WOLF v. NISSAN MOTOR ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Plaintiff: MATTHEW S. WOLF
Defendant: NISSAN MOTOR ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2010cv03338
Filed: June 30, 2010
Court: New Jersey District Court
Office: Camden Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Noel L. Hillman
Referring Judge: Karen M. Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 2/20/2015. (dmr)
March 29, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 3/29/2012. (dmr)
June 22, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 6/22/2011. (dmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New Jersey District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WOLF v. NISSAN MOTOR ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MATTHEW S. WOLF
Represented By: THOMAS T. BOOTH, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NISSAN MOTOR ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?