JACKSON v. GANDY et al
Plaintiff: VINCE JACKSON
Defendant: E. GANDY, A. SADUK, ROMAN, JOHN DOE and JANE DOE
Case Number: 1:2009cv01141
Filed: March 13, 2009
Court: US District Court for the District of New Jersey
Office: Camden Office
County: Cumberland
Presiding Judge: Renee Marie Bumb
Presiding Judge: Joel Schneider
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER DENYING Defendants request to dismiss this action for failure to exhaust administrative remedies pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 8/1/17. (dd, )
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 183 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that Defendants' request to dismiss this action for failure to exhaust shall be, and is hereby, DENIED; and it is further ORDERED that this action shall proceed to trial on all remaining issues on a date to be set by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 9/29/2014. (tf, )
June 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting in part and denying in part and denying without prejudice in part Deft's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; Granted w/respect to all claims against the defts in their official capacities, Granted w/respect to all claims against Ba licki, Sullivan and Hayman in their individual capacities, Denied w/respect to Pltf's excessive force claims against Officers Gandy, Saduk and Roman, Denied w/respect to Defts' arguments based on the qualified immunity of Officers Gandy, S aduk and Roman, Denied w/o prejudice w/respect to Defts' argument that Pltf is not entitled to punitive damages, Denied w/o prejudice w/respect to Defts' argument that Pltf failed to exhaust his administrative remedies.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio on 6/29/12. (th, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JACKSON v. GANDY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCE JACKSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. GANDY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. SADUK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JANE DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?