH, ALAN)
September 4, 2007 25 Featured Case MOTION to Appoint Counsel McLaughlin & Stern, LLP and Abbey Spanier Rodd & Abrams, LLP Lead Counsel for Proposed Interim Class Attorney: Alan E. Sash. by LINDA TINKER, MARJORIE READY. (SASH, ALAN)
September 4, 2007 24 Featured Case NOTICE by WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC. of Appearance of Frank C. Rothrock and Paul B. La Scala (WALSH, LIZA)
August 29, 2007 22 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DENNIS DONOVAN on behalf of CHERI CUTLER (DONOVAN, MICHAEL)
August 29, 2007 21 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL DENNIS DONOVAN on behalf of CHANTELLE CONTI (DONOVAN, MICHAEL)
August 29, 2007 Featured Case ORDERED that oppositions to motions for lead or liaison counsel filed pursuant to the Court's Practice and Procedure Order 10 shall be filed no later than September 12, 2007, and replies shall be filed no later than September 19, 2007. By Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/29/07. (sa, )
August 28, 2007 23 Featured Case ORDERED that any interested party show cause on 9/26/2007 11:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman why Menu Foods should not be granted leave to settle with certain designated members of the putative class. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/28/07. (sb) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/30/2007 (sb, ).
August 28, 2007 20 Featured Case Letters from pet owners addressed to Judge Hillman. (sb) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/16/2007 (sb, ).
August 27, 2007 19 Featured Case Letter from Amy W. Schulman. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Lowery Stipulation Preserving Evidence# 2 Exhibit Hidalgo Stipulation for Preservation of Evidence# 3 Exhibit Krosschell Stipulation for Preservation of Evidence)(HANSON, GERARD)
August 27, 2007 18 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by LEISA B. PEARLMAN on behalf of BARBARA WIDEN, RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN (PEARLMAN, LEISA)
August 21, 2007 17 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re 15 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (th, )
August 21, 2007 16 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter re 15 MDL Conditional Transfer Order (in). (th, )
August 21, 2007 15 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order from Judicial Panel on MDL, transferring a certain action from the W.D. of PA; Case# 2:07-734 to this court. (th)
August 21, 2007 14 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of WALMART, INC., WAL-MART STORES, INC. (WALSH, LIZA)
August 21, 2007 13 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES, INC., PETCO SOUTHWEST, INC., PETCO ANIMAL SUPPLIES STORES, INC. (WALSH, LIZA)
August 21, 2007 12 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of PETSMART (WALSH, LIZA)
August 21, 2007 11 Featured Case NOTICE of Appearance by LIZA M. WALSH on behalf of TARGET CORPORATION (WALSH, LIZA)
August 14, 2007 10 Featured Case PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER Motions to appoint lead counsel due by 9/5/2007. Initial Pretrial Conference set for 9/26/2007 11:00 AM before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 8/14/07. (sb)
July 30, 2007 9 Featured Case STATEMENT CORPORATE DISCLOSURE by MENU FOODS, MENU FOODS GEN PAR LTD., MENU FOODS HOLDING, INC., MENU FOODS INCOME FUND, MENU FOODS LTD, MENU FOODS LTD PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS MIDWEST CORP., MENU FOODS OPERATING PARTNERSHIP, MENU FOODS SOUTH DAKOTA, INC., MENU FOODS, INC.. (HANSON, GERARD)
July 20, 2007 8 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to Counsel re: MDL tag-along cases. (sb)
July 20, 2007 7 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter. (sb)
July 19, 2007 6 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order from Judicial Panel of MDL transferring certain tag-along actions to this court. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter and Counsel List)(sb)
July 9, 2007 5 Featured Case TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on July 6, 2007 before Judge Noel L. Hillman. Court Reporter: Stephen J. Daner. (sb)
July 6, 2007 4 Featured Case Letter from Francis McGill Hadden and Russell D. Paul to Judge Hillman re: agreed-upon communications between Iams and plaintiffs. (sb)
June 25, 2007 3 Featured Case Clerk's Notification Letter. (sb)
June 22, 2007 2 Featured Case Clerk's Notice to All Counsel re: MDL. (sb)
June 22, 2007 1 Featured Case Certified Copy of Order from Judicial Panel of MDL transferring certain actions to this Court. (Attachments: # 1 Letter to Clerk# 2 Letter to Judge Hillman# 3 Panel Service List# 4 MDL Order Adopting Rules of Procedure)(sb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: PET FOOD PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HELEN PERCY
Represented By: STEVE W. BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE BIRNEY
Represented By: LUIS GUILLERMO FIGUEROA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY BIRNEY
Represented By: LUIS GUILLERMO FIGUEROA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GINGER SNYDER
Represented By: ROBERT A. MCNEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA TERESA FERRARESE
Represented By: GARY EDWARD MASON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CIRO AIELLO
Represented By: MARTIN E. RESTITUYO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH P SNYDER
Represented By: ROBERT A. MCNEELY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT STACEY
Represented By: JOHN G. EMERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL CARVER
Represented By: MARK JOHN TAMBLYN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY RICHARDSON
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY SHOPE
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SENA
Represented By: PAUL GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHENIE SHEME
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORRAINE JOHNSON
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA LIGHT
Represented By: ROBERT R. KURTZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENNY J. ROBERTS
Represented By: MICHAEL L. STOKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD GILBERT IVERSON
Represented By: MICHAEL L. STOKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE JOHNSON
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARA BRAZILIAN
Represented By: THEODORE A. SMALL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE LOWERY
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY INGLES
Represented By: SHAWN A. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN DONNELLY
Represented By: SCOTT RHEAD SHEPHERD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER HIRNI
Represented By: SCOTT RHEAD SHEPHERD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY BOEHM
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT PAYNE
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURA MIGLIORE
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL MORAN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD CHAMBERLAIN
Represented By: CHERYL A. WILLIAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT TRAUTMANN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MITCH ENGLANDER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK CASHMAN
Represented By: GREGORY M. NESPOLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY FINESTONE
Represented By: WILLIAM T. KING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL RANDOLPH JOHNSON
Represented By: BEHRAM V. PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DON WARN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT WEISS
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IAN WHITE
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KURT WHITT
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH WHITTEN
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURIE WOODMAN
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE BARTILUCCI
Represented By: ERIC BENINK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG ANDERSON
Represented By: ANDREW H. FRIEDMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMY NAVARRETE
Represented By: ROBERT M. CHURELLA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHEILA R. WASHINGTON
Represented By: RENE LYNN BARGE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY BOWSER
Represented By: KARL A. SCHLEDWITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON JERNIGAN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK HEATON
Represented By: PAUL GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMI HUFF
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBORAH A. MULLEN
Represented By: STEVE W. BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RENE HANSON
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM GRETZ
Represented By: PAUL GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD HANSON
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN M. BARONE
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELISSA BECKO
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KRISTEN BENECK
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAMONA BERRY
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BONDARCHURCH
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON C. BOURRET
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENISE BOURRET
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOU ANN CAMERON
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CINDY CAMP
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKE CLARK
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY COLE
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD COLE
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA CRAFT
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIRANDA DANIELE
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE ROZMAN
Represented By: ILAN J. CHOROWSKY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDY KROSSCHELL
Represented By: DENNIS STEWART
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK BODEMAN
Represented By: MICHAEL D. SEPLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA SHINGLE
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYNE ENGLANDER
Represented By: SUZANNE HAVENS BECKMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN REVENE
Represented By: PAUL GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BROOK REVSTOCK
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONA COHEN
Represented By: SHERRIE R. SAVETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIZAJEAN HOLT
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA LEFEBVRE
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM LEONARD
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA LEROY
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK COHEN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SCOTT WIDEN
Represented By: TIMOTHY CHAD HUTCHINSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA WIDEN
Represented By: JAMES C. WYLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY SEXTON
Represented By: KENNETH A. WEXLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAURI A. OSBORNE
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD SOKOLWSKI
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA TROIANO
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN MAJERCZYK
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JARED WORKMAN
Represented By: SHERRIE R. SAVETT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE THOMSON
Represented By: GREGG D. TRAUTMANN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD STIMMEL
Represented By: JAMES T. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lidia Rodrigues
Represented By: BRIAN R. CUNHA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL BROWN
Represented By: PETER N. WASYLYK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD SCHWINGER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH CAVIN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY TUNNELL
Represented By: SETH R. LESSER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MYRNA LAW
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MOELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA GONZALES
Represented By: MICHAEL D. SEPLOW
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LERAE DINEEN
Represented By: STEVE W. BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORI L. WILSON
Represented By: JAMES T. DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Mello
Represented By: EUGENE REUBEN RICHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK BONADIO
Represented By: RICHARD E. SHEVITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM BULLOCK
Represented By: WILLIAM J. PINILIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA JOHNSON
Represented By: JAMES C. SHAH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES CONNER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANCES NASH
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATT LONG
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHANTELLE CONTI
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERI CUTLER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN FREEMAN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAREN PIRCHES
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DINITRISE HICKS
Represented By: JOSEPH G. SAUDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA DIEDRICH
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE MCCULLOUGH
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVE COLQUITT
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIANNA CUTTER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LUKE DEBARATHY
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMILLA BRANKOV
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLEN TUNNELL
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNNE CARESTIO
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIVIA GUERCIONI
Represented By: KEITH T. SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY MCGURIMAN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIXIE KELLER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANN DECKER
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TOM WHALEY
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY HELLER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUZANNE E. JOHNSON
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRAIG R. KLEMANN
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AUDREY KORNELIUS
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CECILY MITCHELL
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRENCE MITCHELL
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID RAPP
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL HAUGH
Represented By: JENNIFER REBA THOMAIDIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MUELLER
Represented By: BRUCE S. BISTLINE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL LAVOIE
Represented By: PHILIP HOWARD GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LARRY KLIMES
Represented By: PHILIP HOWARD GORDON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARK GOLDING
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TROY GAGLIARDI
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMI TURTURRO
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PEGGY SCHNEIDER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE BERNDL
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JIM MOSES
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRI MOSES
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAYME PITTSONBERGER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID CARTER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOLLY PRUE-CERDA
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER A. MOELLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNDA NAGEL
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NORMAN BRENTON
Represented By: STEVE W. BERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA MITCHELL
Represented By: KATHERINE J. ODENBREIT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY THOMAS
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Connerton
Represented By: EUGENE REUBEN RICHARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAWN HOWE
Represented By: SABRINA S. KIM
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA EILERS
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEFF RUSIECKI
Represented By: MICHAEL DAVID MYERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER NUNEZ
Represented By: JOSEPH J. DEPALMA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL RICHARD
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER RICHARD
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES KOHLER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALICIA KOHLER
Represented By: LISA J. RODRIGUEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA TINKER
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GAIL BRYAN
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN HANCE-GOODMAN
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL WARD
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE WARD
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDRA STARKEY
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MCMAHON
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAROLE VANDUSEN
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARJORIE READY
Represented By: ALAN E. SASH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance |